Real Time Insider Transaction Data
Real Time Insider buys and sells Data - Insider Trades - Insider Transactions - Insider Trading Data - SEC Form 4 Data
Total | Transactions | Amount |
Buys | 2 | $100,296,566 |
Sells | 2206 | $1,666,638,157 |
Security | Reporting Name | Relationship | Purchase/Sale | Shares | Price $ | D/I | ||||
15 Nov 2023 16:49 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | HARRIS PARKER | Co-Founder and CTO | 14 Nov 2023 | Sale | 323 | 221.211 | 71,451 | D |
07 Oct 2022 17:14 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | TAYLOR BRET STEVEN | Vice Chair of the Board, CoCEO | 23 Sep 2022 | Sale A | 487 | 146.3632 | 71,279 | D |
26 Sep 2022 17:14 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | TAYLOR BRET STEVEN | Vice Chair of the Board, CoCEO | 23 Sep 2022 | Sale | 487 | 146.3632 | 71,279 | D |
26 Sep 2022 17:09 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | WEAVER AMY E | President and CFO | 23 Sep 2022 | Sale | 487 | 146.3632 | 71,279 | D |
26 Sep 2022 17:12 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | TALLAPRAGADA SRINIVAS | Pres/Chief Engineering Officer | 23 Sep 2022 | Sale | 487 | 146.3632 | 71,279 | D |
14 Feb 2023 17:42 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 13 Feb 2023 | Sale | 416 | 170.2132 | 70,809 | D |
23 Dec 2022 21:29 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | TAYLOR BRET STEVEN | Vice Chair of the Board, CoCEO | 23 Dec 2022 | Sale | 548 | 128.5465 | 70,443 | D |
22 Sep 2022 18:18 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and Co-CEO | 21 Sep 2022 | Sale | 467 | 150.2901 | 70,185 | D |
31 Oct 2022 17:10 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and Co-CEO | 28 Oct 2022 | Sale | 431 | 162.758 | 70,149 | D |
23 Mar 2023 17:29 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 22 Mar 2023 | Sale | 369 | 189.148 | 69,796 | D |
28 Mar 2023 17:12 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 27 Mar 2023 | Sale | 364 | 191.4669 | 69,694 | D |
19 Apr 2024 16:38 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 18 Apr 2024 | Sale | 253 | 275.2374 | 69,635 | D |
26 Feb 2024 17:28 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 23 Feb 2024 | Sale | 234 | 296.7297 | 69,435 | D |
23 Dec 2022 21:11 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | HARRIS PARKER | Co-Founder and CTO | 23 Dec 2022 | Sale | 535 | 128.5465 | 68,772 | D |
31 Oct 2022 17:10 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and Co-CEO | 28 Oct 2022 | Sale | 432 | 159.0602 | 68,714 | D |
21 Oct 2022 16:04 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and Co-CEO | 20 Oct 2022 | Sale | 431 | 158.9013 | 68,486 | D |
22 Sep 2023 16:21 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 21 Sep 2023 | Sale | 324 | 211.258 | 68,448 | D |
26 Oct 2022 17:16 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and Co-CEO | 25 Oct 2022 | Sale | 421 | 162.5624 | 68,439 | D |
08 Feb 2023 17:13 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 07 Feb 2023 | Sale | 407 | 167.8193 | 68,302 | D |
23 Jul 2024 19:40 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | SCHMAIER R DAVID | Pres. & Chief Product Officer | 23 Jul 2024 | Sale | 267 | 255.7787 | 68,293 | D |
05 Mar 2024 16:50 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 04 Mar 2024 | Sale | 215 | 317.2626 | 68,211 | D |
23 Jan 2023 21:46 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | TALLAPRAGADA SRINIVAS | Pres/Chief Engineering Officer | 23 Jan 2023 | Sale | 438 | 155.5915 | 68,149 | D |
23 Jan 2023 21:34 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | HARRIS PARKER | Co-Founder and CTO | 23 Jan 2023 | Sale | 437 | 155.5915 | 67,993 | D |
25 Oct 2022 17:58 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and Co-CEO | 24 Oct 2022 | Sale | 427 | 159.2151 | 67,985 | D |
12 Sep 2023 17:01 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | TALLAPRAGADA SRINIVAS | Pres/Chief Engineering Officer | 11 Sep 2023 | Sale | 300 | 226.4733 | 67,942 | D |
17 Feb 2023 16:19 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 16 Feb 2023 | Sale | 396 | 169.7028 | 67,202 | D |
09 Mar 2023 18:32 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 08 Mar 2023 | Sale | 365 | 182.809 | 66,725 | D |
24 Jun 2024 19:54 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | SCHMAIER R DAVID | Pres. & Chief Product Officer | 24 Jun 2024 | Sale | 274 | 242.3233 | 66,397 | D |
25 Oct 2023 16:44 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | MILLHAM BRIAN | President and COO | 24 Oct 2023 | Sale | 325 | 203.73 | 66,212 | D |
23 Oct 2023 20:25 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | MILLHAM BRIAN | President and COO | 23 Oct 2023 | Sale | 329 | 200.9749 | 66,121 | D |
09 Mar 2023 18:32 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 08 Mar 2023 | Sale | 360 | 183.5678 | 66,084 | D |
02 Mar 2023 16:10 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 01 Mar 2023 | Sale | 396 | 165.7067 | 65,620 | D |
30 Sep 2022 17:15 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and Co-CEO | 29 Sep 2022 | Sale | 449 | 145.6864 | 65,413 | D |
27 Mar 2023 17:14 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 24 Mar 2023 | Sale | 347 | 188.274 | 65,331 | D |
27 Feb 2023 17:41 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 24 Feb 2023 | Sale | 406 | 160.4919 | 65,160 | D |
30 Jan 2023 16:28 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and Co-CEO | 27 Jan 2023 | Sale | 393 | 165.6871 | 65,115 | D |
29 Sep 2022 18:28 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and Co-CEO | 28 Sep 2022 | Sale | 432 | 150.482 | 65,008 | D |
12 Oct 2022 19:21 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and Co-CEO | 11 Oct 2022 | Sale | 460 | 141.3111 | 65,003 | D |
03 Apr 2024 16:27 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | HARRIS PARKER | Co-Founder and CTO, Slack | 02 Apr 2024 | Sale | 217 | 299.3374 | 64,956 | D |
24 Apr 2023 20:39 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | MILLHAM BRIAN | President and COO | 24 Apr 2023 | Sale | 329 | 196.3305 | 64,593 | D |
03 Mar 2023 18:33 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | HARRIS PARKER | Co-Founder and CTO | 02 Mar 2023 | Sale | 336 | 191.6237 | 64,386 | D |
19 Oct 2022 17:01 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and Co-CEO | 18 Oct 2022 | Sale | 420 | 152.8221 | 64,185 | D |
26 Sep 2022 17:23 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | HARRIS PARKER | Co-Founder and CTO | 23 Sep 2022 | Sale | 438 | 146.3632 | 64,107 | D |
26 Sep 2022 17:09 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | WEAVER AMY E | President and CFO | 23 Sep 2022 | Sale | 438 | 146.3632 | 64,107 | D |
26 Sep 2022 17:12 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | TALLAPRAGADA SRINIVAS | Pres/Chief Engineering Officer | 23 Sep 2022 | Sale | 438 | 146.3632 | 64,107 | D |
23 Mar 2023 21:57 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | TALLAPRAGADA SRINIVAS | Pres/Chief Engineering Officer | 23 Mar 2023 | Sale | 339 | 187.9568 | 63,717 | D |
24 Jan 2023 17:16 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and Co-CEO | 23 Jan 2023 | Sale | 407 | 156.1414 | 63,550 | D |
14 Aug 2024 18:07 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | HARRIS PARKER | Co-Founder and CTO, Slack | 13 Aug 2024 | Sale | 249 | 255.1686 | 63,537 | D |
07 Jun 2024 16:29 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 06 Jun 2024 | Sale | 258 | 246.2118 | 63,523 | D |
01 Sep 2023 16:40 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 31 Aug 2023 | Sale | 278 | 227.7218 | 63,307 | D |
20 Mar 2023 19:27 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 17 Mar 2023 | Sale | 341 | 184.8934 | 63,049 | D |
18 Jan 2023 17:10 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and Co-CEO | 17 Jan 2023 | Sale | 423 | 148.1545 | 62,669 | D |
23 Dec 2022 21:33 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | WEAVER AMY E | President and CFO | 23 Dec 2022 | Sale | 486 | 128.5465 | 62,474 | D |
23 Dec 2022 21:29 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | TAYLOR BRET STEVEN | Vice Chair of the Board, CoCEO | 23 Dec 2022 | Sale | 486 | 128.5465 | 62,474 | D |
23 Dec 2022 21:24 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | TALLAPRAGADA SRINIVAS | Pres/Chief Engineering Officer | 23 Dec 2022 | Sale | 486 | 128.5465 | 62,474 | D |
20 Oct 2022 18:38 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and Co-CEO | 19 Oct 2022 | Sale | 403 | 154.5391 | 62,279 | D |
18 Aug 2023 18:08 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 17 Aug 2023 | Sale | 300 | 206.86 | 62,058 | D |
17 Oct 2023 17:03 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | TALLAPRAGADA SRINIVAS | Pres/Chief Engineering Officer | 16 Oct 2023 | Sale | 300 | 206.27 | 61,881 | D |
06 Mar 2024 16:29 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 05 Mar 2024 | Sale | 198 | 310.6751 | 61,514 | D |
29 Sep 2023 17:45 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 28 Sep 2023 | Sale | 300 | 205.0433 | 61,513 | D |
07 Mar 2023 18:28 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 06 Mar 2023 | Sale | 328 | 187.5346 | 61,511 | D |
23 Jun 2023 21:11 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | HYDER BRENT | President/Chief People Officer | 23 Jun 2023 | Sale | 292 | 209.6291 | 61,212 | D |
28 Mar 2024 17:42 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 27 Mar 2024 | Sale | 200 | 304.655 | 60,931 | D |
02 Apr 2024 16:12 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 01 Apr 2024 | Sale | 200 | 303.2157 | 60,643 | D |
08 Apr 2024 16:22 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 05 Apr 2024 | Sale | 200 | 303.04 | 60,608 | D |
20 Mar 2023 19:27 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 17 Mar 2023 | Sale | 326 | 185.8831 | 60,598 | D |
03 Mar 2023 18:33 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | HARRIS PARKER | Co-Founder and CTO | 02 Mar 2023 | Sale | 317 | 190.7316 | 60,462 | D |
05 Jun 2024 17:35 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | HARRIS PARKER | Co-Founder and CTO, Slack | 04 Jun 2024 | Sale | 252 | 239.83 | 60,437 | D |
07 Nov 2023 18:03 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 06 Nov 2023 | Sale | 290 | 208.2238 | 60,385 | D |
23 Jun 2023 21:11 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | HYDER BRENT | President/Chief People Officer | 23 Jun 2023 | Sale | 288 | 209.6291 | 60,373 | D |
23 Jan 2024 20:54 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | REDDY SUNDEEP G. | EVP & Chief Accounting Officer | 23 Jan 2024 | Sale | 216 | 278.7072 | 60,201 | D |
05 Jan 2023 17:34 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and Co-CEO | 04 Jan 2023 | Sale | 433 | 138.812 | 60,106 | D |
06 Mar 2023 16:55 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 03 Mar 2023 | Sale | 321 | 186.4866 | 59,862 | D |
05 Jan 2023 18:37 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and Co-CEO | 05 Jan 2023 | Sale | 438 | 135.8894 | 59,520 | D |
20 Oct 2022 18:38 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and Co-CEO | 19 Oct 2022 | Sale | 382 | 155.183 | 59,280 | D |
12 Oct 2022 19:21 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and Co-CEO | 11 Oct 2022 | Sale | 411 | 144.2015 | 59,267 | D |
17 May 2024 16:21 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 16 May 2024 | Sale | 204 | 290 | 59,160 | D |
01 Feb 2023 17:42 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and Co-CEO | 31 Jan 2023 | Sale | 356 | 166.0389 | 59,110 | D |
17 Apr 2024 18:38 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | HARRIS PARKER | Co-Founder and CTO, Slack | 16 Apr 2024 | Sale | 210 | 279.838 | 58,766 | D |
14 Feb 2024 18:22 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | HARRIS PARKER | Co-Founder and CTO, Slack | 13 Feb 2024 | Sale | 210 | 278.424 | 58,469 | D |
20 Oct 2022 18:38 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and Co-CEO | 19 Oct 2022 | Sale | 383 | 152.399 | 58,369 | D |
23 Mar 2023 21:57 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | TALLAPRAGADA SRINIVAS | Pres/Chief Engineering Officer | 23 Mar 2023 | Sale | 306 | 187.9568 | 57,515 | D |
21 Oct 2022 16:04 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and Co-CEO | 20 Oct 2022 | Sale | 366 | 157.0367 | 57,475 | D |
22 Mar 2023 18:13 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 21 Mar 2023 | Sale | 308 | 186.5921 | 57,470 | D |
24 Jul 2023 20:14 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | HYDER BRENT | President/Chief People Officer | 24 Jul 2023 | Sale | 255 | 225.0532 | 57,389 | D |
11 Sep 2024 16:25 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | HARRIS PARKER | Co-Founder and CTO, Slack | 10 Sep 2024 | Sale | 234 | 244.075 | 57,114 | D |
15 Mar 2023 18:41 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 14 Mar 2023 | Sale | 314 | 181.7061 | 57,056 | D |
30 Jan 2024 16:40 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | TALLAPRAGADA SRINIVAS | Pres/Chief Engineering Officer | 29 Jan 2024 | Sale | 200 | 284.975 | 56,995 | D |
24 May 2024 16:49 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 23 May 2024 | Sale | 200 | 284.63 | 56,926 | D |
04 Dec 2023 16:32 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and CEO | 01 Dec 2023 | Sale | 225 | 252.0064 | 56,701 | D |
23 Jul 2024 19:37 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | REDDY SUNDEEP G. | EVP & Chief Accounting Officer | 23 Jul 2024 | Sale | 221 | 255.7787 | 56,527 | D |
17 Jul 2024 16:48 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | HARRIS PARKER | Co-Founder and CTO, Slack | 16 Jul 2024 | Sale | 220 | 256.4896 | 56,428 | D |
03 Mar 2023 18:33 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | HARRIS PARKER | Co-Founder and CTO | 02 Mar 2023 | Sale | 292 | 193.0936 | 56,383 | D |
23 Dec 2022 21:33 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | WEAVER AMY E | President and CFO | 23 Dec 2022 | Sale | 438 | 128.5465 | 56,303 | D |
23 Dec 2022 21:24 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | TALLAPRAGADA SRINIVAS | Pres/Chief Engineering Officer | 23 Dec 2022 | Sale | 438 | 128.5465 | 56,303 | D |
23 Dec 2022 21:11 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | HARRIS PARKER | Co-Founder and CTO | 23 Dec 2022 | Sale | 438 | 128.5465 | 56,303 | D |
17 Oct 2022 18:34 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and Co-CEO | 14 Oct 2022 | Sale | 394 | 142.6034 | 56,186 | D |
14 Oct 2022 16:57 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and Co-CEO | 13 Oct 2022 | Sale | 391 | 143.5444 | 56,126 | D |
01 Nov 2022 13:03 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | BENIOFF MARC | Chair and Co-CEO | 31 Oct 2022 | Sale | 344 | 161.8879 | 55,689 | D |
14 Feb 2024 18:22 | CRM | Salesforce Inc | HARRIS PARKER | Co-Founder and CTO, Slack | 13 Feb 2024 | Sale | 196 | 282.8843 | 55,445 | D |
* D/I = Direct / Indirect
* 10% = Entity with 10% or higher ownership stake
* A = Amendment Filing (SEC Form 4/A)