Real Time Insider Transaction Data
Real Time Insider buys and sells Data - Insider Trades - Insider Transactions - Insider Trading Data - SEC Form 4 Data
Total | Transactions | Amount |
Buys | 15 | $3,334,331 |
Sells | 23 | $92,655,216 |
Security | Reporting Name | Relationship | Purchase/Sale | Shares | Price $ | D/I | ||||
03 Oct 2022 18:15 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | GSO ALTUS HOLDINGS LP | 10% | 03 Oct 2022 | Sale | 7,000,000 | 11.01 | 77,070,000 | I |
12 Oct 2022 16:27 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | GSO ALTUS HOLDINGS LP | 10% | 03 Oct 2022 | Sale | 1,050,000 | 11.01 | 11,560,500 | I |
08 Jun 2023 18:18 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | GSO ALTUS HOLDINGS LP | 10% | 07 Jun 2023 | Purchase | 224,000 | 5.5262 | 1,237,869 | I |
16 Jun 2023 19:01 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | WEBER DUSTIN | CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER | 14 Jun 2023 | Sale | 225,000 | 5.4596 | 1,228,410 | D |
03 Jun 2024 16:58 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | FELTON GREGG J | CO-FOUNDER, CEO & PRESIDENT, 10% | 31 May 2024 | Purchase | 82,576 | 3.9 | 322,046 | I |
15 Dec 2023 17:44 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | WEBER DUSTIN | CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER | 14 Dec 2023 | Sale | 50,000 | 6.3791 | 318,955 | D |
12 Jun 2023 18:04 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | GSO ALTUS HOLDINGS LP | 10% | 08 Jun 2023 | Purchase | 57,000 | 5.2509 | 299,301 | I |
05 Mar 2024 17:31 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | NORELL LARS | CO-FOUNDER CO-CEO CO-PRESIDENT, 10% | 01 Mar 2024 | Sale | 40,000 | 6.863 | 274,520 | I |
04 Jan 2024 18:08 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | NORELL LARS | CO-FOUNDER CO-CEO CO-PRESIDENT, 10% | 02 Jan 2024 | Sale | 40,000 | 6.808 | 272,320 | I |
16 Jun 2023 16:26 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | GSO ALTUS HOLDINGS LP | 10% | 14 Jun 2023 | Purchase | 45,000 | 5.4706 | 246,177 | I |
13 Jun 2023 17:46 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | CONCANNON WILLIAM F | Director | 12 Jun 2023 | Purchase | 41,600 | 5.4123 | 225,152 | I |
02 Feb 2024 17:38 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | NORELL LARS | CO-FOUNDER CO-CEO CO-PRESIDENT, 10% | 01 Feb 2024 | Sale | 40,000 | 5.584 | 223,360 | I |
22 May 2023 21:25 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | FELTON GREGG J | CO-FOUNDER CO-CEO CO-PRESIDENT, 10% | 19 May 2023 | Purchase A | 50,000 | 4.4347 | 221,735 | I |
04 Dec 2023 18:07 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | NORELL LARS | CO-FOUNDER CO-CEO CO-PRESIDENT, 10% | 01 Dec 2023 | Sale | 40,000 | 5.15 | 206,000 | I |
29 Aug 2023 18:51 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | SAVINO ANTHONY | COFOUNDER,CHIEF CONST. OFFICER | 23 Aug 2023 | Sale | 25,000 | 6.2237 | 155,592 | D |
29 Aug 2023 18:51 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | SAVINO ANTHONY | COFOUNDER,CHIEF CONST. OFFICER | 25 Aug 2023 | Sale | 25,000 | 6.1187 | 152,968 | D |
29 Aug 2023 18:51 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | SAVINO ANTHONY | COFOUNDER,CHIEF CONST. OFFICER | 24 Aug 2023 | Sale | 25,000 | 6.0207 | 150,518 | D |
29 Dec 2023 17:07 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | WEBER DUSTIN | CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER | 28 Dec 2023 | Sale | 21,000 | 7.0312 | 147,655 | D |
14 Jun 2023 18:19 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | SAVINO ANTHONY | COFOUNDER,CHIEF CONST. OFFICER | 13 Jun 2023 | Sale | 25,000 | 5.6178 | 140,445 | D |
10 Jun 2024 16:31 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | FELTON GREGG J | CO-FOUNDER, CEO & PRESIDENT, 10% | 07 Jun 2024 | Purchase | 34,139 | 3.99 | 136,215 | I |
14 Jun 2023 18:19 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | SAVINO ANTHONY | COFOUNDER,CHIEF CONST. OFFICER | 12 Jun 2023 | Sale | 25,000 | 5.4 | 135,000 | D |
14 Jun 2023 18:19 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | SAVINO ANTHONY | COFOUNDER,CHIEF CONST. OFFICER | 14 Jun 2023 | Sale | 25,000 | 5.363 | 134,075 | D |
16 Feb 2024 18:27 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | SAVINO ANTHONY | COFOUNDER,CHIEF CONST. OFFICER | 14 Feb 2024 | Sale | 17,425 | 7.0225 | 122,367 | D |
16 Feb 2024 18:27 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | SAVINO ANTHONY | COFOUNDER,CHIEF CONST. OFFICER | 14 Feb 2024 | Sale | 17,300 | 7.0229 | 121,496 | D |
22 May 2023 21:25 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | FELTON GREGG J | CO-FOUNDER CO-CEO CO-PRESIDENT, 10% | 22 May 2023 | Purchase A | 25,000 | 4.4121 | 110,302 | I |
13 Jun 2023 17:46 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | CONCANNON WILLIAM F | Director | 09 Jun 2023 | Purchase | 18,400 | 5.6639 | 104,216 | I |
31 May 2023 20:15 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | FELTON GREGG J | CO-FOUNDER CO-CEO CO-PRESIDENT | 31 May 2023 | Purchase | 22,500 | 4.4947 | 101,131 | I |
05 Jun 2024 16:30 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | FELTON GREGG J | CO-FOUNDER, CEO & PRESIDENT, 10% | 04 Jun 2024 | Purchase | 25,000 | 3.99 | 99,750 | I |
08 Jun 2023 18:18 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | GSO ALTUS HOLDINGS LP | 10% | 06 Jun 2023 | Purchase | 15,000 | 5.1699 | 77,548 | I |
05 Apr 2024 17:30 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | FELTON GREGG J | CO-FOUNDER CO-CEO CO-PRESIDENT, 10% | 28 Mar 2024 | Purchase A | 12,500 | 4.78 | 59,750 | I |
01 Apr 2024 08:28 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | FELTON GREGG J | CO-FOUNDER CO-CEO CO-PRESIDENT, 10% | 28 Mar 2024 | Purchase | 12,500 | 4.78 | 59,750 | I |
16 Feb 2024 18:27 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | SAVINO ANTHONY | COFOUNDER,CHIEF CONST. OFFICER | 15 Feb 2024 | Sale | 7,700 | 7.1367 | 54,953 | D |
16 Feb 2024 18:27 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | SAVINO ANTHONY | COFOUNDER,CHIEF CONST. OFFICER | 15 Feb 2024 | Sale | 7,575 | 7.1368 | 54,061 | D |
17 Feb 2023 16:54 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | SAVINO ANTHONY | COFOUNDER,CHIEF CONST. OFFICER | 16 Feb 2023 | Sale | 4,725 | 7.4 | 34,965 | D |
05 Jun 2024 16:30 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | FELTON GREGG J | CO-FOUNDER, CEO & PRESIDENT, 10% | 03 Jun 2024 | Purchase | 8,285 | 4.03 | 33,389 | I |
17 Feb 2023 17:04 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | WEBER DUSTIN | CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER | 16 Feb 2023 | Sale | 4,470 | 7.4 | 33,078 | D |
26 Feb 2024 19:36 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | SAVINO ANTHONY | COFOUNDER,CHIEF CONST. OFFICER | 16 Feb 2024 | Sale | 4,598 | 7.15 | 32,876 | D |
26 Feb 2024 19:41 | AMPS | Altus Power Inc | WEBER DUSTIN | CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER | 16 Feb 2024 | Sale | 4,350 | 7.15 | 31,102 | D |
* D/I = Direct / Indirect
* 10% = Entity with 10% or higher ownership stake
* A = Amendment Filing (SEC Form 4/A)