Real Time Insider Transaction Data
Real Time Insider buys and sells Data - Insider Trades - Insider Transactions - Insider Trading Data - SEC Form 4 Data
Total | Transactions | Amount |
Buys | 23864 | $20,400,259,169 |
Sells | 85603 | $212,092,293,649 |
Security | Reporting Name | Relationship | Purchase/Sale | Shares | Price $ | D/I | ||||
16 Sep 2024 20:51 | ZBIO | Zenas BioPharma Inc | SR ONE CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC | 10% | 16 Sep 2024 | Purchase | 441,176 | 17 | 7,499,992 | I |
16 Sep 2024 20:51 | ZBIO | Zenas BioPharma Inc | SR ONE CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC | 10% | 16 Sep 2024 | Purchase | 1,352,942 | 17 | 23,000,014 | I |
16 Sep 2024 20:51 | ZBIO | Zenas BioPharma Inc | SR ONE CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC | 10% | 16 Sep 2024 | Purchase | 441,176 | 17 | 7,499,992 | I |
16 Sep 2024 20:51 | PRKS | United Parks & Resorts Inc | TAYLOR GEORGE ANTHONY | See Remarks | 05 Sep 2024 | Sale | 23,837 | 52.94 | 1,261,931 | D |
16 Sep 2024 20:50 | MREO | Mereo BioPharma Group plc | SCOTS-KNIGHT DENISE | Chief Executive Officer | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 28,611 | 4.4727 | 127,968 | D |
16 Sep 2024 20:50 | MREO | Mereo BioPharma Group plc | SCOTS-KNIGHT DENISE | Chief Executive Officer | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 60,046 | 4.221 | 253,454 | D |
16 Sep 2024 20:49 | MREO | Mereo BioPharma Group plc | LEWICKI JOHN A. | Chief Scientific Officer | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 5,212 | 4.4727 | 23,312 | D |
16 Sep 2024 20:49 | MREO | Mereo BioPharma Group plc | LEWICKI JOHN A. | Chief Scientific Officer | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 10,937 | 4.221 | 46,165 | D |
16 Sep 2024 20:48 | MREO | Mereo BioPharma Group plc | SERMON CHARLES | General Counsel | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 9,980 | 4.4727 | 44,638 | D |
16 Sep 2024 20:48 | MREO | Mereo BioPharma Group plc | SERMON CHARLES | General Counsel | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 20,946 | 4.221 | 88,413 | D |
16 Sep 2024 20:48 | INMB | Inmune Bio Inc | TESI RAYMOND JOSEPH | President and CEO, 10% | 12 Sep 2024 | Purchase | 15,380 | 6.375 | 98,048 | D |
16 Sep 2024 20:47 | MREO | Mereo BioPharma Group plc | FOX CHRISTINE ANN | Chief Financial Officer | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 9,128 | 4.4727 | 40,827 | D |
16 Sep 2024 20:47 | MREO | Mereo BioPharma Group plc | FOX CHRISTINE ANN | Chief Financial Officer | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 19,158 | 4.221 | 80,866 | D |
16 Sep 2024 20:47 | INMB | Inmune Bio Inc | MOSS DAVID J | Chief Financial Officer, 10% | 12 Sep 2024 | Purchase | 7,690 | 6.375 | 49,024 | D |
16 Sep 2024 20:46 | MREO | Mereo BioPharma Group plc | HUGHES-WILSON ALEXANDRA | See Remarks | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 7,769 | 4.4727 | 34,748 | D |
16 Sep 2024 20:46 | MREO | Mereo BioPharma Group plc | HUGHES-WILSON ALEXANDRA | See Remarks | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 40,029 | 4.4727 | 179,038 | D |
16 Sep 2024 20:46 | MREO | Mereo BioPharma Group plc | HUGHES-WILSON ALEXANDRA | See Remarks | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 16,304 | 4.221 | 68,819 | D |
16 Sep 2024 20:46 | MREO | Mereo BioPharma Group plc | HUGHES-WILSON ALEXANDRA | See Remarks | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 84,008 | 4.221 | 354,598 | D |
16 Sep 2024 20:40 | MARA | MARA Holdings Inc | MELLINGER DOUGLAS K | Director | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 1,000 | 16 | 16,000 | D |
16 Sep 2024 20:23 | OUST | Ouster Inc | WEINSWIG MARK | Chief Financial Officer | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 2,540 | 6.1633 | 15,655 | D |
16 Sep 2024 20:22 | OUST | Ouster Inc | CHUNG MEGAN | General Counsel and Secretary | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 2,644 | 6.1633 | 16,296 | D |
16 Sep 2024 20:19 | OUST | Ouster Inc | SPENCER DARIEN | Chief Operating Officer | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 3,844 | 6.1633 | 23,692 | D |
16 Sep 2024 20:11 | SRFM | SURF AIR MOBILITY Inc | PALANTIR TECHNOLOGIES INC. | 10% | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 8,300 | 1.4965 | 12,421 | D |
16 Sep 2024 20:11 | SRFM | SURF AIR MOBILITY Inc | PALANTIR TECHNOLOGIES INC. | 10% | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 5,131 | 1.4929 | 7,660 | D |
16 Sep 2024 20:11 | SRFM | SURF AIR MOBILITY Inc | PALANTIR TECHNOLOGIES INC. | 10% | 16 Sep 2024 | Sale | 6,673 | 1.3456 | 8,979 | D |
16 Sep 2024 20:09 | FTV | Fortive Corp | MCLAUGHLIN CHARLES E | SVP - Chief Financial Officer | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 6,864 | 74.03 | 508,142 | D |
16 Sep 2024 20:08 | FTV | Fortive Corp | SCHWARZ JONATHAN L | SVP - Corporate Development | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 14,223 | 73.8 | 1,049,657 | D |
16 Sep 2024 20:07 | XPOF | Xponential Fitness Inc | LUNA SARAH | President | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 14,400 | 13.8459 | 199,381 | D |
16 Sep 2024 19:57 | USFD | US Foods Holding Corp | LOCASCIO DIRK J. | EVP, Chief Financial Officer | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 10,000 | 57.95 | 579,500 | D |
16 Sep 2024 19:36 | LBPH | Longboard Pharmaceuticals Inc | KAYE RANDALL | CMO | 16 Sep 2024 | Sale | 9,366 | 30.886 | 289,278 | D |
16 Sep 2024 19:36 | LBPH | Longboard Pharmaceuticals Inc | KAYE RANDALL | CMO | 16 Sep 2024 | Sale | 4,200 | 31.8148 | 133,622 | D |
16 Sep 2024 19:36 | LBPH | Longboard Pharmaceuticals Inc | KAYE RANDALL | CMO | 16 Sep 2024 | Sale | 1,200 | 33.1246 | 39,750 | D |
16 Sep 2024 19:36 | LBPH | Longboard Pharmaceuticals Inc | KAYE RANDALL | CMO | 16 Sep 2024 | Sale | 1,900 | 34.0359 | 64,668 | D |
16 Sep 2024 19:35 | ASST | Asset Entities Inc | GAUBERT MICHAEL | Executive Chairman, 10% | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 76,723 | 1.5476 | 118,737 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:35 | ASST | Asset Entities Inc | GAUBERT MICHAEL | Executive Chairman, 10% | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 179,683 | 1.9719 | 354,317 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:34 | ASST | Asset Entities Inc | KRUEGER MATTHEW | CFO, Treasurer and Secretary, 10% | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 179,683 | 1.9719 | 354,317 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:34 | ASST | Asset Entities Inc | KRUEGER MATTHEW | CFO, Treasurer and Secretary, 10% | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 76,723 | 1.5476 | 118,737 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:33 | ASST | Asset Entities Inc | FAIRBANKS KYLE | Exe. Vice-Chairman and CMO, 10% | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 179,683 | 1.9719 | 354,317 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:33 | ASST | Asset Entities Inc | FAIRBANKS KYLE | Exe. Vice-Chairman and CMO, 10% | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 76,723 | 1.5476 | 118,737 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:33 | ASST | Asset Entities Inc | FAIRBANKS JACKSON | 10% | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 76,723 | 1.5476 | 118,737 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:33 | ASST | Asset Entities Inc | FAIRBANKS JACKSON | 10% | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 179,683 | 1.9719 | 354,317 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:32 | ASST | Asset Entities Inc | SARKHANI ARSHIA | CEO and President, 10% | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 179,683 | 1.9719 | 354,317 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:32 | ASST | Asset Entities Inc | SARKHANI ARSHIA | CEO and President, 10% | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 76,723 | 1.5476 | 118,737 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:31 | ASST | Asset Entities Inc | SARKHANI ARMAN | Chief Operating Officer | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 179,683 | 1.9719 | 354,317 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:31 | ASST | Asset Entities Inc | SARKHANI ARMAN | Chief Operating Officer | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 76,723 | 1.5476 | 118,737 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:30 | ASST | Asset Entities Inc | ASSET ENTITIES HOLDINGS, LLC | 10% | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 179,683 | 1.9719 | 354,317 | D |
16 Sep 2024 19:30 | ASST | Asset Entities Inc | ASSET ENTITIES HOLDINGS, LLC | 10% | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 76,723 | 1.5476 | 118,737 | D |
16 Sep 2024 19:28 | WY | WEYERHAEUSER CO | O'ROURKE JAMES CALVIN | Director | 13 Sep 2024 | Purchase | 7,800 | 32.0097 | 249,676 | D |
16 Sep 2024 19:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 1 | 144.01 | 144 | D |
16 Sep 2024 19:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 9,999 | 144.92 | 1,449,055 | D |
16 Sep 2024 19:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 10,000 | 146.23 | 1,462,300 | D |
16 Sep 2024 19:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 16 Sep 2024 | Sale | 12,200 | 148.4 | 1,810,480 | D |
16 Sep 2024 19:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 16 Sep 2024 | Sale | 300 | 149.04 | 44,712 | D |
16 Sep 2024 19:23 | NSSC | NAPCO SECURITY TECHNOLOGIES INC | BEEBER PAUL STEPHEN | Director | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 708 | 37.12 | 26,281 | D |
16 Sep 2024 19:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 5,901 | 141.03 | 832,218 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 8,000 | 142.12 | 1,136,960 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 26,768 | 143.01 | 3,828,092 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 34,331 | 143.65 | 4,931,648 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:21 | LUNR | Intuitive Machines Inc | CRAIN TIMOTHY PRICE II | SVP and Chief Growth Officer, 10% | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 197,637 | 6.0512 | 1,195,941 | D |
16 Sep 2024 19:20 | CORZ | Core Scientific Inc | PATTEN JARROD M | Director | 13 Sep 2024 | Purchase | 2,240 | 11.05 | 24,752 | D |
16 Sep 2024 19:18 | LUNR | Intuitive Machines Inc | ALTEMUS STEPHEN J | Chief Executive Officer, 10% | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 440,288 | 6.0287 | 2,654,364 | D |
16 Sep 2024 19:18 | LUNR | Intuitive Machines Inc | ALTEMUS STEPHEN J | Chief Executive Officer, 10% | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 306,456 | 6.0031 | 1,839,686 | D |
16 Sep 2024 19:09 | EOSE | Eos Energy Enterprises Inc | BORNSTEIN JEFFREY S | Director | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 132,720 | 2.63 | 349,054 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:09 | EOSE | Eos Energy Enterprises Inc | BORNSTEIN JEFFREY S | Director | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 30,000 | 2.62 | 78,600 | D |
16 Sep 2024 19:03 | IESC | IES Holdings Inc | GENDELL JEFFREY L ET AL | Chief Executive Officer, 10% | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 31,106 | 157.82 | 4,909,149 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:03 | IESC | IES Holdings Inc | GENDELL JEFFREY L ET AL | Chief Executive Officer, 10% | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 12,372 | 158.69 | 1,963,313 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:03 | IESC | IES Holdings Inc | GENDELL JEFFREY L ET AL | Chief Executive Officer, 10% | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 4,383 | 160.5 | 703,472 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:03 | IESC | IES Holdings Inc | GENDELL JEFFREY L ET AL | Chief Executive Officer, 10% | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 33,152 | 158.77 | 5,263,543 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:03 | IESC | IES Holdings Inc | GENDELL JEFFREY L ET AL | Chief Executive Officer, 10% | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 11,166 | 161.19 | 1,799,848 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:03 | IESC | IES Holdings Inc | GENDELL JEFFREY L ET AL | Chief Executive Officer, 10% | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 8,987 | 159.5 | 1,433,426 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:03 | IESC | IES Holdings Inc | GENDELL JEFFREY L ET AL | Chief Executive Officer, 10% | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 10,000 | 162 | 1,620,000 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:03 | IESC | IES Holdings Inc | GENDELL JEFFREY L ET AL | Chief Executive Officer, 10% | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 1,487 | 163.3 | 242,827 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:03 | IESC | IES Holdings Inc | GENDELL JEFFREY L ET AL | Chief Executive Officer, 10% | 16 Sep 2024 | Sale | 32,378 | 160 | 5,180,480 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:03 | IESC | IES Holdings Inc | GENDELL JEFFREY L ET AL | Chief Executive Officer, 10% | 16 Sep 2024 | Sale | 4,969 | 161.53 | 802,643 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:00 | PRIM | Primoris Services Corp | PERISICH JOHN M. | CHIEF LEGAL AND ADMIN OFFICER | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 4,391 | 55.331 | 242,958 | D |
16 Sep 2024 18:59 | GDYN | GRID DYNAMICS HOLDINGS Inc | BEIJING TEAMSUN TECHNOLOGY CO. LTD. | 10% | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 913,387 | 12.8 | 11,691,354 | I |
16 Sep 2024 18:53 | SER | Serina Therapeutics Inc | MINTZ STEVEN | Director | 12 Sep 2024 | Purchase | 6,000 | 6.469 | 38,814 | I |
16 Sep 2024 18:41 | FNWD | Finward Bancorp | BOCHNOWSKI BENJAMIN J | President, CEO | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 1.8 | 28.359 | 51 | D |
16 Sep 2024 18:41 | FNWD | Finward Bancorp | BOCHNOWSKI BENJAMIN J | President, CEO | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 0.9 | 28.359 | 26 | I |
16 Sep 2024 18:31 | CELH | Celsius Holdings Inc | FIELDLY JOHN | Chief Executive Officer | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 74,847 | 32.8 | 2,454,982 | D |
16 Sep 2024 18:31 | CELH | Celsius Holdings Inc | FIELDLY JOHN | Chief Executive Officer | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 551,421 | 34.36 | 18,946,826 | D |
16 Sep 2024 18:21 | NTRS | NORTHERN TRUST CORP | TRIBBETT CHARLES A | Director | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 1,855 | 88.12 | 163,463 | I |
16 Sep 2024 18:16 | RBBN | Ribbon Communications Inc | INFANTE BEATRIZ V | Director | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 5,790 | 3.0401 | 17,602 | D |
16 Sep 2024 18:14 | ARDX | ARDELYX Inc | ROSENBAUM DAVID P. | Chief Development Officer | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 5,312 | 6.2601 | 33,254 | I |
16 Sep 2024 18:13 | ACR | ACRES Commercial Realty Corp Preferred |
EAGLE POINT CREDIT MANAGEMENT LLC | 10% | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 8,300 | 22.84 | 189,572 | I |
16 Sep 2024 18:13 | ACR | ACRES Commercial Realty Corp Preferred |
EAGLE POINT CREDIT MANAGEMENT LLC | 10% | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 1,000 | 22.88 | 22,880 | I |
16 Sep 2024 18:13 | ACR | ACRES Commercial Realty Corp Preferred |
EAGLE POINT CREDIT MANAGEMENT LLC | 10% | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 503 | 25 | 12,575 | I |
16 Sep 2024 18:03 | AFRM | Affirm Holdings Inc | WATSON NOEL BERTRAM | Director | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 2,500 | 42.44 | 106,100 | D |
16 Sep 2024 18:02 | TGNA | TEGNA INC | TRELSTAD LYNN B. | EVP and COO, Media Operations | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 25,000 | 13.88 | 347,000 | D |
16 Sep 2024 18:00 | QS | QuantumScape Corp | MCCARTHY MICHAEL O III | CHIEF LEGAL OFFICER | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 100,038 | 5.7967 | 579,890 | D |
16 Sep 2024 18:00 | QS | QuantumScape Corp | MCCARTHY MICHAEL O III | CHIEF LEGAL OFFICER | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 106,084 | 5.8975 | 625,630 | D |
16 Sep 2024 18:00 | QS | QuantumScape Corp | LEOHOLD JURGEN | Director | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 17,435 | 6 | 104,610 | D |
16 Sep 2024 18:00 | QS | QuantumScape Corp | HETTRICH KEVIN | CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 58,000 | 5.7796 | 335,217 | D |
16 Sep 2024 17:49 | ADSK | Autodesk Inc | MCDOWELL MARY T | Director | 16 Sep 2024 | Sale | 550 | 265.5 | 146,025 | D |
16 Sep 2024 17:48 | LDI | loanDepot Inc | HSIEH ANTHONY LI | Director , 10% | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 50,000 | 2.2628 | 113,140 | I |
16 Sep 2024 17:48 | LDI | loanDepot Inc | HSIEH ANTHONY LI | Director , 10% | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 537,488 | 2.2692 | 1,219,668 | I |
16 Sep 2024 17:48 | LDI | loanDepot Inc | HSIEH ANTHONY LI | Director , 10% | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 8,141 | 2.574 | 20,955 | I |
16 Sep 2024 17:48 | LDI | loanDepot Inc | HSIEH ANTHONY LI | Director , 10% | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 2,000 | 2.555 | 5,110 | I |
16 Sep 2024 17:45 | MERC | MERCER INTERNATIONAL Inc | BUENO ESTRADA JUAN CARLOS | CEO & President | 13 Sep 2024 | Purchase | 7,800 | 6.6 | 51,480 | D |
16 Sep 2024 17:45 | FOUR | Shift4 Payments Inc | FRANKEL JORDAN | See Remarks | 16 Sep 2024 | Sale | 12,500 | 82.5694 | 1,032,118 | D |
* D/I = Direct / Indirect
* 10% = Entity with 10% or higher ownership stake
* A = Amendment Filing (SEC Form 4/A)