Real Time Insider Transaction Data
Real Time Insider buys and sells Data - Insider Trades - Insider Transactions - Insider Trading Data - SEC Form 4 Data
Total | Transactions | Amount |
Buys | 2 | $1,081,605 |
Sells | 423 | $1,499,524,218 |
Security | Reporting Name | Relationship | Purchase/Sale | Shares | Price $ | D/I | ||||
27 Oct 2022 21:12 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 27 Oct 2022 | Sale | 36,357 | 74.26 | 2,699,871 | I |
27 Oct 2022 21:12 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 27 Oct 2022 | Sale | 101,620 | 73.6 | 7,479,232 | I |
27 Oct 2022 21:12 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 27 Oct 2022 | Sale | 19,617 | 72.63 | 1,424,783 | I |
27 Oct 2022 21:12 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 27 Oct 2022 | Sale | 15,300 | 71.51 | 1,094,103 | I |
27 Oct 2022 21:12 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 27 Oct 2022 | Sale | 19,888 | 70.21 | 1,396,336 | I |
27 Oct 2022 21:12 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 26 Oct 2022 | Sale | 41,604 | 73.6 | 3,062,054 | I |
27 Oct 2022 21:12 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 26 Oct 2022 | Sale | 80,851 | 72.44 | 5,856,846 | I |
27 Oct 2022 21:12 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 26 Oct 2022 | Sale | 61,649 | 72.05 | 4,441,810 | I |
27 Oct 2022 21:12 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 25 Oct 2022 | Sale | 57,337 | 71.39 | 4,093,288 | I |
27 Oct 2022 21:12 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 25 Oct 2022 | Sale | 65,777 | 70.42 | 4,632,016 | I |
27 Oct 2022 21:15 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 26 Oct 2022 | Sale | 21,045 | 73.8 | 1,553,121 | I |
27 Oct 2022 21:15 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 26 Oct 2022 | Sale | 39,357 | 73.17 | 2,879,752 | I |
27 Oct 2022 21:15 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 26 Oct 2022 | Sale | 16,627 | 72.29 | 1,201,966 | I |
27 Oct 2022 21:15 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 25 Oct 2022 | Sale | 57,017 | 71.39 | 4,070,444 | I |
27 Oct 2022 21:15 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 25 Oct 2022 | Sale | 65,954 | 70.42 | 4,644,481 | I |
10 Nov 2022 20:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 10 Nov 2022 | Sale | 77,644 | 84.92 | 6,593,528 | I |
10 Nov 2022 20:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 10 Nov 2022 | Sale | 341,758 | 84.39 | 28,840,958 | I |
10 Nov 2022 20:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 10 Nov 2022 | Sale | 36,569 | 83.47 | 3,052,414 | I |
10 Nov 2022 20:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 09 Nov 2022 | Sale | 70,854 | 80.21 | 5,683,199 | I |
10 Nov 2022 20:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 08 Nov 2022 | Sale | 148,954 | 80.1 | 11,931,215 | I |
10 Nov 2022 20:40 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 10 Nov 2022 | Sale | 2,983 | 85.02 | 253,615 | I |
10 Nov 2022 21:07 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | SAGATI AGHILI NASEEM | General Counsel | 10 Nov 2022 | Sale | 15,000 | 84.92 | 1,273,800 | D |
15 Nov 2022 21:32 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 11 Nov 2022 | Sale | 170 | 85.23 | 14,489 | I |
15 Nov 2022 21:32 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 11 Nov 2022 | Sale | 77,006 | 84.81 | 6,530,879 | I |
15 Nov 2022 21:32 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 11 Nov 2022 | Sale | 9,106 | 83.89 | 763,902 | I |
15 Nov 2022 21:34 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 11 Nov 2022 | Sale | 9,400 | 85.04 | 799,376 | I |
16 Nov 2022 20:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 14 Nov 2022 | Sale | 900 | 82.71 | 74,439 | I |
16 Nov 2022 20:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 14 Nov 2022 | Sale | 12,456 | 81.76 | 1,018,403 | I |
16 Nov 2022 20:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 14 Nov 2022 | Sale | 85,914 | 80.66 | 6,929,823 | I |
16 Nov 2022 20:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 14 Nov 2022 | Sale | 83,225 | 79.85 | 6,645,516 | I |
16 Nov 2022 20:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 14 Nov 2022 | Sale | 17,505 | 78.84 | 1,380,094 | I |
14 Dec 2022 21:00 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 12 Dec 2022 | Sale | 100,000 | 70.14 | 7,014,000 | I |
03 Feb 2023 20:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 03 Feb 2023 | Sale | 94,211 | 85.13 | 8,020,182 | I |
03 Feb 2023 20:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 02 Feb 2023 | Sale | 100 | 86 | 8,600 | I |
03 Feb 2023 20:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 02 Feb 2023 | Sale | 138,332 | 85.33 | 11,803,870 | I |
03 Feb 2023 20:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 01 Feb 2023 | Sale | 25,269 | 85.19 | 2,152,666 | I |
09 Feb 2023 21:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 09 Feb 2023 | Sale | 7,601 | 87.1 | 662,047 | I |
09 Feb 2023 21:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 09 Feb 2023 | Sale | 126,933 | 86.3 | 10,954,318 | I |
09 Feb 2023 21:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 09 Feb 2023 | Sale | 21,943 | 85.9 | 1,884,904 | I |
09 Feb 2023 21:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 08 Feb 2023 | Sale | 230,655 | 85.34 | 19,684,098 | I |
09 Feb 2023 21:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 07 Feb 2023 | Sale | 76,016 | 85.49 | 6,498,608 | I |
10 Feb 2023 20:08 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 10 Feb 2023 | Sale | 16,879 | 85.12 | 1,436,740 | I |
16 May 2023 20:46 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BUSH ANTOINETTE COOK | Director | 12 May 2023 | Purchase | 1,234 | 81.69 | 100,805 | D |
18 May 2023 19:01 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 17 May 2023 | Sale | 15,000 | 82.95 | 1,244,250 | D |
23 May 2023 19:48 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | SAGATI AGHILI NASEEM | General Counsel | 19 May 2023 | Sale | 11,531 | 83.07 | 957,880 | D |
25 May 2023 21:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | OLIAN JUDY D. | Director | 23 May 2023 | Sale | 1,200 | 85.59 | 102,708 | D |
25 May 2023 21:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 23 May 2023 | Sale | 5,000 | 85.63 | 428,150 | D |
25 May 2023 21:48 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 25 May 2023 | Sale | 53,182 | 84.37 | 4,486,965 | D |
25 May 2023 21:48 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 25 May 2023 | Sale | 57,081 | 83.44 | 4,762,839 | D |
25 May 2023 21:48 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 25 May 2023 | Sale | 17,640 | 84.37 | 1,488,287 | I |
25 May 2023 21:48 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 25 May 2023 | Sale | 18,933 | 83.43 | 1,579,580 | I |
25 May 2023 21:48 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 24 May 2023 | Sale | 1,500 | 83.9 | 125,850 | D |
25 May 2023 21:48 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 24 May 2023 | Sale | 123,009 | 83.35 | 10,252,800 | D |
25 May 2023 21:48 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 24 May 2023 | Sale | 40,930 | 82.56 | 3,379,181 | D |
25 May 2023 21:48 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 24 May 2023 | Sale | 516 | 83.91 | 43,298 | I |
25 May 2023 21:48 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 24 May 2023 | Sale | 41,035 | 83.35 | 3,420,267 | I |
25 May 2023 21:48 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 24 May 2023 | Sale | 13,713 | 82.57 | 1,132,282 | I |
31 May 2023 20:56 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 26 May 2023 | Sale | 41,832 | 85.11 | 3,560,322 | I |
31 May 2023 20:56 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 26 May 2023 | Sale | 22,026 | 84.29 | 1,856,572 | I |
31 May 2023 20:56 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 26 May 2023 | Sale | 44,909 | 85.11 | 3,822,205 | D |
31 May 2023 20:56 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 26 May 2023 | Sale | 23,694 | 84.3 | 1,997,404 | D |
31 May 2023 20:56 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 30 May 2023 | Sale | 5,000 | 87.32 | 436,600 | D |
05 Jun 2023 19:47 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 02 Jun 2023 | Sale | 10,000 | 89.11 | 891,100 | D |
05 Jun 2023 19:47 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 01 Jun 2023 | Sale | 10,000 | 88.22 | 882,200 | D |
06 Jun 2023 21:11 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 06 Jun 2023 | Sale | 152,033 | 91.29 | 13,879,093 | I |
06 Jun 2023 21:11 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 06 Jun 2023 | Sale | 106,130 | 90.38 | 9,592,029 | I |
06 Jun 2023 21:11 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 02 Jun 2023 | Sale | 4,460 | 90 | 401,400 | I |
09 Jun 2023 16:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 07 Jun 2023 | Sale | 50,769 | 91.34 | 4,637,240 | I |
09 Jun 2023 16:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 07 Jun 2023 | Sale | 186,608 | 90.4 | 16,869,363 | I |
15 Jun 2023 19:17 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Jun 2023 | Sale | 64,480 | 95.13 | 6,133,982 | I |
15 Jun 2023 19:17 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 14 Jun 2023 | Sale | 400 | 95 | 38,000 | I |
15 Jun 2023 19:17 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 13 Jun 2023 | Sale | 4,950 | 95.02 | 470,349 | I |
30 Jun 2023 18:56 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 29 Jun 2023 | Sale | 36,085 | 95.09 | 3,431,323 | I |
10 Aug 2023 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | DEVEER R. KIPP | Head of Credit Group | 08 Aug 2023 | Sale | 166,546 | 100.28 | 16,701,233 | D |
10 Aug 2023 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | DEVEER R. KIPP | Head of Credit Group | 08 Aug 2023 | Sale | 33,454 | 99.37 | 3,324,324 | D |
17 Aug 2023 20:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 16 Aug 2023 | Sale | 9,946 | 97.51 | 969,834 | I |
17 Aug 2023 20:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 15 Aug 2023 | Sale | 29,321 | 99.96 | 2,930,927 | I |
17 Aug 2023 20:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 15 Aug 2023 | Sale | 274 | 100.78 | 27,614 | I |
17 Aug 2023 20:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 15 Aug 2023 | Sale | 44,884 | 98.85 | 4,436,783 | I |
17 Aug 2023 20:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 15 Aug 2023 | Sale | 115,575 | 97.81 | 11,304,391 | I |
17 Aug 2023 20:25 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 16 Aug 2023 | Sale | 47,511 | 97.51 | 4,632,798 | I |
17 Aug 2023 20:25 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Aug 2023 | Sale | 571 | 100.41 | 57,334 | I |
17 Aug 2023 20:25 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Aug 2023 | Sale | 54,994 | 98.83 | 5,435,057 | I |
17 Aug 2023 20:25 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Aug 2023 | Sale | 37,861 | 99.92 | 3,783,071 | I |
17 Aug 2023 20:25 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Aug 2023 | Sale | 109,063 | 97.78 | 10,664,180 | I |
17 Aug 2023 20:26 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Aug 2023 | Sale | 230 | 100.56 | 23,129 | I |
17 Aug 2023 20:26 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Aug 2023 | Sale | 21,917 | 99.96 | 2,190,823 | I |
17 Aug 2023 20:26 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Aug 2023 | Sale | 33,854 | 98.85 | 3,346,468 | I |
17 Aug 2023 20:26 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Aug 2023 | Sale | 93,999 | 97.82 | 9,194,982 | I |
17 Aug 2023 20:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BHUTANI ASHISH | Director | 15 Aug 2023 | Purchase | 10,000 | 98.08 | 980,800 | D |
07 Sep 2023 19:01 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 05 Sep 2023 | Sale | 25,563 | 104.01 | 2,658,808 | I |
07 Sep 2023 19:01 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 05 Sep 2023 | Sale | 156,745 | 103.48 | 16,219,973 | I |
07 Sep 2023 19:01 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 05 Sep 2023 | Sale | 17,692 | 102.52 | 1,813,784 | I |
11 Sep 2023 19:04 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | DEVEER R. KIPP | Head of Credit Group | 08 Sep 2023 | Sale | 81,498 | 105.14 | 8,568,700 | D |
18 Sep 2023 21:31 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Sep 2023 | Sale | 102,141 | 104.99 | 10,723,784 | I |
18 Sep 2023 21:31 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Sep 2023 | Sale | 47,859 | 104.37 | 4,995,044 | I |
18 Sep 2023 21:33 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 15 Sep 2023 | Sale | 22,534 | 104.83 | 2,362,239 | D |
18 Sep 2023 21:33 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 15 Sep 2023 | Sale | 12,466 | 104.26 | 1,299,705 | D |
18 Sep 2023 21:33 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 14 Sep 2023 | Sale | 4,352 | 105.13 | 457,526 | D |
18 Sep 2023 21:33 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 14 Sep 2023 | Sale | 35,648 | 104.77 | 3,734,841 | D |
* D/I = Direct / Indirect
* 10% = Entity with 10% or higher ownership stake
* A = Amendment Filing (SEC Form 4/A)