Real Time Insider Transaction Data
Real Time Insider buys and sells Data - Insider Trades - Insider Transactions - Insider Trading Data - SEC Form 4 Data
Total | Transactions | Amount |
Buys | 2 | $1,081,605 |
Sells | 423 | $1,499,524,218 |
Security | Reporting Name | Relationship | Purchase/Sale | Shares | Price $ | D/I | ||||
08 Mar 2024 16:18 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 07 Mar 2024 | Sale | 3,000,000 | 130.3 | 390,900,000 | I |
16 Feb 2024 20:44 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | DEVEER R. KIPP | Head of Credit Group | 16 Feb 2024 | Sale | 34,679 | 135.55 | 4,700,738 | D |
16 Feb 2024 20:44 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | DEVEER R. KIPP | Head of Credit Group | 16 Feb 2024 | Sale | 45,958 | 135.02 | 6,205,249 | D |
16 Feb 2024 20:44 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | DEVEER R. KIPP | Head of Credit Group | 15 Feb 2024 | Sale | 403 | 136.69 | 55,086 | D |
16 Feb 2024 20:44 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | DEVEER R. KIPP | Head of Credit Group | 15 Feb 2024 | Sale | 6,940 | 136 | 943,840 | D |
16 Feb 2024 20:44 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | DEVEER R. KIPP | Head of Credit Group | 15 Feb 2024 | Sale | 41,073 | 135.28 | 5,556,355 | D |
16 Feb 2024 20:44 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | DEVEER R. KIPP | Head of Credit Group | 14 Feb 2024 | Sale | 82,796 | 136.47 | 11,299,170 | D |
16 Nov 2023 20:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Nov 2023 | Sale | 3,111 | 109.07 | 339,317 | I |
16 Nov 2023 20:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Nov 2023 | Sale | 6,699 | 107.88 | 722,688 | I |
16 Nov 2023 20:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Nov 2023 | Sale | 22,696 | 106.22 | 2,410,769 | I |
16 Nov 2023 20:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Nov 2023 | Sale | 10,771 | 107.31 | 1,155,836 | I |
16 Nov 2023 20:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Nov 2023 | Sale | 39,831 | 105.07 | 4,185,043 | I |
16 Nov 2023 20:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Nov 2023 | Sale | 66,892 | 104.07 | 6,961,450 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 100 | 101.82 | 10,182 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 3,638 | 101.28 | 368,457 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 12,294 | 100.08 | 1,230,384 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 7,160 | 103.16 | 738,626 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 6,410 | 99.42 | 637,282 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 70,398 | 102.46 | 7,212,979 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:43 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 3,600 | 101.3 | 364,680 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:43 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 11,679 | 100.09 | 1,168,951 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:43 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 6,539 | 99.43 | 650,173 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:43 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 7,899 | 103.14 | 814,703 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:43 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 70,283 | 102.46 | 7,201,196 | I |
18 Sep 2023 21:31 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Sep 2023 | Sale | 102,141 | 104.99 | 10,723,784 | I |
18 Sep 2023 21:31 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Sep 2023 | Sale | 47,859 | 104.37 | 4,995,044 | I |
18 Sep 2023 21:33 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 15 Sep 2023 | Sale | 22,534 | 104.83 | 2,362,239 | D |
18 Sep 2023 21:33 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 15 Sep 2023 | Sale | 12,466 | 104.26 | 1,299,705 | D |
18 Sep 2023 21:33 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 14 Sep 2023 | Sale | 4,352 | 105.13 | 457,526 | D |
18 Sep 2023 21:33 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 14 Sep 2023 | Sale | 35,648 | 104.77 | 3,734,841 | D |
11 Sep 2023 19:04 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | DEVEER R. KIPP | Head of Credit Group | 08 Sep 2023 | Sale | 81,498 | 105.14 | 8,568,700 | D |
07 Sep 2023 19:01 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 05 Sep 2023 | Sale | 25,563 | 104.01 | 2,658,808 | I |
07 Sep 2023 19:01 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 05 Sep 2023 | Sale | 156,745 | 103.48 | 16,219,973 | I |
07 Sep 2023 19:01 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 05 Sep 2023 | Sale | 17,692 | 102.52 | 1,813,784 | I |
19 Sep 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 19 Sep 2024 | Sale | 12,500 | 156.17 | 1,952,125 | D |
19 Sep 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 18 Sep 2024 | Sale | 1,280 | 155.13 | 198,566 | D |
19 Sep 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 18 Sep 2024 | Sale | 11,220 | 154.32 | 1,731,470 | D |
19 Sep 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 17 Sep 2024 | Sale | 12,500 | 152.17 | 1,902,125 | D |
19 Sep 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 17 Sep 2024 | Sale | 1,408 | 151.06 | 212,692 | D |
19 Sep 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 17 Sep 2024 | Sale | 11,092 | 150.37 | 1,667,904 | D |
16 Sep 2024 19:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 16 Sep 2024 | Sale | 300 | 149.04 | 44,712 | D |
16 Sep 2024 19:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 16 Sep 2024 | Sale | 12,200 | 148.4 | 1,810,480 | D |
16 Sep 2024 19:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 10,000 | 146.23 | 1,462,300 | D |
16 Sep 2024 19:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 9,999 | 144.92 | 1,449,055 | D |
16 Sep 2024 19:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 1 | 144.01 | 144 | D |
16 Sep 2024 19:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 34,331 | 143.65 | 4,931,648 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 26,768 | 143.01 | 3,828,092 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 8,000 | 142.12 | 1,136,960 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 5,901 | 141.03 | 832,218 | I |
09 Sep 2024 20:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 09 Sep 2024 | Sale | 10,000 | 142.12 | 1,421,200 | D |
09 Sep 2024 20:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 05 Sep 2024 | Sale | 616 | 141.9 | 87,410 | D |
09 Sep 2024 20:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 05 Sep 2024 | Sale | 26,867 | 140.35 | 3,770,783 | D |
09 Sep 2024 20:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 05 Sep 2024 | Sale | 30,017 | 141.07 | 4,234,498 | D |
04 Sep 2024 20:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 03 Sep 2024 | Sale | 900 | 145.1 | 130,590 | I |
04 Sep 2024 20:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 03 Sep 2024 | Sale | 3,070 | 143.88 | 441,712 | I |
04 Sep 2024 20:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 03 Sep 2024 | Sale | 16,295 | 142.14 | 2,316,171 | I |
04 Sep 2024 20:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 03 Sep 2024 | Sale | 6,314 | 143.05 | 903,218 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:24 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 30 Aug 2024 | Sale | 5,772 | 146.34 | 844,674 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:24 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 30 Aug 2024 | Sale | 5,294 | 145.5 | 770,277 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:24 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 30 Aug 2024 | Sale | 3,470 | 144.63 | 501,866 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:24 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 29 Aug 2024 | Sale | 4,849 | 145.65 | 706,257 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:24 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 29 Aug 2024 | Sale | 8,690 | 144.78 | 1,258,138 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:24 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 28 Aug 2024 | Sale | 22,247 | 145.17 | 3,229,597 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:24 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 28 Aug 2024 | Sale | 5,440 | 145.85 | 793,424 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:25 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 30 Aug 2024 | Sale | 4,973 | 146.39 | 727,997 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:25 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 30 Aug 2024 | Sale | 6,446 | 145.57 | 938,344 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:25 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 30 Aug 2024 | Sale | 3,543 | 144.63 | 512,424 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:25 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 29 Aug 2024 | Sale | 5,333 | 145.67 | 776,858 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:25 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 29 Aug 2024 | Sale | 7,800 | 144.78 | 1,129,284 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:25 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 28 Aug 2024 | Sale | 6,093 | 145.83 | 888,542 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:25 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 28 Aug 2024 | Sale | 21,535 | 145.16 | 3,126,021 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:24 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 30 Aug 2024 | Sale | 17,008 | 146.31 | 2,488,440 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:24 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 30 Aug 2024 | Sale | 3,843 | 144.56 | 555,544 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:24 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 30 Aug 2024 | Sale | 14,037 | 145.45 | 2,041,682 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:24 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 29 Aug 2024 | Sale | 5,355 | 145.68 | 780,116 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:24 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 29 Aug 2024 | Sale | 8,178 | 144.76 | 1,183,847 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:40 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 27 Aug 2024 | Sale | 8,556 | 147.76 | 1,264,235 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:40 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 27 Aug 2024 | Sale | 9,086 | 147.17 | 1,337,187 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:40 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 27 Aug 2024 | Sale | 8,096 | 146.26 | 1,184,121 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:40 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 26 Aug 2024 | Sale | 200 | 147.95 | 29,590 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:40 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 26 Aug 2024 | Sale | 9,704 | 146.98 | 1,426,294 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:40 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 26 Aug 2024 | Sale | 9,136 | 146.44 | 1,337,876 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:40 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 23 Aug 2024 | Sale | 7,507 | 147.05 | 1,103,904 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:40 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 23 Aug 2024 | Sale | 21,341 | 146.55 | 3,127,524 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:40 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 23 Aug 2024 | Sale | 5,716 | 145.36 | 830,878 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:40 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 23 Aug 2024 | Sale | 1,905 | 144.49 | 275,253 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 27 Aug 2024 | Sale | 8,072 | 147.77 | 1,192,799 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 27 Aug 2024 | Sale | 9,683 | 147.18 | 1,425,144 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 27 Aug 2024 | Sale | 7,770 | 146.27 | 1,136,518 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 26 Aug 2024 | Sale | 300 | 147.91 | 44,373 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 26 Aug 2024 | Sale | 11,018 | 146.95 | 1,619,095 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 26 Aug 2024 | Sale | 7,944 | 146.41 | 1,163,081 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 23 Aug 2024 | Sale | 20,912 | 146.54 | 3,064,444 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 23 Aug 2024 | Sale | 7,547 | 147.05 | 1,109,786 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 23 Aug 2024 | Sale | 5,795 | 145.34 | 842,245 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 23 Aug 2024 | Sale | 1,805 | 144.49 | 260,804 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 22 Aug 2024 | Sale | 2,044 | 144.65 | 295,665 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 22 Aug 2024 | Sale | 3,987 | 144.03 | 574,248 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 21 Aug 2024 | Sale | 9,861 | 144.34 | 1,423,337 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 21 Aug 2024 | Sale | 5,843 | 143.66 | 839,405 | I |
* D/I = Direct / Indirect
* 10% = Entity with 10% or higher ownership stake
* A = Amendment Filing (SEC Form 4/A)