Real Time Insider Transaction Data
Real Time Insider buys and sells Data - Insider Trades - Insider Transactions - Insider Trading Data - SEC Form 4 Data
Total | Transactions | Amount |
Buys | 0 | $0 |
Sells | 144 | $71,660,479 |
Security | Reporting Name | Relationship | Purchase/Sale | Shares | Price $ | D/I | ||||
27 Aug 2024 17:23 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | JESSUP R JUDD | Director | 23 Aug 2024 | Sale | 2,500 | 311.6 | 779,000 | D |
23 Aug 2024 18:40 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | O'BRIEN BRANDON | Chief Financial Officer | 21 Aug 2024 | Sale | 1,000 | 314.9751 | 314,975 | D |
21 Aug 2024 16:44 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | O'BRIEN BRANDON | Chief Financial Officer | 19 Aug 2024 | Sale A | 157 | 313.25 | 49,180 | D |
21 Aug 2024 16:44 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | O'BRIEN BRANDON | Chief Financial Officer | 19 Aug 2024 | Sale A | 6 | 314.335 | 1,886 | D |
21 Aug 2024 16:44 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | O'BRIEN BRANDON | Chief Financial Officer | 19 Aug 2024 | Sale A | 5 | 314.63 | 1,573 | D |
21 Aug 2024 16:44 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | O'BRIEN BRANDON | Chief Financial Officer | 19 Aug 2024 | Sale A | 80 | 314.655 | 25,172 | D |
21 Aug 2024 16:44 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | O'BRIEN BRANDON | Chief Financial Officer | 19 Aug 2024 | Sale A | 3 | 314.94 | 945 | D |
21 Aug 2024 16:44 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | O'BRIEN BRANDON | Chief Financial Officer | 19 Aug 2024 | Sale A | 6 | 314.945 | 1,890 | D |
21 Aug 2024 16:44 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | O'BRIEN BRANDON | Chief Financial Officer | 19 Aug 2024 | Sale A | 84 | 314.95 | 26,456 | D |
21 Aug 2024 16:44 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | O'BRIEN BRANDON | Chief Financial Officer | 19 Aug 2024 | Sale A | 144 | 316.26 | 45,541 | D |
21 Aug 2024 16:44 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | O'BRIEN BRANDON | Chief Financial Officer | 19 Aug 2024 | Sale A | 15 | 316.45 | 4,747 | D |
14 Aug 2024 18:15 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | COMBS MICHAEL G | CEO & President | 12 Aug 2024 | Sale | 2,473 | 300.9877 | 744,343 | D |
14 Aug 2024 12:57 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | JESSUP R JUDD | Director | 08 Aug 2024 | Sale | 2,131 | 295.21 | 629,093 | D |
13 Aug 2024 21:10 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | SHISHIN MAXIM | Chief Information Officer | 12 Aug 2024 | Sale | 2,125 | 299.8492 | 637,180 | D |
13 Aug 2024 21:10 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | SHISHIN MAXIM | Chief Information Officer | 12 Aug 2024 | Sale | 2,550 | 299.8492 | 764,615 | D |
13 Aug 2024 21:10 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | SHISHIN MAXIM | Chief Information Officer | 12 Aug 2024 | Sale | 3,400 | 299.8492 | 1,019,487 | D |
13 Aug 2024 19:45 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | BERTELS MARK E. | EVP - Risk Management Services | 12 Aug 2024 | Sale | 300 | 299.8045 | 89,941 | D |
05 Aug 2024 20:05 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | HOOPS ALAN | Director | 02 Aug 2024 | Sale | 4,500 | 300 | 1,350,000 | I |
05 Aug 2024 20:05 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | HOOPS ALAN | Director | 02 Aug 2024 | Sale | 1,700 | 300 | 510,000 | D |
05 Aug 2024 18:05 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | O'BRIEN BRANDON | Chief Financial Officer | 02 Aug 2024 | Sale | 25 | 300.0843 | 7,502 | D |
05 Aug 2024 18:05 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | O'BRIEN BRANDON | Chief Financial Officer | 02 Aug 2024 | Sale | 62 | 300.0843 | 18,605 | D |
05 Aug 2024 18:05 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | O'BRIEN BRANDON | Chief Financial Officer | 02 Aug 2024 | Sale | 13 | 300.0843 | 3,901 | D |
05 Aug 2024 18:05 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | O'BRIEN BRANDON | Chief Financial Officer | 02 Aug 2024 | Sale | 400 | 300.0843 | 120,034 | D |
05 Aug 2024 16:14 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | YOSS JENNIFER | Vice President of Accounting | 01 Aug 2024 | Sale | 300 | 300.8457 | 90,254 | D |
05 Aug 2024 16:14 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | YOSS JENNIFER | Vice President of Accounting | 01 Aug 2024 | Sale | 914 | 300.8891 | 275,013 | D |
05 Aug 2024 15:09 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | HAMERSLAG STEVEN J | Director | 01 Aug 2024 | Sale | 3,468 | 304.3369 | 1,055,440 | D |
26 Jul 2024 18:20 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CORSTAR HOLDINGS INC | 10% | 11 Jul 2024 | Sale | 922 | 262.77 | 242,274 | D |
16 Jul 2024 20:15 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CORSTAR HOLDINGS INC | 10% | 16 Jul 2024 | Sale | 5,000 | 271.77 | 1,358,850 | D |
16 Jul 2024 20:15 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CORSTAR HOLDINGS INC | 10% | 16 Jul 2024 | Sale | 1,540 | 270.77 | 416,986 | D |
16 Jul 2024 20:15 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CORSTAR HOLDINGS INC | 10% | 15 Jul 2024 | Sale | 5,000 | 269.77 | 1,348,850 | D |
16 Jul 2024 20:15 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CORSTAR HOLDINGS INC | 10% | 15 Jul 2024 | Sale | 3,460 | 270.77 | 936,864 | D |
16 Jul 2024 20:15 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CORSTAR HOLDINGS INC | 10% | 15 Jul 2024 | Sale | 5,000 | 268.77 | 1,343,850 | D |
16 Jul 2024 20:15 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CORSTAR HOLDINGS INC | 10% | 15 Jul 2024 | Sale | 5,000 | 267.77 | 1,338,850 | D |
16 Jul 2024 20:15 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CORSTAR HOLDINGS INC | 10% | 12 Jul 2024 | Sale | 5,000 | 266.77 | 1,333,850 | D |
16 Jul 2024 20:15 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CORSTAR HOLDINGS INC | 10% | 12 Jul 2024 | Sale | 5,000 | 265.77 | 1,328,850 | D |
16 Jul 2024 20:15 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CORSTAR HOLDINGS INC | 10% | 12 Jul 2024 | Sale | 5,000 | 264.77 | 1,323,850 | D |
16 Jul 2024 20:15 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CORSTAR HOLDINGS INC | 10% | 12 Jul 2024 | Sale | 5,000 | 263.77 | 1,318,850 | D |
16 Jul 2024 20:15 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CORSTAR HOLDINGS INC | 10% | 12 Jul 2024 | Sale | 3,429 | 262.77 | 901,038 | D |
10 Jul 2024 14:20 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CORSTAR HOLDINGS INC | 10% | 08 Jul 2024 | Sale | 649 | 262.77 | 170,538 | D |
10 Jul 2024 14:20 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CORSTAR HOLDINGS INC | 10% | 08 Jul 2024 | Sale | 5,000 | 261.77 | 1,308,850 | D |
10 Jul 2024 14:20 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CORSTAR HOLDINGS INC | 10% | 08 Jul 2024 | Sale | 5,000 | 260.77 | 1,303,850 | D |
13 Jun 2024 17:21 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | MICHAEL JEFFREY J | Director , 10% | 11 Jun 2024 | Sale | 3,000 | 232.446 | 697,338 | D |
12 Jun 2024 15:54 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | BERTELS MARK E. | EVP - Risk Management Services | 10 Jun 2024 | Sale | 200 | 231.1404 | 46,228 | D |
29 May 2024 17:00 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CLEMONS V GORDON | Chairman of the Board | 24 May 2024 | Sale | 2,000 | 277 | 554,000 | I |
29 May 2024 14:29 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | O'BRIEN BRANDON | Chief Financial Officer | 24 May 2024 | Sale | 1,000 | 276.9461 | 276,946 | D |
26 Feb 2024 17:23 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | MACINO JEAN | Director | 22 Feb 2024 | Sale | 3,130 | 253.42 | 793,205 | D |
23 Feb 2024 19:14 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CLEMONS V GORDON | Chairman of the Board | 21 Feb 2024 | Sale | 1,000 | 264 | 264,000 | I |
22 Feb 2024 18:32 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | O'BRIEN BRANDON | Chief Financial Officer | 21 Feb 2024 | Sale | 375 | 260 | 97,500 | D |
22 Feb 2024 18:32 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | O'BRIEN BRANDON | Chief Financial Officer | 21 Feb 2024 | Sale | 438 | 260 | 113,880 | D |
20 Feb 2024 15:47 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CLEMONS V GORDON | Chairman of the Board | 16 Feb 2024 | Sale | 1,000 | 250 | 250,000 | I |
16 Feb 2024 18:52 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | COMBS MICHAEL G | CEO & President | 15 Feb 2024 | Sale | 1,799 | 248.4141 | 446,897 | D |
16 Feb 2024 18:11 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | SHISHIN MAXIM | Chief Information Officer | 14 Feb 2024 | Sale | 1,500 | 242.75 | 364,125 | D |
15 Feb 2024 17:27 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | COMBS MICHAEL G | CEO & President | 13 Feb 2024 | Sale | 301 | 246.8241 | 74,294 | D |
14 Feb 2024 12:44 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CLEMONS V GORDON | Chairman of the Board | 12 Feb 2024 | Sale | 1,000 | 248 | 248,000 | I |
14 Feb 2024 12:44 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CLEMONS V GORDON | Chairman of the Board | 09 Feb 2024 | Sale | 2,000 | 243.0033 | 486,007 | I |
09 Feb 2024 21:51 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | HAMERSLAG STEVEN J | Director | 09 Feb 2024 | Sale | 290 | 242.32 | 70,273 | I |
09 Feb 2024 21:51 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | HAMERSLAG STEVEN J | Director | 09 Feb 2024 | Sale | 430 | 241.42 | 103,811 | I |
09 Feb 2024 21:51 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | HAMERSLAG STEVEN J | Director | 09 Feb 2024 | Sale | 255 | 240.27 | 61,269 | I |
09 Feb 2024 21:51 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | HAMERSLAG STEVEN J | Director | 09 Feb 2024 | Sale | 1,019 | 239.52 | 244,071 | I |
09 Feb 2024 21:51 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | HAMERSLAG STEVEN J | Director | 08 Feb 2024 | Sale | 808 | 240.36 | 194,211 | I |
09 Feb 2024 21:51 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | HAMERSLAG STEVEN J | Director | 09 Feb 2024 | Sale | 927 | 238.21 | 220,821 | I |
09 Feb 2024 21:51 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | HAMERSLAG STEVEN J | Director | 08 Feb 2024 | Sale | 1,192 | 239.67 | 285,687 | I |
05 Feb 2024 13:26 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CLEMONS V GORDON | Chairman of the Board | 01 Feb 2024 | Sale | 3,000 | 239.7047 | 719,114 | I |
05 Feb 2024 12:58 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | YOSS JENNIFER | Vice President of Accounting | 01 Feb 2024 | Sale | 1,500 | 239.4079 | 359,112 | D |
13 Dec 2023 16:12 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | O'BRIEN BRANDON | Chief Financial Officer | 11 Dec 2023 | Sale | 300 | 224.89 | 67,467 | D |
16 Nov 2023 16:54 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CLEMONS V GORDON | Chairman of the Board | 14 Nov 2023 | Sale | 8,000 | 210.4406 | 1,683,525 | I |
06 Nov 2023 10:21 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CLEMONS V GORDON | Chairman of the Board | 03 Nov 2023 | Sale | 1,000 | 206 | 206,000 | I |
06 Nov 2023 10:21 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CLEMONS V GORDON | Chairman of the Board | 02 Nov 2023 | Sale | 1,000 | 200 | 200,000 | I |
19 Sep 2023 13:26 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CLEMONS V GORDON | Chairman of the Board | 15 Sep 2023 | Sale | 5,000 | 200.0159 | 1,000,079 | I |
31 Aug 2023 18:26 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CLEMONS V GORDON | Chairman of the Board | 31 Aug 2023 | Sale | 1,021 | 220 | 224,620 | I |
31 Aug 2023 18:26 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CLEMONS V GORDON | Chairman of the Board | 30 Aug 2023 | Sale | 979 | 220 | 215,380 | I |
31 Aug 2023 18:26 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CLEMONS V GORDON | Chairman of the Board | 29 Aug 2023 | Sale | 1,000 | 216 | 216,000 | I |
28 Aug 2023 17:09 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CLEMONS V GORDON | Chairman of the Board | 24 Aug 2023 | Sale | 1,000 | 220 | 220,000 | I |
17 Aug 2023 21:15 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | HAMERSLAG STEVEN J | Director | 15 Aug 2023 | Sale A | 75 | 221.82 | 16,636 | I |
17 Aug 2023 21:15 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | HAMERSLAG STEVEN J | Director | 15 Aug 2023 | Sale A | 6,723 | 222.76 | 1,497,615 | I |
17 Aug 2023 21:15 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | HAMERSLAG STEVEN J | Director | 15 Aug 2023 | Sale A | 102 | 223.81 | 22,829 | I |
17 Aug 2023 21:15 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | HAMERSLAG STEVEN J | Director | 15 Aug 2023 | Sale A | 1,097 | 225.3 | 247,154 | I |
17 Aug 2023 21:15 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | HAMERSLAG STEVEN J | Director | 15 Aug 2023 | Sale A | 3 | 226.5 | 680 | I |
17 Aug 2023 20:28 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | SHISHIN MAXIM | Chief Information Officer | 15 Aug 2023 | Sale | 2,346 | 224.6833 | 527,107 | D |
15 Aug 2023 18:29 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CLEMONS V GORDON | Chairman of the Board | 14 Aug 2023 | Sale | 3,000 | 220.7128 | 662,138 | I |
15 Aug 2023 18:29 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CLEMONS V GORDON | Chairman of the Board | 11 Aug 2023 | Sale | 2,000 | 220 | 440,000 | I |
15 Aug 2023 17:20 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | COMBS MICHAEL G | CEO & President | 11 Aug 2023 | Sale | 4,130 | 222.8237 | 920,262 | D |
14 Aug 2023 18:06 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | MACINO JEAN | Director | 10 Aug 2023 | Sale | 2,000 | 221.0216 | 442,043 | D |
11 Aug 2023 09:38 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | JESSUP R JUDD | Director | 09 Aug 2023 | Sale | 2,220 | 217.85 | 483,627 | D |
09 Aug 2023 19:41 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | JESSUP R JUDD | Director | 07 Aug 2023 | Sale | 300 | 216.18 | 64,854 | D |
09 Aug 2023 18:57 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CLEMONS V GORDON | Chairman of the Board | 09 Aug 2023 | Sale | 2,000 | 221.0517 | 442,103 | I |
09 Aug 2023 18:57 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CLEMONS V GORDON | Chairman of the Board | 08 Aug 2023 | Sale | 2,000 | 215 | 430,000 | I |
09 Aug 2023 18:57 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CLEMONS V GORDON | Chairman of the Board | 07 Aug 2023 | Sale | 2,000 | 215 | 430,000 | I |
07 Aug 2023 18:16 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | BERTELS MARK E. | EVP - Risk Management Services | 04 Aug 2023 | Sale | 250 | 215 | 53,750 | D |
07 Aug 2023 07:37 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CLEMONS V GORDON | Chairman of the Board | 04 Aug 2023 | Sale | 2,000 | 215 | 430,000 | I |
07 Aug 2023 07:37 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CLEMONS V GORDON | Chairman of the Board | 03 Aug 2023 | Sale | 2,000 | 215.237 | 430,474 | I |
20 Jun 2023 12:53 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | SHISHIN MAXIM | Chief Information Officer | 15 Jun 2023 | Sale | 1,746 | 191.104 | 333,668 | D |
20 Jun 2023 12:53 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | SHISHIN MAXIM | Chief Information Officer | 15 Jun 2023 | Sale | 1,054 | 191.104 | 201,424 | D |
09 Jun 2023 18:34 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | MACINO JEAN | Director | 07 Jun 2023 | Sale | 1,000 | 204.5302 | 204,530 | D |
08 Jun 2023 19:14 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CLEMONS V GORDON | Chairman of the Board | 07 Jun 2023 | Sale | 2,000 | 206.1138 | 412,228 | I |
08 Jun 2023 19:14 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CLEMONS V GORDON | Chairman of the Board | 06 Jun 2023 | Sale | 1,000 | 200 | 200,000 | I |
08 Jun 2023 18:49 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | BERTELS MARK E. | EVP - Risk Management Services | 06 Jun 2023 | Sale | 500 | 205 | 102,500 | D |
06 Apr 2023 19:35 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CORSTAR HOLDINGS INC | 10% | 04 Apr 2023 | Sale | 10,000 | 192.5 | 1,925,000 | D |
22 Mar 2023 18:24 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CORSTAR HOLDINGS INC | 10% | 21 Mar 2023 | Sale | 10,000 | 190.5 | 1,905,000 | D |
22 Mar 2023 18:24 | CRVL | CORVEL CORP | CORSTAR HOLDINGS INC | 10% | 20 Mar 2023 | Sale | 10,000 | 188.5 | 1,885,000 | D |
* D/I = Direct / Indirect
* 10% = Entity with 10% or higher ownership stake
* A = Amendment Filing (SEC Form 4/A)