Real Time Insider Transaction Data
Real Time Insider buys and sells Data - Insider Trades - Insider Transactions - Insider Trading Data - SEC Form 4 Data
Total | Transactions | Amount |
Buys | 0 | $0 |
Sells | 46 | $172,506,194 |
Security | Reporting Name | Relationship | Purchase/Sale | Shares | Price $ | D/I | ||||
26 Jul 2024 16:10 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | CRAWLEY MANDELL | Chief Human Resources Officer | 26 Jul 2024 | Sale | 3,500 | 105.25 | 368,375 | D |
19 Jul 2024 16:31 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | AKRAM RAJA | Deputy Chief Financial Officer | 18 Jul 2024 | Sale | 7,500 | 106.3686 | 797,764 | D |
19 Jul 2024 16:30 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | YESHAYA SHARON | Chief Financial Officer | 19 Jul 2024 | Sale | 15,547 | 104 | 1,616,888 | I |
19 Jul 2024 16:29 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | HERZ ROBERT H | Director | 17 Jul 2024 | Sale | 139 | 106.63 | 14,822 | D |
19 Jul 2024 16:29 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | HERZ ROBERT H | Director | 17 Jul 2024 | Sale | 861 | 106.62 | 91,800 | D |
19 Jul 2024 16:28 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | SIMKOWITZ DANIEL A | Co-President | 17 Jul 2024 | Sale | 40,000 | 106.5442 | 4,261,768 | D |
19 Jul 2024 16:26 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | GORMAN JAMES P | Executive Chairman | 17 Jul 2024 | Sale | 200,000 | 105.0615 | 21,012,300 | I |
16 May 2024 21:04 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | CRAWLEY MANDELL | Chief Human Resources Officer | 14 May 2024 | Sale | 6,954 | 99.6064 | 692,663 | D |
19 Apr 2024 16:06 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | GORMAN JAMES P | Executive Chairman | 18 Apr 2024 | Sale | 100,000 | 90.2053 | 9,020,530 | D |
19 Apr 2024 16:05 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | SMITH CHARLES AUBREY III | Chief Risk Officer | 17 Apr 2024 | Sale | 11,200 | 90.091 | 1,009,019 | D |
14 Feb 2024 16:19 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | SAPERSTEIN ANDREW M | Co-President | 12 Feb 2024 | Sale | 26,655 | 87.1916 | 2,324,092 | D |
14 Feb 2024 16:19 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | GORMAN JAMES P | Executive Chairman | 12 Feb 2024 | Sale | 100,000 | 87.3022 | 8,730,220 | I |
01 Feb 2024 16:22 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | SAPERSTEIN ANDREW M | Co-President | 30 Jan 2024 | Sale | 10,000 | 87.917 | 879,170 | D |
01 Feb 2024 16:21 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | AKRAM RAJA | Deputy Chief Financial Officer | 30 Jan 2024 | Sale | 4,500 | 87.4102 | 393,346 | D |
01 Feb 2024 16:20 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | GROSSMAN ERIC F | Chief Legal/Admin Officer | 31 Jan 2024 | Sale | 26,562 | 88.5476 | 2,352,001 | D |
01 Feb 2024 16:20 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | GROSSMAN ERIC F | Chief Legal/Admin Officer | 30 Jan 2024 | Sale | 26,563 | 87.8137 | 2,332,595 | D |
26 Jan 2024 16:36 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | GORMAN JAMES P | Executive Chairman | 26 Jan 2024 | Sale | 50,000 | 87.928 | 4,396,400 | D |
25 Jan 2024 16:03 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | GORMAN JAMES P | Executive Chairman | 25 Jan 2024 | Sale | 50,000 | 87.9287 | 4,396,435 | I |
19 Jan 2024 16:22 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | AKRAM RAJA | Deputy Chief Financial Officer | 18 Jan 2024 | Sale | 7,000 | 83.5612 | 584,928 | D |
19 Jan 2024 16:15 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | SAPERSTEIN ANDREW M | Co-President | 19 Jan 2024 | Sale | 10,000 | 84.1344 | 841,344 | D |
26 Jul 2023 16:14 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | PICK EDWARD N | Co-President/Head of IS | 24 Jul 2023 | Sale | 100,000 | 94.3305 | 9,433,050 | D |
26 Jul 2023 16:11 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | GORMAN JAMES P | Chairman and CEO | 24 Jul 2023 | Sale | 125,000 | 95.1905 | 11,898,812 | D |
21 Jul 2023 16:20 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | SMITH CHARLES AUBREY III | Chief Risk Officer | 19 Jul 2023 | Sale | 5,600 | 92.4142 | 517,520 | D |
21 Jul 2023 16:18 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | SIMKOWITZ DANIEL A | Head of Investment Management | 20 Jul 2023 | Sale | 37,608 | 93.7793 | 3,526,852 | D |
21 Jul 2023 16:16 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | SAPERSTEIN ANDREW M | Co-President/Head of WM | 19 Jul 2023 | Sale | 39,254 | 93.0932 | 3,654,280 | D |
21 Jul 2023 16:13 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | GORMAN JAMES P | Chairman and CEO | 19 Jul 2023 | Sale | 500 | 93.578 | 46,789 | D |
21 Jul 2023 16:13 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | GORMAN JAMES P | Chairman and CEO | 19 Jul 2023 | Sale | 47,345 | 92.8941 | 4,398,071 | D |
21 Jul 2023 16:13 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | GORMAN JAMES P | Chairman and CEO | 19 Jul 2023 | Sale | 14,655 | 92.0113 | 1,348,426 | D |
21 Jul 2023 16:13 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | GORMAN JAMES P | Chairman and CEO | 19 Jul 2023 | Sale | 62,500 | 92 | 5,750,000 | D |
21 Jul 2023 16:11 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | AKRAM RAJA | Deputy Chief Financial Officer | 19 Jul 2023 | Sale | 13,500 | 92 | 1,242,000 | D |
17 May 2023 16:08 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | AKRAM RAJA | Deputy Chief Financial Officer | 15 May 2023 | Sale | 7,320 | 82.9505 | 607,198 | D |
05 May 2023 16:16 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | GLOCER THOMAS H | Director | 03 May 2023 | Sale | 4,535 | 87.105 | 395,021 | D |
15 Feb 2023 16:35 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | SAPERSTEIN ANDREW M | Co-President/Head of WM | 13 Feb 2023 | Sale | 46,226 | 98.45 | 4,550,950 | I |
15 Feb 2023 16:35 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | SAPERSTEIN ANDREW M | Co-President/Head of WM | 13 Feb 2023 | Sale | 24,556 | 98.2285 | 2,412,099 | D |
01 Feb 2023 16:37 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | SIMKOWITZ DANIEL A | Head of Investment Management | 31 Jan 2023 | Sale | 8,077 | 96.5366 | 779,726 | D |
01 Feb 2023 16:37 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | SIMKOWITZ DANIEL A | Head of Investment Management | 30 Jan 2023 | Sale | 15,133 | 96.2044 | 1,455,861 | D |
27 Jan 2023 16:15 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | DARLING ALISTAIR | Director | 25 Jan 2023 | Sale | 2,000 | 94.7048 | 189,410 | D |
20 Jan 2023 16:30 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | AKRAM RAJA | Deputy Chief Financial Officer | 18 Jan 2023 | Sale | 5,100 | 97 | 494,700 | D |
20 Jan 2023 16:28 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | SIMKOWITZ DANIEL A | Head of Investment Management | 18 Jan 2023 | Sale | 5,672 | 97.7208 | 554,272 | D |
20 Jan 2023 16:28 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | SIMKOWITZ DANIEL A | Head of Investment Management | 18 Jan 2023 | Sale | 39,238 | 96.9489 | 3,804,081 | D |
20 Jan 2023 16:25 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | PICK EDWARD N | Co-President/Head of IS | 18 Jan 2023 | Sale | 25,246 | 97.6157 | 2,464,406 | D |
20 Jan 2023 16:25 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | PICK EDWARD N | Co-President/Head of IS | 18 Jan 2023 | Sale | 109,754 | 96.8362 | 10,628,160 | D |
20 Jan 2023 16:22 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | GROSSMAN ERIC F | Chief Legal/Admin Officer | 18 Jan 2023 | Sale | 120,000 | 97.1149 | 11,653,788 | D |
20 Jan 2023 16:21 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | CRAWLEY MANDELL | Chief Human Resources Officer | 19 Jan 2023 | Sale | 3,740 | 93.75 | 350,625 | D |
20 Jan 2023 16:20 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | GORMAN JAMES P | Chairman and CEO | 18 Jan 2023 | Sale | 34,671 | 97.6174 | 3,384,493 | D |
20 Jan 2023 16:20 | MS | MORGAN STANLEY | GORMAN JAMES P | Chairman and CEO | 18 Jan 2023 | Sale | 215,329 | 96.8246 | 20,849,144 | D |
* D/I = Direct / Indirect
* 10% = Entity with 10% or higher ownership stake
* A = Amendment Filing (SEC Form 4/A)