Real Time Insider Transaction Data
Real Time Insider buys and sells Data - Insider Trades - Insider Transactions - Insider Trading Data - SEC Form 4 Data
Total | Transactions | Amount |
Buys | 0 | $0 |
Sells | 83 | $997,835,263 |
Security | Reporting Name | Relationship | Purchase/Sale | Shares | Price $ | D/I | ||||
14 Feb 2024 18:16 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | HERMIDA YURI | CHIEF GROWTH OFFICER | 12 Feb 2024 | Sale | 5,979 | 22.2624 | 133,107 | D |
14 Feb 2024 18:15 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | JENSEN KIRK A. | CHIEF OPERATING OFFICER | 12 Feb 2024 | Sale | 2,785 | 22.2624 | 62,001 | D |
14 Feb 2024 18:13 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | CRETELLA RISA | CHIEF SALES OFFICER | 12 Feb 2024 | Sale | 3,363 | 22.2624 | 74,868 | D |
14 Feb 2024 18:12 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | LACHMAN TODD R | CEO | 12 Feb 2024 | Sale | 13,255 | 22.2624 | 295,088 | D |
14 Feb 2024 18:10 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | O'DRISCOLL LISA Y. | CHIEF ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICER | 12 Feb 2024 | Sale | 1,397 | 22.2624 | 31,101 | D |
14 Feb 2024 18:09 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | GVAZDINSKAS KATIE | CHIEF HUMAN RESOURCES OFFICER | 12 Feb 2024 | Sale | 1,624 | 22.2624 | 36,154 | D |
18 Jan 2024 18:59 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | O'DRISCOLL LISA Y. | CHIEF ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICER | 16 Jan 2024 | Sale | 1,276 | 22.0895 | 28,186 | D |
18 Jan 2024 18:58 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | JENSEN KIRK A. | CHIEF OPERATING OFFICER | 16 Jan 2024 | Sale | 12,802 | 22.0895 | 282,790 | D |
18 Jan 2024 18:56 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | CRETELLA RISA | CHIEF SALES OFFICER | 16 Jan 2024 | Sale | 7,627 | 22.0895 | 168,477 | D |
18 Jan 2024 18:55 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | GVAZDINSKAS KATIE | CHIEF HUMAN RESOURCES OFFICER | 16 Jan 2024 | Sale | 1,607 | 22.0895 | 35,498 | D |
18 Jan 2024 18:54 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | JONES ISOBEL A | CLO, GC AND SECRETARY | 16 Jan 2024 | Sale | 7,522 | 22.0895 | 166,157 | D |
18 Jan 2024 18:53 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | HALL CHRISTOPHER W. | CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER | 16 Jan 2024 | Sale | 3,843 | 22.0895 | 84,890 | D |
18 Jan 2024 18:52 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | LACHMAN TODD R | CEO | 16 Jan 2024 | Sale | 9,478 | 22.0895 | 209,364 | D |
07 Dec 2023 17:51 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | HALL CHRISTOPHER W. | CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER | 06 Dec 2023 | Sale | 67,284 | 21.9613 | 1,477,644 | D |
05 Dec 2023 18:42 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | HERMIDA YURI | CHIEF GROWTH OFFICER | 26 Oct 2023 | Sale | 40,837 | 21.65 | 884,121 | D |
12 Sep 2023 16:15 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | LACHMAN TODD R | PRESIDENT AND CEO | 11 Sep 2023 | Sale | 5,000 | 22.5253 | 112,626 | D |
12 Sep 2023 16:15 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | LACHMAN TODD R | PRESIDENT AND CEO | 11 Sep 2023 | Sale | 1,250 | 22.5258 | 28,157 | I |
30 Aug 2023 17:00 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | LACHMAN TODD R | PRESIDENT AND CEO | 28 Aug 2023 | Sale | 11,250 | 22.5356 | 253,526 | I |
30 Aug 2023 17:00 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | LACHMAN TODD R | PRESIDENT AND CEO | 28 Aug 2023 | Sale | 45,000 | 22.5347 | 1,014,062 | D |
15 Aug 2023 16:15 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | LACHMAN TODD R | PRESIDENT AND CEO | 14 Aug 2023 | Sale | 11,250 | 22.5474 | 253,658 | I |
15 Aug 2023 16:15 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | LACHMAN TODD R | PRESIDENT AND CEO | 14 Aug 2023 | Sale | 45,000 | 22.5482 | 1,014,669 | D |
15 Aug 2023 16:15 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | LACHMAN TODD R | PRESIDENT AND CEO | 11 Aug 2023 | Sale | 11,250 | 22.5631 | 253,835 | I |
15 Aug 2023 16:15 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | LACHMAN TODD R | PRESIDENT AND CEO | 11 Aug 2023 | Sale | 45,000 | 22.5648 | 1,015,416 | D |
17 Jul 2023 21:13 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | LACHMAN TODD R | PRESIDENT AND CEO | 17 Jul 2023 | Sale | 11,250 | 18.503 | 208,159 | I |
17 Jul 2023 21:13 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | LACHMAN TODD R | PRESIDENT AND CEO | 17 Jul 2023 | Sale | 45,000 | 18.5012 | 832,554 | D |
06 Jul 2023 17:00 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | LACHMAN TODD R | PRESIDENT AND CEO | 03 Jul 2023 | Sale | 11,250 | 19.6176 | 220,698 | I |
06 Jul 2023 17:00 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | LACHMAN TODD R | PRESIDENT AND CEO | 03 Jul 2023 | Sale | 45,000 | 19.6233 | 883,048 | D |
21 Jun 2023 16:15 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | LACHMAN TODD R | PRESIDENT AND CEO | 20 Jun 2023 | Sale | 11,250 | 18.566 | 208,868 | I |
21 Jun 2023 16:15 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | LACHMAN TODD R | PRESIDENT AND CEO | 20 Jun 2023 | Sale | 45,000 | 18.5568 | 835,056 | D |
14 Jun 2023 17:15 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | LACHMAN TODD R | PRESIDENT AND CEO | 12 Jun 2023 | Sale | 11,250 | 18.269 | 205,526 | I |
14 Jun 2023 17:15 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | LACHMAN TODD R | PRESIDENT AND CEO | 12 Jun 2023 | Sale | 45,000 | 18.2691 | 822,110 | D |
24 May 2023 21:40 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | JENSEN KIRK A. | CHIEF OPERATING OFFICER | 24 May 2023 | Sale | 21,657 | 18 | 389,826 | D |
24 May 2023 21:40 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | JENSEN KIRK A. | CHIEF OPERATING OFFICER | 23 May 2023 | Sale | 20,000 | 17.625 | 352,500 | D |
24 May 2023 21:39 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | GVAZDINSKAS KATIE | CHIEF HUMAN RESOURCES OFFICER | 23 May 2023 | Sale | 5,903 | 17.4643 | 103,092 | D |
24 May 2023 21:38 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | O'DRISCOLL LISA Y. | CHIEF ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICER | 23 May 2023 | Sale | 38,123 | 17.4221 | 664,183 | D |
19 May 2023 17:04 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | GRAVES ROBERT L | Director | 17 May 2023 | Sale | 350,000 | 17.3 | 6,055,000 | I |
19 May 2023 16:08 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | ADVENT INTERNATIONAL CORP/MA | 10% | 19 May 2023 | Sale | 1,500,000 | 17.3 | 25,950,000 | I |
19 May 2023 16:08 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | ADVENT INTERNATIONAL CORP/MA | 10% | 17 May 2023 | Sale | 9,650,000 | 17.3 | 166,945,000 | I |
19 May 2023 16:04 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | ADVENT INTERNATIONAL CORP/MA | 10% | 19 May 2023 | Sale | 1,500,000 | 17.3 | 25,950,000 | I |
19 May 2023 16:04 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | ADVENT INTERNATIONAL CORP/MA | 10% | 17 May 2023 | Sale | 9,650,000 | 17.3 | 166,945,000 | I |
19 May 2023 16:01 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | ADVENT INTERNATIONAL CORP/MA | 10% | 19 May 2023 | Sale | 1,500,000 | 17.3 | 25,950,000 | I |
19 May 2023 16:01 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | ADVENT INTERNATIONAL CORP/MA | 10% | 17 May 2023 | Sale | 9,650,000 | 17.3 | 166,945,000 | I |
19 May 2023 16:01 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | MATHUR NEHA | Director | 19 May 2023 | Sale | 1,500,000 | 17.3 | 25,950,000 | I |
19 May 2023 16:01 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | MATHUR NEHA | Director | 17 May 2023 | Sale | 9,650,000 | 17.3 | 166,945,000 | I |
19 May 2023 16:01 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | CASE JEFFERSON M | Director | 19 May 2023 | Sale | 1,500,000 | 17.3 | 25,950,000 | I |
19 May 2023 16:01 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | CASE JEFFERSON M | Director | 17 May 2023 | Sale | 9,650,000 | 17.3 | 166,945,000 | I |
12 May 2023 16:30 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | CRETELLA RISA | CHIEF SALES OFFICER | 11 May 2023 | Sale | 600 | 20.1508 | 12,090 | D |
12 May 2023 16:30 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | CRETELLA RISA | CHIEF SALES OFFICER | 11 May 2023 | Sale | 11,582 | 19.5008 | 225,858 | D |
02 May 2023 19:28 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | LACHMAN TODD R | PRESIDENT AND CEO | 01 May 2023 | Sale | 20,000 | 17.1161 | 342,322 | I |
02 May 2023 19:28 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | LACHMAN TODD R | PRESIDENT AND CEO | 01 May 2023 | Sale | 80,000 | 17.0649 | 1,365,192 | D |
05 Apr 2023 17:47 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | CRETELLA RISA | CHIEF SALES OFFICER | 03 Apr 2023 | Sale | 13,641 | 17 | 231,897 | D |
05 Apr 2023 17:45 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | LACHMAN TODD R | PRESIDENT AND CEO | 03 Apr 2023 | Sale | 22,500 | 16.8754 | 379,696 | I |
05 Apr 2023 17:45 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | LACHMAN TODD R | PRESIDENT AND CEO | 03 Apr 2023 | Sale | 90,000 | 16.9242 | 1,523,178 | D |
28 Mar 2023 16:03 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | CRETELLA RISA | CHIEF SALES OFFICER | 27 Mar 2023 | Sale | 14,420 | 16.5 | 237,930 | D |
27 Mar 2023 21:01 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | JENSEN KIRK A. | CHIEF OPERATING OFFICER | 23 Mar 2023 | Sale | 16,000 | 16 | 256,000 | D |
27 Mar 2023 21:00 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | LACHMAN TODD R | PRESIDENT AND CEO | 23 Mar 2023 | Sale | 7,500 | 16 | 120,000 | I |
27 Mar 2023 21:00 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | LACHMAN TODD R | PRESIDENT AND CEO | 23 Mar 2023 | Sale | 30,000 | 16 | 480,000 | D |
21 Mar 2023 17:23 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | GRAVES ROBERT L | Director | 17 Mar 2023 | Sale | 10,669 | 15 | 160,035 | I |
21 Mar 2023 17:20 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | LACHMAN TODD R | PRESIDENT AND CEO | 17 Mar 2023 | Sale | 7,500 | 15 | 112,500 | I |
21 Mar 2023 17:20 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | LACHMAN TODD R | PRESIDENT AND CEO | 17 Mar 2023 | Sale | 30,000 | 15 | 450,000 | D |
17 Mar 2023 19:01 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | GRAVES ROBERT L | Director | 16 Mar 2023 | Sale | 2,756 | 14.7529 | 40,659 | I |
17 Mar 2023 19:01 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | GRAVES ROBERT L | Director | 15 Mar 2023 | Sale | 75,000 | 14.309 | 1,073,175 | I |
15 Mar 2023 20:29 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | GRAVES ROBERT L | Director | 14 Mar 2023 | Sale | 24,694 | 14.2796 | 352,620 | I |
15 Mar 2023 20:29 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | GRAVES ROBERT L | Director | 13 Mar 2023 | Sale | 25,000 | 14.0002 | 350,005 | I |
13 Mar 2023 17:28 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | GRAVES ROBERT L | Director | 09 Mar 2023 | Sale | 26,476 | 15.18 | 401,906 | I |
23 Jan 2023 18:24 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | O'DRISCOLL LISA Y. | CHIEF ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICER | 24 Aug 2022 | Sale A | 43,000 | 14.6757 | 631,055 | D |
23 Jan 2023 18:22 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | O'DRISCOLL LISA Y. | CHIEF ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICER | 06 Jul 2022 | Sale A | 19,300 | 16.2974 | 314,540 | D |
23 Jan 2023 18:22 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | O'DRISCOLL LISA Y. | CHIEF ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICER | 01 Jul 2022 | Sale A | 700 | 16 | 11,200 | D |
19 Jan 2023 20:18 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | O'DRISCOLL LISA Y. | CHIEF ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICER | 17 Jan 2023 | Sale | 1,353 | 13.5422 | 18,323 | D |
19 Jan 2023 20:15 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | TUAN PRISCILLA | CHIEF MARKETING OFFICER | 17 Jan 2023 | Sale | 5,184 | 13.5463 | 70,224 | D |
19 Jan 2023 20:13 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | GVAZDINSKAS KATIE | CHIEF HUMAN RESOURCES OFFICER | 17 Jan 2023 | Sale | 1,705 | 13.5405 | 23,087 | D |
19 Jan 2023 20:12 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | BEHR WENDY K. | CHIEF R&D OFFICER | 17 Jan 2023 | Sale | 1,574 | 13.5471 | 21,323 | D |
19 Jan 2023 20:08 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | JONES ISOBEL A | CLO, GC AND SECRETARY | 17 Jan 2023 | Sale | 7,999 | 13.4789 | 107,818 | D |
19 Jan 2023 20:07 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | CRETELLA RISA | EXECUTIVE VICE PRESIDENT | 17 Jan 2023 | Sale | 8,274 | 13.5529 | 112,137 | D |
19 Jan 2023 20:06 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | JENSEN KIRK A. | CHIEF OPERATING OFFICER | 18 Jan 2023 | Sale | 28,583 | 13.4692 | 384,990 | D |
19 Jan 2023 20:06 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | JENSEN KIRK A. | CHIEF OPERATING OFFICER | 17 Jan 2023 | Sale | 13,850 | 13.5481 | 187,641 | D |
19 Jan 2023 20:04 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | HALL CHRISTOPHER W. | CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER | 17 Jan 2023 | Sale | 4,233 | 13.5448 | 57,335 | D |
19 Jan 2023 20:03 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | LACHMAN TODD R | PRESIDENT AND CEO | 17 Jan 2023 | Sale | 9,975 | 13.5504 | 135,165 | D |
17 Nov 2022 20:28 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | GRAVES ROBERT L | Director | 17 Nov 2022 | Sale | 83,931 | 13.7039 | 1,150,182 | I |
17 Nov 2022 20:28 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | GRAVES ROBERT L | Director | 16 Nov 2022 | Sale | 21,535 | 13.9187 | 299,739 | I |
15 Nov 2022 21:48 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | GRAVES ROBERT L | Director | 15 Nov 2022 | Sale | 61,956 | 14.1138 | 874,435 | I |
15 Nov 2022 21:48 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | GRAVES ROBERT L | Director | 14 Nov 2022 | Sale | 38,685 | 13.8912 | 537,381 | I |
15 Nov 2022 21:48 | SOVO | Sovos Brands Inc | GRAVES ROBERT L | Director | 11 Nov 2022 | Sale | 43,893 | 13.9569 | 612,610 | I |
* D/I = Direct / Indirect
* 10% = Entity with 10% or higher ownership stake
* A = Amendment Filing (SEC Form 4/A)