Real Time Insider Transaction Data
Real Time Insider buys and sells Data - Insider Trades - Insider Transactions - Insider Trading Data - SEC Form 4 Data
Total | Transactions | Amount |
Buys | 2 | $0 |
Sells | 233 | $238,236,573 |
Security | Reporting Name | Relationship | Purchase/Sale | Shares | Price $ | D/I | ||||
08 Aug 2023 18:25 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | WOMBLE DUSTIN R | Director | 04 Nov 2021 | Sale A | 20,000 | 543.1781 | 10,863,562 | I |
01 Aug 2023 16:06 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | WOMBLE DUSTIN R | Director | 04 Nov 2021 | Sale A | 20,000 | 543.1781 | 10,863,562 | I |
08 Aug 2023 18:25 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | WOMBLE DUSTIN R | Director | 02 Jun 2020 | Sale A | 17,957 | 380.9468 | 6,840,662 | I |
01 Aug 2023 16:06 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | WOMBLE DUSTIN R | Director | 02 Jun 2020 | Sale A | 17,957 | 380.9468 | 6,840,662 | I |
08 Aug 2023 18:25 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | WOMBLE DUSTIN R | Director | 11 Nov 2020 | Sale A | 13,457 | 427.2551 | 5,749,572 | I |
01 Aug 2023 16:06 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | WOMBLE DUSTIN R | Director | 11 Nov 2020 | Sale A | 13,457 | 427.2551 | 5,749,572 | I |
08 Aug 2023 18:25 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | WOMBLE DUSTIN R | Director | 10 Dec 2020 | Sale A | 11,338 | 447.2372 | 5,070,775 | I |
01 Aug 2023 16:06 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | WOMBLE DUSTIN R | Director | 10 Dec 2020 | Sale A | 11,338 | 447.2372 | 5,070,775 | I |
13 Jun 2023 11:00 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chairman | 17 May 2023 | Sale | 12,000 | 390.2876 | 4,683,451 | I |
29 Nov 2023 15:18 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | WOMBLE DUSTIN R | Director | 14 Nov 2023 | Sale | 9,520 | 421.181 | 4,009,643 | I |
02 Aug 2024 15:31 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | PUCKETT JEFFREY DAVID | Chief Operating Officer | 31 Jul 2024 | Sale | 5,993 | 574.79 | 3,444,716 | D |
08 Aug 2023 18:25 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | WOMBLE DUSTIN R | Director | 19 Aug 2020 | Sale A | 10,000 | 338.18 | 3,381,800 | I |
01 Aug 2023 16:06 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | WOMBLE DUSTIN R | Director | 19 Aug 2020 | Sale A | 10,000 | 338.18 | 3,381,800 | I |
29 Feb 2024 16:32 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | WOMBLE DUSTIN R | Director | 28 Feb 2024 | Sale | 7,500 | 438.6615 | 3,289,961 | I |
26 Mar 2024 12:04 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | WOMBLE DUSTIN R | Director | 28 Feb 2024 | Sale A | 7,500 | 438.6615 | 3,289,961 | D |
13 Jun 2023 11:00 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chairman | 18 May 2023 | Sale | 8,000 | 398.383 | 3,187,064 | I |
12 Sep 2024 14:38 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MOORE H LYNN JR | President and CEO | 10 Sep 2024 | Sale | 4,775 | 590.9539 | 2,821,805 | D |
07 Jun 2023 18:16 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chairman | 05 Jun 2023 | Sale | 7,000 | 396.6064 | 2,776,245 | D |
07 Jun 2023 18:16 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chairman | 06 Jun 2023 | Sale | 7,000 | 392.7789 | 2,749,452 | D |
14 Mar 2024 17:18 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chair of the Board | 13 Mar 2024 | Sale | 5,899 | 425.0736 | 2,507,509 | D |
15 Mar 2023 16:34 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chairman | 14 Mar 2023 | Sale | 7,500 | 325.2487 | 2,439,365 | D |
26 Mar 2024 12:04 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | WOMBLE DUSTIN R | Director | 27 Feb 2024 | Sale A | 5,205 | 463.4531 | 2,412,273 | D |
07 Jun 2023 17:25 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chairman | 04 May 2023 | Sale A | 6,000 | 379.1282 | 2,274,769 | D |
08 May 2023 12:51 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chairman | 04 May 2023 | Sale | 6,000 | 379.1282 | 2,274,769 | D |
29 Feb 2024 16:32 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | WOMBLE DUSTIN R | Director | 27 Feb 2024 | Sale | 5,205 | 436.4531 | 2,271,738 | D |
23 Feb 2023 09:54 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MOORE H LYNN JR | President and CEO | 21 Feb 2023 | Sale | 6,000 | 335.0003 | 2,010,002 | D |
01 May 2024 17:29 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | CLINE BRENDA A | Director | 29 Apr 2024 | Sale | 4,303 | 458.95 | 1,974,862 | D |
07 Jun 2023 17:25 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chairman | 05 May 2023 | Sale A | 5,000 | 386.995 | 1,934,975 | D |
08 May 2023 12:51 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chairman | 05 May 2023 | Sale | 5,000 | 386.995 | 1,934,975 | D |
08 Aug 2024 12:28 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MOORE H LYNN JR | President and CEO | 06 Aug 2024 | Sale | 3,250 | 575.68 | 1,870,960 | D |
03 May 2023 12:38 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MOORE H LYNN JR | President and CEO | 03 May 2023 | Sale | 4,905.4 | 379.4145 | 1,861,184 | D |
17 Nov 2023 15:36 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chairman | 15 Nov 2023 | Sale | 4,296 | 419.0703 | 1,800,326 | D |
16 Sep 2024 13:32 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MOORE H LYNN JR | President and CEO | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 3,100 | 575.2984 | 1,783,425 | D |
26 Feb 2024 16:45 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MOORE H LYNN JR | President and CEO | 22 Feb 2024 | Sale | 4,028 | 436.8338 | 1,759,567 | D |
15 Nov 2023 11:45 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MILLER BRIAN K | Executive VP and CFO | 13 Nov 2023 | Sale | 4,228 | 416.0037 | 1,758,864 | D |
09 May 2024 16:42 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MOORE H LYNN JR | President and CEO | 07 May 2024 | Sale | 3,625 | 481.6743 | 1,746,069 | D |
22 Feb 2024 12:56 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MOORE H LYNN JR | President and CEO | 20 Feb 2024 | Sale | 3,860 | 434.9882 | 1,679,054 | D |
27 Feb 2024 17:13 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chair of the Board | 26 Feb 2024 | Sale | 3,800 | 439.2154 | 1,669,019 | D |
16 Nov 2023 11:59 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chairman | 14 Nov 2023 | Sale | 3,886 | 421.9759 | 1,639,798 | D |
14 Nov 2023 15:26 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MILLER BRIAN K | Executive VP and CFO | 10 Nov 2023 | Sale | 3,858 | 414.4219 | 1,598,840 | D |
13 Mar 2023 18:03 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chairman | 09 Mar 2023 | Sale | 4,868 | 325.8829 | 1,586,398 | D |
14 Nov 2023 15:26 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MILLER BRIAN K | Executive VP and CFO | 10 Nov 2023 | Sale | 3,742 | 415.5244 | 1,554,892 | D |
12 Aug 2024 15:38 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chair of the Board | 09 Aug 2024 | Sale | 2,664 | 574.0982 | 1,529,398 | D |
06 Sep 2023 11:12 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MOORE H LYNN JR | President and CEO | 01 Sep 2023 | Sale | 3,780 | 396.4673 | 1,498,646 | D |
26 Feb 2024 16:45 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MOORE H LYNN JR | President and CEO | 22 Feb 2024 | Sale | 3,384 | 434.8226 | 1,471,440 | D |
13 Mar 2024 16:29 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | PUCKETT JEFFREY DAVID | Chief Operating Officer | 11 Mar 2024 | Sale | 3,400 | 426.2517 | 1,449,256 | D |
07 Mar 2023 17:50 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MOORE H LYNN JR | President and CEO | 03 Mar 2023 | Sale | 4,417 | 326.64 | 1,442,769 | D |
09 May 2024 16:42 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MOORE H LYNN JR | President and CEO | 08 May 2024 | Sale | 2,961 | 479.4678 | 1,419,704 | D |
16 Nov 2023 11:59 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chairman | 14 Nov 2023 | Sale | 3,161 | 420.9145 | 1,330,511 | D |
22 Aug 2024 14:59 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chair of the Board | 21 Aug 2024 | Sale | 2,295 | 578.2692 | 1,327,128 | D |
16 May 2024 17:53 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chair of the Board | 14 May 2024 | Sale | 2,600 | 482.0969 | 1,253,452 | D |
22 Aug 2024 14:59 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chair of the Board | 20 Aug 2024 | Sale | 2,102 | 578.0109 | 1,214,979 | D |
16 May 2024 17:53 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chair of the Board | 15 May 2024 | Sale | 2,450 | 491.3284 | 1,203,755 | D |
09 Sep 2024 16:22 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | CARTER GLENN A | Director | 05 Sep 2024 | Sale | 2,050 | 582.0243 | 1,193,150 | D |
13 Mar 2023 16:47 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MILLER BRIAN K | Executive VP and CFO | 09 Mar 2023 | Sale | 3,639 | 325.8909 | 1,185,917 | D |
07 Jun 2024 18:07 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chair of the Board | 05 Jun 2024 | Sale | 2,359 | 482.5166 | 1,138,257 | D |
03 May 2023 18:04 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MILLER BRIAN K | Executive VP and CFO | 02 May 2023 | Sale | 3,000 | 378.62 | 1,135,860 | D |
07 Jun 2024 18:07 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chair of the Board | 05 Jun 2024 | Sale | 2,354 | 481.8501 | 1,134,275 | D |
22 Aug 2024 14:59 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chair of the Board | 21 Aug 2024 | Sale | 1,942 | 579.1617 | 1,124,732 | D |
27 Feb 2024 17:13 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chair of the Board | 23 Feb 2024 | Sale | 2,559 | 437.5373 | 1,119,658 | D |
06 Dec 2023 13:20 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chairman | 05 Dec 2023 | Sale | 2,738 | 408.7852 | 1,119,254 | I |
16 Nov 2023 11:59 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chairman | 14 Nov 2023 | Sale | 2,653 | 419.97 | 1,114,180 | D |
23 Feb 2023 16:21 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MILLER BRIAN K | Executive VP and CFO | 22 Feb 2023 | Sale | 3,310 | 334.6276 | 1,107,617 | D |
08 Aug 2024 12:28 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MOORE H LYNN JR | President and CEO | 06 Aug 2024 | Sale | 1,900 | 577.1358 | 1,096,558 | D |
07 Jun 2024 18:07 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chair of the Board | 06 Jun 2024 | Sale | 2,228 | 487.3159 | 1,085,740 | D |
22 Aug 2024 14:59 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chair of the Board | 20 Aug 2024 | Sale | 1,881 | 577.0136 | 1,085,363 | D |
13 Mar 2024 16:37 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MOORE H LYNN JR | President and CEO | 11 Mar 2024 | Sale | 2,500 | 426.0194 | 1,065,048 | D |
27 Feb 2024 17:13 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chair of the Board | 26 Feb 2024 | Sale | 2,400 | 438.4317 | 1,052,236 | D |
23 Feb 2023 16:21 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MILLER BRIAN K | Executive VP and CFO | 21 Feb 2023 | Sale | 3,003 | 336.8957 | 1,011,698 | D |
16 Sep 2024 13:32 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MOORE H LYNN JR | President and CEO | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 1,700 | 578.6053 | 983,629 | D |
10 May 2023 15:37 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | PUCKETT JEFFREY DAVID | Chief Operating Officer | 09 May 2023 | Sale | 2,483 | 389.34 | 966,731 | D |
11 Sep 2024 15:25 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MILLER BRIAN K | Executive VP and CFO | 09 Sep 2024 | Sale | 1,600 | 585.5728 | 936,916 | D |
09 Nov 2023 10:46 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MOORE H LYNN JR | President and CEO | 07 Nov 2023 | Sale | 2,263 | 413.6497 | 936,089 | D |
27 Feb 2024 17:13 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chair of the Board | 23 Feb 2024 | Sale | 2,111 | 438.2881 | 925,226 | D |
26 Feb 2024 16:45 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MOORE H LYNN JR | President and CEO | 22 Feb 2024 | Sale | 2,088 | 435.8658 | 910,088 | D |
14 Mar 2024 17:18 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chair of the Board | 12 Mar 2024 | Sale | 2,122 | 426.4523 | 904,932 | D |
12 Aug 2024 15:38 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chair of the Board | 08 Aug 2024 | Sale | 1,558 | 577.2584 | 899,369 | D |
28 Feb 2024 15:54 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MOORE H LYNN JR | President and CEO | 26 Feb 2024 | Sale | 2,016 | 442.3228 | 891,723 | D |
11 Mar 2024 17:37 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MOORE H LYNN JR | President and CEO | 08 Mar 2024 | Sale | 2,000.8 | 423.8581 | 848,043 | D |
13 Dec 2023 16:33 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chairman | 11 Dec 2023 | Sale | 2,076 | 403.9371 | 838,573 | D |
03 Sep 2024 17:31 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MILLER BRIAN K | Executive VP and CFO | 30 Aug 2024 | Sale | 1,400 | 589.3175 | 825,044 | D |
28 Feb 2024 15:54 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MOORE H LYNN JR | President and CEO | 26 Feb 2024 | Sale | 1,856 | 443.2854 | 822,738 | D |
06 Dec 2023 13:20 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chairman | 05 Dec 2023 | Sale | 2,000 | 409.6821 | 819,364 | I |
15 Nov 2022 17:29 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MILLER BRIAN K | Executive VP and CFO | 11 Nov 2022 | Sale | 2,500 | 321.7263 | 804,316 | D |
22 Feb 2024 12:56 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MOORE H LYNN JR | President and CEO | 20 Feb 2024 | Sale | 1,853 | 434.0498 | 804,294 | D |
09 Aug 2024 18:44 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MILLER BRIAN K | Executive VP and CFO | 07 Aug 2024 | Sale | 1,415 | 567.6689 | 803,251 | D |
12 Aug 2024 15:38 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chair of the Board | 08 Aug 2024 | Sale | 1,394 | 576.213 | 803,241 | D |
07 May 2024 16:28 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MILLER BRIAN K | Executive VP and CFO | 03 May 2024 | Sale | 1,714 | 464.7738 | 796,622 | D |
09 May 2024 16:42 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MOORE H LYNN JR | President and CEO | 07 May 2024 | Sale | 1,625 | 482.1642 | 783,517 | D |
14 Nov 2023 11:49 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | POPE DANIEL M | Director | 10 Nov 2023 | Sale | 1,853 | 419.132 | 776,652 | D |
28 Feb 2024 16:20 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MILLER BRIAN K | Executive VP and CFO | 26 Feb 2024 | Sale | 1,739 | 442.799 | 770,027 | D |
11 Mar 2024 17:54 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | PUCKETT JEFFREY DAVID | Chief Operating Officer | 07 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,800 | 423.38 | 762,084 | D |
17 Nov 2023 15:36 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chairman | 15 Nov 2023 | Sale | 1,817 | 418.1646 | 759,805 | D |
28 Feb 2024 15:54 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MOORE H LYNN JR | President and CEO | 26 Feb 2024 | Sale | 1,693 | 441.153 | 746,872 | D |
14 Mar 2024 17:18 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chair of the Board | 12 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,721 | 427.5825 | 735,869 | D |
13 Mar 2023 18:03 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chairman | 10 Mar 2023 | Sale | 2,332 | 313.4646 | 730,999 | D |
29 Feb 2024 13:00 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | CARTER GLENN A | Director | 27 Feb 2024 | Sale | 1,650 | 437.8403 | 722,436 | D |
19 Dec 2023 10:57 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MILLER BRIAN K | Executive VP and CFO | 15 Dec 2023 | Sale | 1,779 | 405.8425 | 721,994 | D |
14 Dec 2023 16:10 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MILLER BRIAN K | Executive VP and CFO | 12 Dec 2023 | Sale | 1,754 | 406.2438 | 712,552 | D |
14 Mar 2024 17:18 | TYL | TYLER TECHNOLOGIES INC | MARR JOHN S JR | Executive Chair of the Board | 13 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,625 | 423.8745 | 688,796 | D |
* D/I = Direct / Indirect
* 10% = Entity with 10% or higher ownership stake
* A = Amendment Filing (SEC Form 4/A)