Real Time Insider Transaction Data
Real Time Insider buys and sells Data - Insider Trades - Insider Transactions - Insider Trading Data - SEC Form 4 Data
Total | Transactions | Amount |
Buys | 0 | $0 |
Sells | 97 | $783,053,476 |
Security | Reporting Name | Relationship | Purchase/Sale | Shares | Price $ | D/I | ||||
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 11 Apr 2024 | Sale | 1 | 134.95 | 135 | I |
03 Feb 2023 20:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 02 Feb 2023 | Sale | 100 | 86 | 8,600 | I |
15 Nov 2022 21:32 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 11 Nov 2022 | Sale | 170 | 85.23 | 14,489 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 22 Mar 2024 | Sale | 304 | 135.96 | 41,332 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 418 | 132.61 | 55,431 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 591 | 134.23 | 79,330 | I |
09 Apr 2024 20:06 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 08 Apr 2024 | Sale | 700 | 135.59 | 94,913 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 800 | 132.72 | 106,176 | I |
09 Apr 2024 20:06 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 09 Apr 2024 | Sale | 800 | 135.93 | 108,744 | I |
26 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 26 Mar 2024 | Sale | 873 | 134.74 | 117,628 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 971 | 134.83 | 130,920 | I |
28 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 27 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,182 | 134.53 | 159,014 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,423 | 130.07 | 185,090 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 12 Apr 2024 | Sale | 1,554 | 133.35 | 207,226 | I |
19 Apr 2024 18:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 17 Apr 2024 | Sale | 1,600 | 132.48 | 211,968 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,600 | 135.7 | 217,120 | I |
28 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 28 Mar 2024 | Sale | 2,018 | 131.88 | 266,134 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 10 Apr 2024 | Sale | 2,107 | 131.9 | 277,913 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 2,871 | 131.89 | 378,656 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 03 Apr 2024 | Sale | 2,902 | 132.83 | 385,473 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 3,590 | 130.95 | 470,110 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 03 Apr 2024 | Sale | 4,342 | 131.49 | 570,930 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 01 Apr 2024 | Sale | 5,005 | 130.83 | 654,804 | I |
09 Feb 2023 21:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 09 Feb 2023 | Sale | 7,601 | 87.1 | 662,047 | I |
28 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 28 Mar 2024 | Sale | 5,363 | 133.59 | 716,443 | I |
15 Nov 2022 21:32 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 11 Nov 2022 | Sale | 9,106 | 83.89 | 763,902 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 5,950 | 131.17 | 780,461 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 6,077 | 130.1 | 790,618 | I |
09 Apr 2024 20:06 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 09 Apr 2024 | Sale | 5,962 | 135.14 | 805,705 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 6,214 | 132.4 | 822,734 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 6,335 | 133.49 | 845,659 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 22 Mar 2024 | Sale | 6,596 | 135.22 | 891,911 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 6,901 | 131.42 | 906,929 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 7,309 | 133.39 | 974,948 | I |
26 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 25 Mar 2024 | Sale | 7,645 | 134.27 | 1,026,494 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 01 Apr 2024 | Sale | 8,359 | 132.37 | 1,106,481 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 22 Mar 2024 | Sale | 8,404 | 134.03 | 1,126,388 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 8,707 | 130.85 | 1,139,311 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 9,017 | 132.74 | 1,196,917 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 16 Apr 2024 | Sale | 9,727 | 128.46 | 1,249,530 | I |
10 Feb 2023 20:08 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 10 Feb 2023 | Sale | 16,879 | 85.12 | 1,436,740 | I |
26 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 25 Mar 2024 | Sale | 11,236 | 133.75 | 1,502,815 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 11,411 | 132.04 | 1,506,708 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 04 Apr 2024 | Sale | 14,098 | 133.64 | 1,884,057 | I |
09 Feb 2023 21:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 09 Feb 2023 | Sale | 21,943 | 85.9 | 1,884,904 | I |
28 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 27 Mar 2024 | Sale | 14,965 | 131.87 | 1,973,435 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 10 Apr 2024 | Sale | 15,067 | 133.59 | 2,012,801 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 02 Apr 2024 | Sale | 15,874 | 128.97 | 2,047,270 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 02 Apr 2024 | Sale | 16,105 | 129.66 | 2,088,174 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 05 Apr 2024 | Sale | 16,033 | 132.53 | 2,124,853 | I |
28 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 27 Mar 2024 | Sale | 16,057 | 133.36 | 2,141,362 | I |
03 Feb 2023 20:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 01 Feb 2023 | Sale | 25,269 | 85.19 | 2,152,666 | I |
28 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 27 Mar 2024 | Sale | 16,368 | 132.65 | 2,171,215 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 18,362 | 130.71 | 2,400,097 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 02 Apr 2024 | Sale | 18,738 | 130.61 | 2,447,370 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 12 Apr 2024 | Sale | 20,014 | 132.63 | 2,654,457 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 01 Apr 2024 | Sale | 20,578 | 131.71 | 2,710,328 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 20,389 | 137.45 | 2,802,468 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 05 Apr 2024 | Sale | 22,166 | 131.78 | 2,921,035 | I |
10 Nov 2022 20:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 10 Nov 2022 | Sale | 36,569 | 83.47 | 3,052,414 | I |
26 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 26 Mar 2024 | Sale | 22,923 | 133.91 | 3,069,619 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 29,503 | 129.31 | 3,815,033 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 16 Apr 2024 | Sale | 29,589 | 129.33 | 3,826,745 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 31,015 | 132.21 | 4,100,493 | I |
28 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 28 Mar 2024 | Sale | 33,119 | 133.05 | 4,406,483 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 34,668 | 128.5 | 4,454,838 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 34,834 | 136.77 | 4,764,246 | I |
19 Apr 2024 18:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 17 Apr 2024 | Sale | 37,193 | 131.08 | 4,875,258 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 03 Apr 2024 | Sale | 38,740 | 132.13 | 5,118,716 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 16 Apr 2024 | Sale | 39,952 | 130.17 | 5,200,552 | I |
10 Nov 2022 20:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 09 Nov 2022 | Sale | 70,854 | 80.21 | 5,683,199 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 10 Apr 2024 | Sale | 43,319 | 135.07 | 5,851,097 | I |
09 Apr 2024 20:06 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 08 Apr 2024 | Sale | 48,378 | 134.23 | 6,493,779 | I |
09 Feb 2023 21:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 07 Feb 2023 | Sale | 76,016 | 85.49 | 6,498,608 | I |
15 Nov 2022 21:32 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 11 Nov 2022 | Sale | 77,006 | 84.81 | 6,530,879 | I |
10 Nov 2022 20:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 10 Nov 2022 | Sale | 77,644 | 84.92 | 6,593,528 | I |
09 Apr 2024 20:06 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 09 Apr 2024 | Sale | 50,953 | 132.46 | 6,749,234 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 04 Apr 2024 | Sale | 52,868 | 132.93 | 7,027,743 | I |
09 Apr 2024 20:06 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 09 Apr 2024 | Sale | 57,017 | 133.93 | 7,636,287 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 11 Apr 2024 | Sale | 58,459 | 133.72 | 7,817,137 | I |
03 Feb 2023 20:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 03 Feb 2023 | Sale | 94,211 | 85.13 | 8,020,182 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 05 Apr 2024 | Sale | 65,295 | 134.25 | 8,765,854 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 05 Apr 2024 | Sale | 71,658 | 133.72 | 9,582,108 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 16 Apr 2024 | Sale | 80,592 | 130.92 | 10,551,105 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 10 Apr 2024 | Sale | 79,422 | 134.18 | 10,656,844 | I |
09 Feb 2023 21:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 09 Feb 2023 | Sale | 126,933 | 86.3 | 10,954,318 | I |
03 Feb 2023 20:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 02 Feb 2023 | Sale | 138,332 | 85.33 | 11,803,870 | I |
10 Nov 2022 20:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 08 Nov 2022 | Sale | 148,954 | 80.1 | 11,931,215 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 12 Apr 2024 | Sale | 92,924 | 131.8 | 12,247,383 | I |
09 Apr 2024 20:06 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 09 Apr 2024 | Sale | 97,905 | 133.06 | 13,027,239 | I |
19 Apr 2024 18:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 17 Apr 2024 | Sale | 104,776 | 131.65 | 13,793,760 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 04 Apr 2024 | Sale | 111,499 | 132.27 | 14,747,973 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 11 Apr 2024 | Sale | 116,540 | 134.31 | 15,652,487 | I |
09 Apr 2024 20:06 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 08 Apr 2024 | Sale | 125,180 | 135.14 | 16,916,825 | I |
09 Feb 2023 21:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 08 Feb 2023 | Sale | 230,655 | 85.34 | 19,684,098 | I |
10 Nov 2022 20:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 10 Nov 2022 | Sale | 341,758 | 84.39 | 28,840,958 | I |
08 Mar 2024 16:18 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 07 Mar 2024 | Sale | 3,000,000 | 130.3 | 390,900,000 | I |
* D/I = Direct / Indirect
* 10% = Entity with 10% or higher ownership stake
* A = Amendment Filing (SEC Form 4/A)