Real Time Insider Transaction Data
Real Time Insider buys and sells Data - Insider Trades - Insider Transactions - Insider Trading Data - SEC Form 4 Data
Total | Transactions | Amount |
Buys | 3 | $423,374 |
Sells | 57 | $20,138,825 |
Security | Reporting Name | Relationship | Purchase/Sale | Shares | Price $ | D/I | ||||
05 Sep 2024 16:18 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | FOWLER JOHN MOORE | Director | 03 Sep 2024 | Sale | 600 | 81.66 | 48,996 | D |
08 Aug 2024 16:21 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | SMITH PHILIP ANDREW | Subsidiary CEO | 07 Aug 2024 | Sale | 4,000 | 75.8898 | 303,559 | D |
16 Jul 2024 16:34 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | NGUYEN XUONG | Retired Officer | 15 Jul 2024 | Sale | 8,091 | 80 | 647,280 | D |
15 Jul 2024 17:28 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | FOWLER JOHN MOORE | Director | 12 Jul 2024 | Sale | 400 | 79.2634 | 31,705 | I |
14 Jun 2024 17:25 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | ROTSZTAIN DIEGO | Chief Governance/Legal Officer | 13 Jun 2024 | Sale | 5,382 | 70.6298 | 380,130 | D |
13 Jun 2024 18:05 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | ROTSZTAIN DIEGO | Chief Governance/Legal Officer | 13 Jun 2024 | Sale A | 1,090 | 70.5 | 76,845 | D |
12 Jun 2024 16:26 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | ROTSZTAIN DIEGO | Chief Governance/Legal Officer | 10 Jun 2024 | Sale | 1,420 | 72.0331 | 102,287 | D |
10 Jun 2024 16:29 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | NGUYEN XUONG | Chief Operating Officer | 07 Jun 2024 | Sale | 19,988 | 75.0408 | 1,499,916 | D |
10 Jun 2024 16:26 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | ROTSZTAIN DIEGO | Chief Governance/Legal Officer | 06 Jun 2024 | Sale | 1,090 | 73.5 | 80,115 | D |
04 Jun 2024 20:10 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | NGUYEN XUONG | Chief Operating Officer | 03 Jun 2024 | Sale | 12 | 75 | 900 | D |
04 Jun 2024 06:16 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | FOWLER JOHN MOORE | Director | 03 Jun 2024 | Sale | 600 | 75.34 | 45,204 | D |
21 May 2024 16:37 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | LYON CHARLES M | Subsidiary President and CEO | 20 May 2024 | Sale | 4,016 | 74.0151 | 297,245 | D |
21 May 2024 16:37 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | LYON CHARLES M | Subsidiary President and CEO | 17 May 2024 | Sale | 5,621 | 75.5399 | 424,610 | D |
17 May 2024 16:45 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | SMITH PHILIP ANDREW | Subsidiary CEO | 15 May 2024 | Sale | 8,000 | 75.1787 | 601,430 | D |
13 May 2024 16:18 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | NGUYEN XUONG | Chief Operating Officer | 09 May 2024 | Sale | 6,909 | 80 | 552,720 | D |
06 May 2024 16:33 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | PARTHEMORE ERIC | Director | 03 May 2024 | Sale | 2,250 | 74.67 | 168,008 | D |
25 Mar 2024 16:33 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | SMITH PHILIP ANDREW | Subsidiary CEO | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 7,000 | 69.7345 | 488,142 | D |
15 Mar 2024 08:51 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | BRANCH SCOTT J | Retired Director | 13 Mar 2024 | Sale | 7,500 | 67.2929 | 504,697 | I |
14 Mar 2024 08:28 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | LYON CHARLES M | Subsidiary President and CEO | 12 Mar 2024 | Sale | 6,787 | 67.524 | 458,285 | D |
12 Mar 2024 09:09 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | LYON CHARLES M | Subsidiary President and CEO | 11 Mar 2024 | Sale | 7,858 | 68.1121 | 535,225 | D |
12 Mar 2024 09:09 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | LYON CHARLES M | Subsidiary President and CEO | 08 Mar 2024 | Sale | 10,338 | 68.5266 | 708,428 | D |
08 Mar 2024 16:29 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | LYON CHARLES M | Subsidiary President and CEO | 07 Mar 2024 | Sale | 6,998 | 68.5867 | 479,970 | D |
08 Mar 2024 16:29 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | LYON CHARLES M | Subsidiary President and CEO | 06 Mar 2024 | Sale | 9,178 | 68.2174 | 626,099 | D |
06 Mar 2024 16:29 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | LYON CHARLES M | Subsidiary President and CEO | 05 Mar 2024 | Sale | 15,141 | 68.6764 | 1,039,829 | D |
06 Mar 2024 16:29 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | LYON CHARLES M | Subsidiary President and CEO | 04 Mar 2024 | Sale | 4,852 | 68.621 | 332,949 | D |
04 Mar 2024 17:21 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | FOWLER JOHN MOORE | Director | 01 Mar 2024 | Sale | 600 | 68.94 | 41,364 | D |
14 Feb 2024 16:38 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | LYON CHARLES M | President and CEO - subsidiary | 13 Feb 2024 | Sale | 15,552 | 65.1061 | 1,012,530 | D |
14 Feb 2024 16:38 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | LYON CHARLES M | President and CEO - subsidiary | 12 Feb 2024 | Sale | 3,659 | 67.2869 | 246,203 | D |
09 Feb 2024 16:37 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | BRANCH SCOTT J | Director | 07 Feb 2024 | Sale | 7,500 | 63.8673 | 479,005 | I |
09 Jan 2024 16:17 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | BRANCH SCOTT J | Director | 08 Jan 2024 | Sale | 7,500 | 70.0859 | 525,644 | I |
27 Dec 2023 16:50 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | PARTHEMORE ERIC | Director | 22 Dec 2023 | Sale | 2,250 | 71.34 | 160,515 | D |
21 Dec 2023 16:25 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | SMITH PHILIP ANDREW | CEO - subsidiary entity | 20 Dec 2023 | Sale | 8,562 | 69.167 | 592,208 | D |
21 Dec 2023 16:25 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | SMITH PHILIP ANDREW | CEO - subsidiary entity | 19 Dec 2023 | Sale | 8,563 | 69.0712 | 591,457 | D |
15 Dec 2023 16:45 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | PARTHEMORE ERIC | Director | 14 Dec 2023 | Sale | 2,140 | 68 | 145,520 | D |
15 Dec 2023 16:40 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | MAURER MARK LOWRY | Chief Risk Officer | 13 Dec 2023 | Sale | 5,000 | 67.2121 | 336,061 | D |
01 Dec 2023 16:41 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | FOWLER JOHN MOORE | Director | 01 Dec 2023 | Sale | 600 | 60.65 | 36,390 | D |
16 Nov 2023 16:04 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | PARTHEMORE ERIC | Director | 14 Nov 2023 | Sale | 73 | 102 | 7,446 | D |
21 Sep 2023 16:36 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | SMITH PHILIP ANDREW | CEO - subsidiary entity | 20 Sep 2023 | Sale | 3,000 | 94.5648 | 283,694 | D |
18 Sep 2023 16:18 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | LYON CHARLES M | President and CEO - subsidiary | 15 Sep 2023 | Sale | 2,369 | 93.0764 | 220,498 | D |
18 Sep 2023 16:18 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | LYON CHARLES M | President and CEO - subsidiary | 14 Sep 2023 | Sale | 7,631 | 93.0914 | 710,380 | D |
05 Sep 2023 16:45 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | FOWLER JOHN MOORE | Director | 01 Sep 2023 | Sale | 300 | 93.93 | 28,179 | D |
14 Jun 2023 17:06 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | FOWLER JOHN MOORE | Director | 13 Jun 2023 | Sale | 300 | 90 | 27,000 | D |
12 Jun 2023 17:36 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | RADZIWILL JOHN | Chairman of the Board | 09 Jun 2023 | Purchase | 962 | 86.8961 | 83,594 | D |
12 Jun 2023 17:36 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | RADZIWILL JOHN | Chairman of the Board | 08 Jun 2023 | Purchase | 1,000 | 87.25 | 87,250 | D |
23 May 2023 18:23 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | SMITH PHILIP ANDREW | CEO - subsidiary entity | 22 May 2023 | Sale | 3,500 | 84.7707 | 296,697 | D |
11 May 2023 17:30 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | STEVENS GLENN HENRY | Head-Retail & Foreign Exchange | 09 May 2023 | Purchase | 3,000 | 84.1766 | 252,530 | D |
09 Mar 2023 18:30 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | DUNAWAY WILLIAM J | Chief Financial Officer | 08 Mar 2023 | Sale | 165 | 105.3693 | 17,386 | D |
09 Mar 2023 16:52 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | SCHROEDER AARON | Chief Accounting Officer | 08 Mar 2023 | Sale | 1,395 | 104.9095 | 146,349 | D |
03 Mar 2023 08:09 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | SMITH PHILIP ANDREW | CEO - subsidiary entity | 01 Mar 2023 | Sale | 3,000 | 101.9782 | 305,935 | D |
02 Mar 2023 08:16 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | FOWLER JOHN MOORE | Director | 01 Mar 2023 | Sale | 300 | 100.53 | 30,159 | D |
17 Feb 2023 16:53 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | DUNAWAY WILLIAM J | Chief Financial Officer | 15 Feb 2023 | Sale | 935 | 105.1512 | 98,316 | D |
14 Feb 2023 16:32 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | DUNAWAY WILLIAM J | Chief Financial Officer | 10 Feb 2023 | Sale | 736 | 103.1184 | 75,895 | D |
10 Feb 2023 18:26 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | DUNAWAY WILLIAM J | Chief Financial Officer | 08 Feb 2023 | Sale | 264 | 100.7636 | 26,602 | D |
03 Jan 2023 16:31 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | MAURER MARK LOWRY | Chief Risk Officer | 30 Dec 2022 | Sale | 4,381 | 95.2662 | 417,361 | D |
22 Dec 2022 17:31 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | DUNAWAY WILLIAM J | Chief Financial Officer | 21 Dec 2022 | Sale | 2,823 | 97.9509 | 276,515 | D |
19 Dec 2022 17:19 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | DUNAWAY WILLIAM J | Chief Financial Officer | 15 Dec 2022 | Sale | 600 | 91.95 | 55,170 | D |
08 Dec 2022 16:19 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | MAURER MARK LOWRY | Chief Risk Officer | 06 Dec 2022 | Sale | 4,711 | 97.8064 | 460,766 | D |
02 Dec 2022 17:27 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | FOWLER JOHN MOORE | Director | 01 Dec 2022 | Sale | 300 | 101.25 | 30,375 | D |
23 Nov 2022 19:09 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | OCONNOR SEAN MICHAEL | CEO/President | 22 Nov 2022 | Sale | 18,600 | 101.3383 | 1,884,892 | D |
17 Nov 2022 16:38 | SNEX | StoneX Group Inc | OCONNOR SEAN MICHAEL | CEO/President | 15 Nov 2022 | Sale | 1,400 | 98.385 | 137,739 | D |
* D/I = Direct / Indirect
* 10% = Entity with 10% or higher ownership stake
* A = Amendment Filing (SEC Form 4/A)