Real Time Insider Transaction Data
Real Time Insider buys and sells Data - Insider Trades - Insider Transactions - Insider Trading Data - SEC Form 4 Data
Total | Transactions | Amount |
Buys | 2 | $1,081,605 |
Sells | 423 | $1,499,524,218 |
Security | Reporting Name | Relationship | Purchase/Sale | Shares | Price $ | D/I | ||||
19 Aug 2024 21:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Aug 2024 | Sale | 3,891 | 146.24 | 569,020 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Aug 2024 | Sale | 21,180 | 145.66 | 3,085,079 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Aug 2024 | Sale | 2,101 | 144.66 | 303,931 | I |
23 Jul 2024 20:15 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | DEVEER R. KIPP | Head of Credit Group | 22 Jul 2024 | Sale | 41,676 | 150.21 | 6,260,152 | D |
25 Jun 2024 20:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 21 Jun 2024 | Sale | 921 | 134.06 | 123,469 | I |
25 Jun 2024 20:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 21 Jun 2024 | Sale | 21,119 | 133.1 | 2,810,939 | I |
25 Jun 2024 20:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 21 Jun 2024 | Sale | 68,915 | 131.82 | 9,084,375 | I |
25 Jun 2024 20:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 21 Jun 2024 | Sale | 34,045 | 131.41 | 4,473,853 | I |
25 Jun 2024 20:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 21 Jun 2024 | Sale | 692 | 134.21 | 92,873 | I |
25 Jun 2024 20:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 21 Jun 2024 | Sale | 24,740 | 133.11 | 3,293,141 | I |
25 Jun 2024 20:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 21 Jun 2024 | Sale | 82,625 | 131.83 | 10,892,454 | I |
25 Jun 2024 20:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 21 Jun 2024 | Sale | 41,943 | 131.42 | 5,512,149 | I |
10 Jun 2024 21:48 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | OLIAN JUDY D. | Director | 07 Jun 2024 | Sale | 3,417 | 133.9961 | 457,865 | D |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Jun 2024 | Sale | 879 | 139.82 | 122,902 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Jun 2024 | Sale | 100 | 140.51 | 14,051 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Jun 2024 | Sale | 2,110 | 138.87 | 293,016 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Jun 2024 | Sale | 9,229 | 138.02 | 1,273,787 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Jun 2024 | Sale | 2,341 | 137.05 | 320,834 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 600 | 144.33 | 86,598 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 4,049 | 143.44 | 580,789 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 5,308 | 142.44 | 756,072 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 6,915 | 141.79 | 980,478 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 37,839 | 139.59 | 5,281,946 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 55,630 | 140.23 | 7,800,995 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 100 | 145.17 | 14,517 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 541 | 144.23 | 78,028 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 4,561 | 143.43 | 654,184 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 5,283 | 142.38 | 752,194 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 6,696 | 141.74 | 949,091 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 50,729 | 140.23 | 7,113,728 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 32,090 | 139.59 | 4,479,443 | I |
17 May 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 16 May 2024 | Sale | 300 | 149.67 | 44,901 | I |
17 May 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 16 May 2024 | Sale | 24,450 | 148.94 | 3,641,583 | I |
17 May 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 16 May 2024 | Sale | 15,702 | 148.04 | 2,324,524 | I |
17 May 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 16 May 2024 | Sale | 51,711 | 146.98 | 7,600,483 | I |
17 May 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 May 2024 | Sale | 406 | 149.93 | 60,872 | I |
17 May 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 May 2024 | Sale | 60,949 | 149.58 | 9,116,751 | I |
17 May 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 May 2024 | Sale | 21,416 | 148.32 | 3,176,421 | I |
17 May 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 May 2024 | Sale | 49,637 | 147.34 | 7,313,516 | I |
17 May 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 May 2024 | Sale | 25,429 | 146.59 | 3,727,637 | I |
19 Apr 2024 18:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 17 Apr 2024 | Sale | 104,776 | 131.65 | 13,793,760 | I |
19 Apr 2024 18:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 17 Apr 2024 | Sale | 1,600 | 132.48 | 211,968 | I |
19 Apr 2024 18:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 17 Apr 2024 | Sale | 37,193 | 131.08 | 4,875,258 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 16 Apr 2024 | Sale | 80,592 | 130.92 | 10,551,105 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 16 Apr 2024 | Sale | 39,952 | 130.17 | 5,200,552 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 16 Apr 2024 | Sale | 29,589 | 129.33 | 3,826,745 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 16 Apr 2024 | Sale | 9,727 | 128.46 | 1,249,530 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 6,214 | 132.4 | 822,734 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 5,950 | 131.17 | 780,461 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 18,362 | 130.71 | 2,400,097 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 29,503 | 129.31 | 3,815,033 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 34,668 | 128.5 | 4,454,838 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 4,008 | 132.41 | 530,699 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 2,553 | 131.24 | 335,056 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 12,895 | 130.7 | 1,685,376 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 10,739 | 129.34 | 1,388,982 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 19,805 | 128.54 | 2,545,735 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 12 Apr 2024 | Sale | 1,554 | 133.35 | 207,226 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 12 Apr 2024 | Sale | 20,014 | 132.63 | 2,654,457 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 12 Apr 2024 | Sale | 92,924 | 131.8 | 12,247,383 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 11 Apr 2024 | Sale | 1 | 134.95 | 135 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 11 Apr 2024 | Sale | 116,540 | 134.31 | 15,652,487 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 11 Apr 2024 | Sale | 58,459 | 133.72 | 7,817,137 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 10 Apr 2024 | Sale | 43,319 | 135.07 | 5,851,097 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 10 Apr 2024 | Sale | 79,422 | 134.18 | 10,656,844 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 10 Apr 2024 | Sale | 15,067 | 133.59 | 2,012,801 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 10 Apr 2024 | Sale | 2,107 | 131.9 | 277,913 | I |
09 Apr 2024 20:06 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 09 Apr 2024 | Sale | 800 | 135.93 | 108,744 | I |
09 Apr 2024 20:06 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 09 Apr 2024 | Sale | 5,962 | 135.14 | 805,705 | I |
09 Apr 2024 20:06 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 09 Apr 2024 | Sale | 97,905 | 133.06 | 13,027,239 | I |
09 Apr 2024 20:06 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 09 Apr 2024 | Sale | 57,017 | 133.93 | 7,636,287 | I |
09 Apr 2024 20:06 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 09 Apr 2024 | Sale | 50,953 | 132.46 | 6,749,234 | I |
09 Apr 2024 20:06 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 08 Apr 2024 | Sale | 700 | 135.59 | 94,913 | I |
09 Apr 2024 20:06 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 08 Apr 2024 | Sale | 125,180 | 135.14 | 16,916,825 | I |
09 Apr 2024 20:06 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 08 Apr 2024 | Sale | 48,378 | 134.23 | 6,493,779 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 05 Apr 2024 | Sale | 71,658 | 133.72 | 9,582,108 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 05 Apr 2024 | Sale | 65,295 | 134.25 | 8,765,854 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 05 Apr 2024 | Sale | 16,033 | 132.53 | 2,124,853 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 05 Apr 2024 | Sale | 22,166 | 131.78 | 2,921,035 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 04 Apr 2024 | Sale | 14,098 | 133.64 | 1,884,057 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 04 Apr 2024 | Sale | 52,868 | 132.93 | 7,027,743 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 04 Apr 2024 | Sale | 111,499 | 132.27 | 14,747,973 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:15 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 03 Apr 2024 | Sale | 7,052 | 132.27 | 932,768 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:15 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 03 Apr 2024 | Sale | 6,044 | 131.78 | 796,478 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 03 Apr 2024 | Sale | 2,902 | 132.83 | 385,473 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 03 Apr 2024 | Sale | 38,740 | 132.13 | 5,118,716 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 03 Apr 2024 | Sale | 4,342 | 131.49 | 570,930 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Apr 2024 | Sale | 35,796 | 132.03 | 4,726,146 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Apr 2024 | Sale | 2,608 | 132.75 | 346,212 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Apr 2024 | Sale | 1,818 | 131.27 | 238,649 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 02 Apr 2024 | Sale | 21,441 | 130.59 | 2,799,980 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 02 Apr 2024 | Sale | 16,345 | 129.74 | 2,120,600 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 02 Apr 2024 | Sale | 15,214 | 129.01 | 1,962,758 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 02 Apr 2024 | Sale | 18,354 | 130.62 | 2,397,399 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 02 Apr 2024 | Sale | 13,919 | 129.73 | 1,805,712 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 02 Apr 2024 | Sale | 18,600 | 129.01 | 2,399,586 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 02 Apr 2024 | Sale | 16,105 | 129.66 | 2,088,174 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 02 Apr 2024 | Sale | 18,738 | 130.61 | 2,447,370 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 02 Apr 2024 | Sale | 15,874 | 128.97 | 2,047,270 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 01 Apr 2024 | Sale | 7,594 | 132.39 | 1,005,370 | I |
* D/I = Direct / Indirect
* 10% = Entity with 10% or higher ownership stake
* A = Amendment Filing (SEC Form 4/A)