Real Time Insider Transaction Data
Real Time Insider buys and sells Data - Insider Trades - Insider Transactions - Insider Trading Data - SEC Form 4 Data
Total | Transactions | Amount |
Buys | 2 | $1,081,605 |
Sells | 423 | $1,499,524,218 |
Security | Reporting Name | Relationship | Purchase/Sale | Shares | Price $ | D/I | ||||
22 Aug 2024 19:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 20 Aug 2024 | Sale | 4,955 | 144.69 | 716,939 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 20 Aug 2024 | Sale | 14,818 | 144.16 | 2,136,163 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 22 Aug 2024 | Sale | 5,221 | 144.66 | 755,270 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 22 Aug 2024 | Sale | 14,147 | 144.05 | 2,037,875 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 21 Aug 2024 | Sale | 98 | 145.41 | 14,250 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 21 Aug 2024 | Sale | 10,059 | 144.33 | 1,451,815 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 21 Aug 2024 | Sale | 5,641 | 143.67 | 810,442 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 20 Aug 2024 | Sale | 4,697 | 144.7 | 679,656 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 20 Aug 2024 | Sale | 14,863 | 144.17 | 2,142,799 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 22 Aug 2024 | Sale | 6,024 | 144.63 | 871,251 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 22 Aug 2024 | Sale | 13,247 | 144.02 | 1,907,833 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 21 Aug 2024 | Sale | 83 | 145.41 | 12,069 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 21 Aug 2024 | Sale | 10,100 | 144.33 | 1,457,733 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 21 Aug 2024 | Sale | 5,512 | 143.65 | 791,799 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 20 Aug 2024 | Sale | 4,500 | 144.71 | 651,195 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 20 Aug 2024 | Sale | 15,110 | 144.18 | 2,178,560 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:35 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 19 Aug 2024 | Sale | 337 | 145.45 | 49,017 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:35 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 19 Aug 2024 | Sale | 10,113 | 144.43 | 1,460,621 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:35 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 16 Aug 2024 | Sale | 3,552 | 145.32 | 516,177 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:35 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 16 Aug 2024 | Sale | 17,596 | 144.87 | 2,549,133 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:35 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 15 Aug 2024 | Sale | 5,200 | 146.21 | 760,292 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:35 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 15 Aug 2024 | Sale | 20,668 | 145.61 | 3,009,467 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:35 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 15 Aug 2024 | Sale | 1,200 | 144.39 | 173,268 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:36 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 19 Aug 2024 | Sale | 392 | 145.38 | 56,989 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:36 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 19 Aug 2024 | Sale | 9,831 | 144.43 | 1,419,891 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:36 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 16 Aug 2024 | Sale | 2,976 | 145.36 | 432,591 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:36 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 16 Aug 2024 | Sale | 18,135 | 144.87 | 2,627,217 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:36 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Aug 2024 | Sale | 3,466 | 146.26 | 506,937 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:36 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Aug 2024 | Sale | 21,419 | 145.67 | 3,120,106 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:36 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Aug 2024 | Sale | 2,235 | 144.72 | 323,449 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 19 Aug 2024 | Sale | 337 | 145.45 | 49,017 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 19 Aug 2024 | Sale | 9,817 | 144.43 | 1,417,869 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 16 Aug 2024 | Sale | 2,930 | 145.37 | 425,934 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 16 Aug 2024 | Sale | 18,236 | 144.87 | 2,641,849 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Aug 2024 | Sale | 3,891 | 146.24 | 569,020 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Aug 2024 | Sale | 21,180 | 145.66 | 3,085,079 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Aug 2024 | Sale | 2,101 | 144.66 | 303,931 | I |
23 Jul 2024 20:15 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | DEVEER R. KIPP | Head of Credit Group | 22 Jul 2024 | Sale | 41,676 | 150.21 | 6,260,152 | D |
25 Jun 2024 20:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 21 Jun 2024 | Sale | 921 | 134.06 | 123,469 | I |
25 Jun 2024 20:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 21 Jun 2024 | Sale | 21,119 | 133.1 | 2,810,939 | I |
25 Jun 2024 20:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 21 Jun 2024 | Sale | 68,915 | 131.82 | 9,084,375 | I |
25 Jun 2024 20:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 21 Jun 2024 | Sale | 34,045 | 131.41 | 4,473,853 | I |
25 Jun 2024 20:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 21 Jun 2024 | Sale | 692 | 134.21 | 92,873 | I |
25 Jun 2024 20:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 21 Jun 2024 | Sale | 24,740 | 133.11 | 3,293,141 | I |
25 Jun 2024 20:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 21 Jun 2024 | Sale | 82,625 | 131.83 | 10,892,454 | I |
25 Jun 2024 20:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 21 Jun 2024 | Sale | 41,943 | 131.42 | 5,512,149 | I |
10 Jun 2024 21:48 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | OLIAN JUDY D. | Director | 07 Jun 2024 | Sale | 3,417 | 133.9961 | 457,865 | D |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Jun 2024 | Sale | 879 | 139.82 | 122,902 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Jun 2024 | Sale | 100 | 140.51 | 14,051 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Jun 2024 | Sale | 2,110 | 138.87 | 293,016 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Jun 2024 | Sale | 9,229 | 138.02 | 1,273,787 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Jun 2024 | Sale | 2,341 | 137.05 | 320,834 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 600 | 144.33 | 86,598 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 4,049 | 143.44 | 580,789 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 5,308 | 142.44 | 756,072 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 6,915 | 141.79 | 980,478 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 37,839 | 139.59 | 5,281,946 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 55,630 | 140.23 | 7,800,995 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 100 | 145.17 | 14,517 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 541 | 144.23 | 78,028 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 4,561 | 143.43 | 654,184 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 5,283 | 142.38 | 752,194 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 6,696 | 141.74 | 949,091 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 50,729 | 140.23 | 7,113,728 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 32,090 | 139.59 | 4,479,443 | I |
17 May 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 16 May 2024 | Sale | 300 | 149.67 | 44,901 | I |
17 May 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 16 May 2024 | Sale | 24,450 | 148.94 | 3,641,583 | I |
17 May 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 16 May 2024 | Sale | 15,702 | 148.04 | 2,324,524 | I |
17 May 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 16 May 2024 | Sale | 51,711 | 146.98 | 7,600,483 | I |
17 May 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 May 2024 | Sale | 406 | 149.93 | 60,872 | I |
17 May 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 May 2024 | Sale | 60,949 | 149.58 | 9,116,751 | I |
17 May 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 May 2024 | Sale | 21,416 | 148.32 | 3,176,421 | I |
17 May 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 May 2024 | Sale | 49,637 | 147.34 | 7,313,516 | I |
17 May 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 May 2024 | Sale | 25,429 | 146.59 | 3,727,637 | I |
19 Apr 2024 18:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 17 Apr 2024 | Sale | 104,776 | 131.65 | 13,793,760 | I |
19 Apr 2024 18:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 17 Apr 2024 | Sale | 1,600 | 132.48 | 211,968 | I |
19 Apr 2024 18:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 17 Apr 2024 | Sale | 37,193 | 131.08 | 4,875,258 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 16 Apr 2024 | Sale | 80,592 | 130.92 | 10,551,105 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 16 Apr 2024 | Sale | 39,952 | 130.17 | 5,200,552 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 16 Apr 2024 | Sale | 29,589 | 129.33 | 3,826,745 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 16 Apr 2024 | Sale | 9,727 | 128.46 | 1,249,530 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 6,214 | 132.4 | 822,734 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 5,950 | 131.17 | 780,461 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 18,362 | 130.71 | 2,400,097 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 29,503 | 129.31 | 3,815,033 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 34,668 | 128.5 | 4,454,838 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 4,008 | 132.41 | 530,699 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 2,553 | 131.24 | 335,056 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 12,895 | 130.7 | 1,685,376 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 10,739 | 129.34 | 1,388,982 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 19,805 | 128.54 | 2,545,735 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 12 Apr 2024 | Sale | 1,554 | 133.35 | 207,226 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 12 Apr 2024 | Sale | 20,014 | 132.63 | 2,654,457 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 11 Apr 2024 | Sale | 1 | 134.95 | 135 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 12 Apr 2024 | Sale | 92,924 | 131.8 | 12,247,383 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 11 Apr 2024 | Sale | 116,540 | 134.31 | 15,652,487 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 11 Apr 2024 | Sale | 58,459 | 133.72 | 7,817,137 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 10 Apr 2024 | Sale | 43,319 | 135.07 | 5,851,097 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 10 Apr 2024 | Sale | 79,422 | 134.18 | 10,656,844 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 10 Apr 2024 | Sale | 15,067 | 133.59 | 2,012,801 | I |
* D/I = Direct / Indirect
* 10% = Entity with 10% or higher ownership stake
* A = Amendment Filing (SEC Form 4/A)