Real Time Insider Transaction Data
Real Time Insider buys and sells Data - Insider Trades - Insider Transactions - Insider Trading Data - SEC Form 4 Data
Total | Transactions | Amount |
Buys | 0 | $0 |
Sells | 56 | $65,479,330 |
Security | Reporting Name | Relationship | Purchase/Sale | Shares | Price $ | D/I | ||||
01 Nov 2022 16:30 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | SOLOMON DAVID M | Chairman of the Board and CEO | 28 Oct 2022 | Sale | 926 | 341.53 | 316,257 | D |
01 Nov 2022 16:30 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | SOLOMON DAVID M | Chairman of the Board and CEO | 28 Oct 2022 | Sale | 6,474 | 341.11 | 2,208,346 | D |
16 Nov 2022 16:30 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | LEE BRIAN J | Chief Risk Officer | 14 Nov 2022 | Sale | 2,634 | 386.33 | 1,017,593 | D |
16 Nov 2022 16:30 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | LEE BRIAN J | Chief Risk Officer | 14 Nov 2022 | Sale | 7,366 | 385.67 | 2,840,845 | D |
25 Nov 2022 13:00 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | WALDRON JOHN E. | President and COO | 25 Nov 2022 | Sale | 3,371 | 385.98 | 1,301,139 | D |
25 Nov 2022 13:00 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | WALDRON JOHN E. | President and COO | 23 Nov 2022 | Sale | 3,370 | 387.1 | 1,304,527 | D |
25 Nov 2022 13:00 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | WALDRON JOHN E. | President and COO | 22 Nov 2022 | Sale | 5,176 | 383.82 | 1,986,652 | D |
25 Nov 2022 13:00 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | WALDRON JOHN E. | President and COO | 22 Nov 2022 | Sale | 1,564 | 383.14 | 599,231 | D |
05 Dec 2022 18:03 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | LESLIE ERICKA T | Chief Administrative Officer | 11 Nov 2022 | Sale | 215 | 380 | 81,700 | D |
21 Apr 2023 16:30 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | BERLINSKI PHILIP R. | Global Treasurer | 20 Apr 2023 | Sale | 3,750 | 338.1 | 1,267,875 | D |
21 Apr 2023 16:30 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | RUEMMLER KATHRYN H. | Chief Legal Officer, GC | 19 Apr 2023 | Sale | 7,277 | 332.67 | 2,420,840 | D |
04 May 2023 16:30 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | LEE BRIAN J | Chief Risk Officer | 02 May 2023 | Sale | 500 | 338.41 | 169,205 | I |
04 May 2023 16:30 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | LEE BRIAN J | Chief Risk Officer | 02 May 2023 | Sale | 1,800 | 337.81 | 608,058 | I |
04 May 2023 16:30 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | LEE BRIAN J | Chief Risk Officer | 02 May 2023 | Sale | 700 | 336.62 | 235,634 | I |
04 May 2023 16:30 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | LEE BRIAN J | Chief Risk Officer | 02 May 2023 | Sale | 100 | 338.6 | 33,860 | D |
04 May 2023 16:30 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | LEE BRIAN J | Chief Risk Officer | 02 May 2023 | Sale | 1,965 | 337.98 | 664,131 | D |
04 May 2023 16:30 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | LEE BRIAN J | Chief Risk Officer | 02 May 2023 | Sale | 935 | 336.88 | 314,983 | D |
21 Jul 2023 16:17 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | SOLOMON DAVID M | Chairman of the Board and CEO | 20 Jul 2023 | Sale | 3,600 | 346.43 | 1,247,148 | D |
21 Jul 2023 16:17 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | SOLOMON DAVID M | Chairman of the Board and CEO | 20 Jul 2023 | Sale | 6,400 | 345.31 | 2,209,984 | D |
03 Aug 2023 16:30 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | SOLOMON DAVID M | Chairman of the Board and CEO | 01 Aug 2023 | Sale | 4,200 | 356.28 | 1,496,376 | D |
24 Nov 2023 13:06 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | LESLIE ERICKA T | Chief Administrative Officer | 21 Nov 2023 | Sale | 1,376 | 335.15 | 461,166 | D |
19 Jan 2024 16:13 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | LEE BRIAN J | Chief Risk Officer | 17 Jan 2024 | Sale | 4,000 | 376.03 | 1,504,120 | I |
19 Jan 2024 16:13 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | LEE BRIAN J | Chief Risk Officer | 17 Jan 2024 | Sale | 2,500 | 375.23 | 938,075 | I |
19 Jan 2024 16:13 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | LEE BRIAN J | Chief Risk Officer | 17 Jan 2024 | Sale | 3,000 | 376.39 | 1,129,170 | D |
25 Jan 2024 16:07 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | RUEMMLER KATHRYN H. | Chief Legal Officer, GC | 23 Jan 2024 | Sale | 7,277 | 379.81 | 2,763,877 | D |
25 Jan 2024 16:12 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | FREDMAN SHEARA J | Chief Accounting Officer | 23 Jan 2024 | Sale | 39 | 382.99 | 14,937 | D |
25 Jan 2024 16:12 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | FREDMAN SHEARA J | Chief Accounting Officer | 23 Jan 2024 | Sale | 67 | 382.18 | 25,606 | D |
25 Jan 2024 16:12 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | FREDMAN SHEARA J | Chief Accounting Officer | 23 Jan 2024 | Sale | 185 | 381.06 | 70,496 | D |
25 Jan 2024 16:12 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | FREDMAN SHEARA J | Chief Accounting Officer | 23 Jan 2024 | Sale | 2,479 | 380.47 | 943,185 | D |
25 Jan 2024 16:12 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | FREDMAN SHEARA J | Chief Accounting Officer | 23 Jan 2024 | Sale | 1,530 | 379.36 | 580,421 | D |
26 Feb 2024 16:07 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | COLEMAN DENIS P. | Chief Financial Officer | 23 Feb 2024 | Sale | 12,680 | 394.43 | 5,001,372 | D |
26 Feb 2024 16:09 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | BERLINSKI PHILIP R. | Global Treasurer | 22 Feb 2024 | Sale | 5,000 | 391.29 | 1,956,450 | D |
26 Feb 2024 16:09 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | BERLINSKI PHILIP R. | Global Treasurer | 22 Feb 2024 | Sale | 6,650 | 390.15 | 2,594,498 | D |
01 May 2024 16:24 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | VINIAR DAVID A | Director | 29 Apr 2024 | Sale | 900 | 432.87 | 389,583 | D |
01 May 2024 16:24 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | VINIAR DAVID A | Director | 29 Apr 2024 | Sale | 4,100 | 432.11 | 1,771,651 | D |
14 May 2024 16:03 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | SOLOMON DAVID M | Chairman of the Board and CEO | 10 May 2024 | Sale | 6,600 | 457.32 | 3,018,312 | D |
20 May 2024 16:06 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | ROGERS JOHN F.W. | Executive Vice President | 16 May 2024 | Sale | 314 | 467.82 | 146,895 | I |
20 May 2024 16:06 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | ROGERS JOHN F.W. | Executive Vice President | 16 May 2024 | Sale | 1,423 | 466.97 | 664,498 | I |
20 May 2024 16:06 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | ROGERS JOHN F.W. | Executive Vice President | 16 May 2024 | Sale | 1,309 | 465.78 | 609,706 | I |
20 May 2024 16:06 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | ROGERS JOHN F.W. | Executive Vice President | 16 May 2024 | Sale | 1,246 | 465.16 | 579,589 | I |
20 May 2024 16:06 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | ROGERS JOHN F.W. | Executive Vice President | 16 May 2024 | Sale | 151 | 467.76 | 70,632 | I |
20 May 2024 16:06 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | ROGERS JOHN F.W. | Executive Vice President | 16 May 2024 | Sale | 639 | 465.85 | 297,678 | I |
20 May 2024 16:06 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | ROGERS JOHN F.W. | Executive Vice President | 16 May 2024 | Sale | 755 | 467.03 | 352,608 | I |
20 May 2024 16:06 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | ROGERS JOHN F.W. | Executive Vice President | 16 May 2024 | Sale | 601 | 465.21 | 279,591 | I |
20 May 2024 16:06 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | ROGERS JOHN F.W. | Executive Vice President | 16 May 2024 | Sale | 357 | 467.83 | 167,015 | D |
20 May 2024 16:06 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | ROGERS JOHN F.W. | Executive Vice President | 16 May 2024 | Sale | 3,648 | 467.04 | 1,703,762 | D |
20 May 2024 16:06 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | ROGERS JOHN F.W. | Executive Vice President | 16 May 2024 | Sale | 2,125 | 465.92 | 990,080 | D |
20 May 2024 16:06 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | ROGERS JOHN F.W. | Executive Vice President | 16 May 2024 | Sale | 2,226 | 465.23 | 1,035,602 | D |
18 Jul 2024 16:05 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | LEE BRIAN J | Chief Risk Officer | 16 Jul 2024 | Sale | 1,500 | 506.07 | 759,105 | I |
18 Jul 2024 16:05 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | LEE BRIAN J | Chief Risk Officer | 16 Jul 2024 | Sale | 3,500 | 505.99 | 1,770,965 | D |
18 Jul 2024 16:07 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | VINIAR DAVID A | Director | 16 Jul 2024 | Sale | 300 | 503.99 | 151,197 | D |
18 Jul 2024 16:07 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | VINIAR DAVID A | Director | 16 Jul 2024 | Sale | 700 | 503.04 | 352,128 | D |
18 Jul 2024 16:07 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | VINIAR DAVID A | Director | 16 Jul 2024 | Sale | 4,000 | 502.2 | 2,008,800 | D |
18 Jul 2024 16:08 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | MONTAG THOMAS K. | Director | 16 Jul 2024 | Sale | 1,800 | 505.47 | 909,846 | I |
18 Jul 2024 16:08 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | MONTAG THOMAS K. | Director | 16 Jul 2024 | Sale | 8,200 | 504.95 | 4,140,590 | I |
16 Aug 2024 16:04 | GS | GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC | SOLOMON DAVID M | Chairman of the Board and CEO | 15 Aug 2024 | Sale | 6,000 | 500.29 | 3,001,740 | D |
* D/I = Direct / Indirect
* 10% = Entity with 10% or higher ownership stake
* A = Amendment Filing (SEC Form 4/A)