Real Time Insider Transaction Data
Real Time Insider buys and sells Data - Insider Trades - Insider Transactions - Insider Trading Data - SEC Form 4 Data
Total | Transactions | Amount |
Buys | 2 | $1,081,605 |
Sells | 423 | $1,499,524,218 |
Security | Reporting Name | Relationship | Purchase/Sale | Shares | Price $ | D/I | ||||
08 Mar 2024 16:18 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 07 Mar 2024 | Sale | 3,000,000 | 130.3 | 390,900,000 | I |
10 Nov 2022 20:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 10 Nov 2022 | Sale | 341,758 | 84.39 | 28,840,958 | I |
09 Feb 2023 21:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 08 Feb 2023 | Sale | 230,655 | 85.34 | 19,684,098 | I |
09 Apr 2024 20:06 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 08 Apr 2024 | Sale | 125,180 | 135.14 | 16,916,825 | I |
09 Jun 2023 16:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 07 Jun 2023 | Sale | 186,608 | 90.4 | 16,869,363 | I |
10 Aug 2023 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | DEVEER R. KIPP | Head of Credit Group | 08 Aug 2023 | Sale | 166,546 | 100.28 | 16,701,233 | D |
07 Sep 2023 19:01 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 05 Sep 2023 | Sale | 156,745 | 103.48 | 16,219,973 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 11 Apr 2024 | Sale | 116,540 | 134.31 | 15,652,487 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 04 Apr 2024 | Sale | 111,499 | 132.27 | 14,747,973 | I |
06 Jun 2023 21:11 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 06 Jun 2023 | Sale | 152,033 | 91.29 | 13,879,093 | I |
19 Apr 2024 18:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 17 Apr 2024 | Sale | 104,776 | 131.65 | 13,793,760 | I |
09 Apr 2024 20:06 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 09 Apr 2024 | Sale | 97,905 | 133.06 | 13,027,239 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 12 Apr 2024 | Sale | 92,924 | 131.8 | 12,247,383 | I |
10 Nov 2022 20:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 08 Nov 2022 | Sale | 148,954 | 80.1 | 11,931,215 | I |
03 Feb 2023 20:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 02 Feb 2023 | Sale | 138,332 | 85.33 | 11,803,870 | I |
17 Aug 2023 20:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 15 Aug 2023 | Sale | 115,575 | 97.81 | 11,304,391 | I |
16 Feb 2024 20:44 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | DEVEER R. KIPP | Head of Credit Group | 14 Feb 2024 | Sale | 82,796 | 136.47 | 11,299,170 | D |
09 Feb 2023 21:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 09 Feb 2023 | Sale | 126,933 | 86.3 | 10,954,318 | I |
25 Jun 2024 20:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 21 Jun 2024 | Sale | 82,625 | 131.83 | 10,892,454 | I |
18 Sep 2023 21:31 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Sep 2023 | Sale | 102,141 | 104.99 | 10,723,784 | I |
17 Aug 2023 20:25 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Aug 2023 | Sale | 109,063 | 97.78 | 10,664,180 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 10 Apr 2024 | Sale | 79,422 | 134.18 | 10,656,844 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 16 Apr 2024 | Sale | 80,592 | 130.92 | 10,551,105 | I |
25 May 2023 21:48 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 24 May 2023 | Sale | 123,009 | 83.35 | 10,252,800 | D |
06 Jun 2023 21:11 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 06 Jun 2023 | Sale | 106,130 | 90.38 | 9,592,029 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 05 Apr 2024 | Sale | 71,658 | 133.72 | 9,582,108 | I |
17 Aug 2023 20:26 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Aug 2023 | Sale | 93,999 | 97.82 | 9,194,982 | I |
17 May 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 May 2024 | Sale | 60,949 | 149.58 | 9,116,751 | I |
25 Jun 2024 20:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 21 Jun 2024 | Sale | 68,915 | 131.82 | 9,084,375 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 05 Apr 2024 | Sale | 65,295 | 134.25 | 8,765,854 | I |
11 Sep 2023 19:04 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | DEVEER R. KIPP | Head of Credit Group | 08 Sep 2023 | Sale | 81,498 | 105.14 | 8,568,700 | D |
03 Feb 2023 20:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 03 Feb 2023 | Sale | 94,211 | 85.13 | 8,020,182 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 11 Apr 2024 | Sale | 58,459 | 133.72 | 7,817,137 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 55,630 | 140.23 | 7,800,995 | I |
09 Apr 2024 20:06 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 09 Apr 2024 | Sale | 57,017 | 133.93 | 7,636,287 | I |
17 May 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 16 May 2024 | Sale | 51,711 | 146.98 | 7,600,483 | I |
27 Oct 2022 21:12 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 27 Oct 2022 | Sale | 101,620 | 73.6 | 7,479,232 | I |
17 May 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 May 2024 | Sale | 49,637 | 147.34 | 7,313,516 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 70,398 | 102.46 | 7,212,979 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:43 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 70,283 | 102.46 | 7,201,196 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 50,729 | 140.23 | 7,113,728 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 04 Apr 2024 | Sale | 52,868 | 132.93 | 7,027,743 | I |
14 Dec 2022 21:00 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 12 Dec 2022 | Sale | 100,000 | 70.14 | 7,014,000 | I |
16 Nov 2023 20:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Nov 2023 | Sale | 66,892 | 104.07 | 6,961,450 | I |
16 Nov 2022 20:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 14 Nov 2022 | Sale | 85,914 | 80.66 | 6,929,823 | I |
09 Apr 2024 20:06 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 09 Apr 2024 | Sale | 50,953 | 132.46 | 6,749,234 | I |
16 Nov 2022 20:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 14 Nov 2022 | Sale | 83,225 | 79.85 | 6,645,516 | I |
10 Nov 2022 20:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 10 Nov 2022 | Sale | 77,644 | 84.92 | 6,593,528 | I |
15 Nov 2022 21:32 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 11 Nov 2022 | Sale | 77,006 | 84.81 | 6,530,879 | I |
09 Feb 2023 21:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 07 Feb 2023 | Sale | 76,016 | 85.49 | 6,498,608 | I |
09 Apr 2024 20:06 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 08 Apr 2024 | Sale | 48,378 | 134.23 | 6,493,779 | I |
23 Jul 2024 20:15 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | DEVEER R. KIPP | Head of Credit Group | 22 Jul 2024 | Sale | 41,676 | 150.21 | 6,260,152 | D |
16 Feb 2024 20:44 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | DEVEER R. KIPP | Head of Credit Group | 16 Feb 2024 | Sale | 45,958 | 135.02 | 6,205,249 | D |
15 Jun 2023 19:17 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Jun 2023 | Sale | 64,480 | 95.13 | 6,133,982 | I |
27 Oct 2022 21:12 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 26 Oct 2022 | Sale | 80,851 | 72.44 | 5,856,846 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 10 Apr 2024 | Sale | 43,319 | 135.07 | 5,851,097 | I |
10 Nov 2022 20:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 09 Nov 2022 | Sale | 70,854 | 80.21 | 5,683,199 | I |
16 Feb 2024 20:44 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | DEVEER R. KIPP | Head of Credit Group | 15 Feb 2024 | Sale | 41,073 | 135.28 | 5,556,355 | D |
25 Jun 2024 20:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 21 Jun 2024 | Sale | 41,943 | 131.42 | 5,512,149 | I |
17 Aug 2023 20:25 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Aug 2023 | Sale | 54,994 | 98.83 | 5,435,057 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 37,839 | 139.59 | 5,281,946 | I |
18 Mar 2024 21:47 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 14 Mar 2024 | Sale | 39,758 | 132.53 | 5,269,128 | D |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 16 Apr 2024 | Sale | 39,952 | 130.17 | 5,200,552 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 03 Apr 2024 | Sale | 38,740 | 132.13 | 5,118,716 | I |
18 Sep 2023 21:31 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Sep 2023 | Sale | 47,859 | 104.37 | 4,995,044 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 34,331 | 143.65 | 4,931,648 | I |
19 Apr 2024 18:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 17 Apr 2024 | Sale | 37,193 | 131.08 | 4,875,258 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 34,834 | 136.77 | 4,764,246 | I |
25 May 2023 21:48 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 25 May 2023 | Sale | 57,081 | 83.44 | 4,762,839 | D |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 34,567 | 136.75 | 4,727,037 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Apr 2024 | Sale | 35,796 | 132.03 | 4,726,146 | I |
16 Feb 2024 20:44 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | DEVEER R. KIPP | Head of Credit Group | 16 Feb 2024 | Sale | 34,679 | 135.55 | 4,700,738 | D |
27 Oct 2022 21:15 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 25 Oct 2022 | Sale | 65,954 | 70.42 | 4,644,481 | I |
09 Jun 2023 16:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 07 Jun 2023 | Sale | 50,769 | 91.34 | 4,637,240 | I |
17 Aug 2023 20:25 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 16 Aug 2023 | Sale | 47,511 | 97.51 | 4,632,798 | I |
27 Oct 2022 21:12 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 25 Oct 2022 | Sale | 65,777 | 70.42 | 4,632,016 | I |
25 May 2023 21:48 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 25 May 2023 | Sale | 53,182 | 84.37 | 4,486,965 | D |
04 Jun 2024 18:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 32,090 | 139.59 | 4,479,443 | I |
25 Jun 2024 20:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 21 Jun 2024 | Sale | 34,045 | 131.41 | 4,473,853 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 34,668 | 128.5 | 4,454,838 | I |
27 Oct 2022 21:12 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 26 Oct 2022 | Sale | 61,649 | 72.05 | 4,441,810 | I |
17 Aug 2023 20:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 15 Aug 2023 | Sale | 44,884 | 98.85 | 4,436,783 | I |
28 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 28 Mar 2024 | Sale | 33,119 | 133.05 | 4,406,483 | I |
09 Sep 2024 20:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 05 Sep 2024 | Sale | 30,017 | 141.07 | 4,234,498 | D |
16 Nov 2023 20:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Nov 2023 | Sale | 39,831 | 105.07 | 4,185,043 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 31,015 | 132.21 | 4,100,493 | I |
27 Oct 2022 21:12 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 25 Oct 2022 | Sale | 57,337 | 71.39 | 4,093,288 | I |
27 Oct 2022 21:15 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 25 Oct 2022 | Sale | 57,017 | 71.39 | 4,070,444 | I |
18 Mar 2024 21:47 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 30,326 | 132.18 | 4,008,491 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 30,287 | 132.19 | 4,003,639 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 29,137 | 132.19 | 3,851,620 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 26,768 | 143.01 | 3,828,092 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 16 Apr 2024 | Sale | 29,589 | 129.33 | 3,826,745 | I |
31 May 2023 20:56 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 26 May 2023 | Sale | 44,909 | 85.11 | 3,822,205 | D |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 29,503 | 129.31 | 3,815,033 | I |
17 Aug 2023 20:25 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Aug 2023 | Sale | 37,861 | 99.92 | 3,783,071 | I |
09 Sep 2024 20:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 05 Sep 2024 | Sale | 26,867 | 140.35 | 3,770,783 | D |
18 Sep 2023 21:33 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 14 Sep 2023 | Sale | 35,648 | 104.77 | 3,734,841 | D |
17 May 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 May 2024 | Sale | 25,429 | 146.59 | 3,727,637 | I |
17 May 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 16 May 2024 | Sale | 24,450 | 148.94 | 3,641,583 | I |
* D/I = Direct / Indirect
* 10% = Entity with 10% or higher ownership stake
* A = Amendment Filing (SEC Form 4/A)