Real Time Insider Transaction Data
Real Time Insider buys and sells Data - Insider Trades - Insider Transactions - Insider Trading Data - SEC Form 4 Data
Total | Transactions | Amount |
Buys | 2 | $1,081,605 |
Sells | 423 | $1,499,524,218 |
Security | Reporting Name | Relationship | Purchase/Sale | Shares | Price $ | D/I | ||||
04 Oct 2023 21:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 100 | 101.82 | 10,182 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 3,638 | 101.28 | 368,457 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 12,294 | 100.08 | 1,230,384 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 7,160 | 103.16 | 738,626 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 6,410 | 99.42 | 637,282 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 70,398 | 102.46 | 7,212,979 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:43 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 3,600 | 101.3 | 364,680 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:43 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 11,679 | 100.09 | 1,168,951 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:43 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 6,539 | 99.43 | 650,173 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:43 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 7,899 | 103.14 | 814,703 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:43 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 70,283 | 102.46 | 7,201,196 | I |
16 Nov 2023 20:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Nov 2023 | Sale | 3,111 | 109.07 | 339,317 | I |
16 Nov 2023 20:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Nov 2023 | Sale | 6,699 | 107.88 | 722,688 | I |
16 Nov 2023 20:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Nov 2023 | Sale | 22,696 | 106.22 | 2,410,769 | I |
16 Nov 2023 20:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Nov 2023 | Sale | 10,771 | 107.31 | 1,155,836 | I |
16 Nov 2023 20:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Nov 2023 | Sale | 39,831 | 105.07 | 4,185,043 | I |
16 Nov 2023 20:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Nov 2023 | Sale | 66,892 | 104.07 | 6,961,450 | I |
16 Feb 2024 20:44 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | DEVEER R. KIPP | Head of Credit Group | 16 Feb 2024 | Sale | 34,679 | 135.55 | 4,700,738 | D |
16 Feb 2024 20:44 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | DEVEER R. KIPP | Head of Credit Group | 16 Feb 2024 | Sale | 45,958 | 135.02 | 6,205,249 | D |
16 Feb 2024 20:44 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | DEVEER R. KIPP | Head of Credit Group | 15 Feb 2024 | Sale | 403 | 136.69 | 55,086 | D |
16 Feb 2024 20:44 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | DEVEER R. KIPP | Head of Credit Group | 15 Feb 2024 | Sale | 6,940 | 136 | 943,840 | D |
16 Feb 2024 20:44 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | DEVEER R. KIPP | Head of Credit Group | 15 Feb 2024 | Sale | 41,073 | 135.28 | 5,556,355 | D |
16 Feb 2024 20:44 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | DEVEER R. KIPP | Head of Credit Group | 14 Feb 2024 | Sale | 82,796 | 136.47 | 11,299,170 | D |
08 Mar 2024 16:18 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 07 Mar 2024 | Sale | 3,000,000 | 130.3 | 390,900,000 | I |
18 Mar 2024 21:47 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 800 | 134.19 | 107,352 | I |
18 Mar 2024 21:47 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 8,066 | 133.34 | 1,075,520 | I |
18 Mar 2024 21:47 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 30,326 | 132.18 | 4,008,491 | I |
18 Mar 2024 21:47 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 14 Mar 2024 | Sale | 10,370 | 133.99 | 1,389,476 | D |
18 Mar 2024 21:47 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 14 Mar 2024 | Sale | 24,457 | 133.26 | 3,259,140 | D |
18 Mar 2024 21:47 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 14 Mar 2024 | Sale | 39,758 | 132.53 | 5,269,128 | D |
19 Mar 2024 21:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 800 | 132.71 | 106,168 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 11,579 | 132.05 | 1,529,007 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 3,547 | 130.97 | 464,551 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 218 | 132.81 | 28,953 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,542 | 130.1 | 200,614 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,348 | 131.77 | 177,626 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 13,029 | 131.12 | 1,708,362 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 7,601 | 130.14 | 989,194 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 606 | 132.74 | 80,440 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 3,410 | 130.93 | 446,471 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 11,898 | 132.04 | 1,571,012 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,420 | 130.07 | 184,699 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 218 | 132.88 | 28,968 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,175 | 131.81 | 154,877 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 13,238 | 131.12 | 1,735,767 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 7,484 | 130.14 | 973,968 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 908 | 134.16 | 121,817 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 7,893 | 133.34 | 1,052,453 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 30,287 | 132.19 | 4,003,639 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 617 | 132.76 | 81,913 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 11,661 | 132.05 | 1,539,835 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 3,400 | 130.92 | 445,128 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 218 | 132.82 | 28,955 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,431 | 130.08 | 186,144 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,300 | 131.78 | 171,314 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 13,377 | 131.1 | 1,753,725 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 7,260 | 130.15 | 944,889 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 700 | 134.22 | 93,954 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 8,366 | 133.33 | 1,115,439 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 29,137 | 132.19 | 3,851,620 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 800 | 132.72 | 106,176 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 11,411 | 132.04 | 1,506,708 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 3,590 | 130.95 | 470,110 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,423 | 130.07 | 185,090 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 418 | 132.61 | 55,431 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 6,901 | 131.42 | 906,929 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 8,707 | 130.85 | 1,139,311 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 6,077 | 130.1 | 790,618 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 591 | 134.23 | 79,330 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 31,015 | 132.21 | 4,100,493 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 7,309 | 133.39 | 974,948 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 22 Mar 2024 | Sale | 100 | 136.17 | 13,617 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 22 Mar 2024 | Sale | 6,837 | 135.22 | 924,499 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 22 Mar 2024 | Sale | 8,413 | 134.05 | 1,127,763 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 19,119 | 137.45 | 2,627,907 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 34,567 | 136.75 | 4,727,037 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,800 | 135.83 | 244,494 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,071 | 134.84 | 144,414 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 8,100 | 133.48 | 1,081,188 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 9,349 | 132.7 | 1,240,612 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 2,300 | 131.81 | 303,163 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 9,104 | 137.48 | 1,251,618 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 15,089 | 136.73 | 2,063,119 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,600 | 135.76 | 217,216 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 671 | 134.79 | 90,444 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 8,577 | 133.47 | 1,144,772 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 2,200 | 131.8 | 289,960 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 9,222 | 132.67 | 1,223,483 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,700 | 137.53 | 233,801 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 2,810 | 136.66 | 384,015 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 300 | 135.16 | 40,548 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 5,830 | 133.48 | 778,188 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 9,117 | 132.75 | 1,210,282 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 2,776 | 131.89 | 366,127 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 22 Mar 2024 | Sale | 304 | 135.96 | 41,332 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 22 Mar 2024 | Sale | 6,596 | 135.22 | 891,911 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 20,389 | 137.45 | 2,802,468 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 22 Mar 2024 | Sale | 8,404 | 134.03 | 1,126,388 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 34,834 | 136.77 | 4,764,246 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,600 | 135.7 | 217,120 | I |
* D/I = Direct / Indirect
* 10% = Entity with 10% or higher ownership stake
* A = Amendment Filing (SEC Form 4/A)