Real Time Insider Transaction Data
Real Time Insider buys and sells Data - Insider Trades - Insider Transactions - Insider Trading Data - SEC Form 4 Data
Total | Transactions | Amount |
Buys | 23913 | $20,437,398,477 |
Sells | 85882 | $212,765,795,343 |
Security | Reporting Name | Relationship | Purchase/Sale | Shares | Price $ | D/I | ||||
04 Oct 2023 19:11 | AXON | AXON ENTERPRISE Inc | ISNER JOSHUA | PRESIDENT | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 5,117 | 196.5129 | 1,005,557 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:11 | AXON | AXON ENTERPRISE Inc | ISNER JOSHUA | PRESIDENT | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 16,035 | 195.6398 | 3,137,084 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:13 | TWLO | TWILIO INC | DONIO ELENA A. | President, Data & Applications | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 5,034 | 57.8324 | 291,128 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:13 | TWLO | TWILIO INC | DONIO ELENA A. | President, Data & Applications | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 200 | 58.4225 | 11,684 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:17 | TWLO | TWILIO INC | SHIPCHANDLER KHOZEMA | President, Communications | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 200 | 58.42 | 11,684 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:17 | TWLO | TWILIO INC | SHIPCHANDLER KHOZEMA | President, Communications | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 9,925 | 57.8434 | 574,096 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:19 | TWLO | TWILIO INC | VIGGIANO AIDAN | Chief Financial Officer | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 216 | 58.4015 | 12,615 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:19 | TWLO | TWILIO INC | VIGGIANO AIDAN | Chief Financial Officer | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 6,121 | 57.8489 | 354,093 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:21 | SQ | Block Inc | GRASSADONIA BRIAN | Cash App Lead | 04 Oct 2023 | Sale | 4,584 | 42 | 192,528 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:21 | SQ | Block Inc | GRASSADONIA BRIAN | Cash App Lead | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 1,668 | 44.58 | 74,359 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:21 | SQ | Block Inc | GRASSADONIA BRIAN | Cash App Lead | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 3,770 | 44.16 | 166,483 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:22 | TWLO | TWILIO INC | WAGNER DANA | Chief Legal Officer, Secretary | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 103 | 58.4043 | 6,016 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:22 | TWLO | TWILIO INC | WAGNER DANA | Chief Legal Officer, Secretary | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 3,849 | 57.8459 | 222,649 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:22 | TWLO | TWILIO INC | WAGNER DANA | Chief Legal Officer, Secretary | 05 Sep 2023 | Sale | 493 | 64.51 | 31,803 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:22 | GDDY | GoDaddy Inc | CHEN ROGER | Chief Operating Officer | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 5,000 | 74.307 | 371,535 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:23 | COTY | COTY Inc | JAB HOLDINGS B.V. | 10% | 02 Oct 2023 | Purchase | 3,000,000 | 10.8 | 32,400,000 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:25 | DNP | DNP SELECT INCOME FUND INC | LUECKE CONNIE M | VP & Chief Investment Officer | 04 Oct 2023 | Purchase | 2,725 | 8.98 | 24,470 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:26 | VTYX | Ventyx Biosciences Inc | NUSS JOHN | Chief Scientific Officer | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 723 | 30.7155 | 22,207 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:26 | VTYX | Ventyx Biosciences Inc | NUSS JOHN | Chief Scientific Officer | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 9,277 | 29.937 | 277,726 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:27 | AMTI | Applied Molecular Transport Inc | CROSS SHAWN | CEO & Chair of the Board | 05 Sep 2023 | Sale | 1,253 | 0.2075 | 260 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:27 | AMTI | Applied Molecular Transport Inc | CROSS SHAWN | CEO & Chair of the Board | 02 Jun 2023 | Sale | 477 | 0.2402 | 115 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:27 | AMTI | Applied Molecular Transport Inc | CROSS SHAWN | CEO & Chair of the Board | 02 Jun 2023 | Sale | 536 | 0.2404 | 129 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:27 | AMTI | Applied Molecular Transport Inc | CROSS SHAWN | CEO & Chair of the Board | 02 Jun 2023 | Sale | 3,293 | 0.2412 | 794 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:28 | AMTI | Applied Molecular Transport Inc | HANTS BRANDON | CFO | 02 Jun 2023 | Sale | 560 | 0.24 | 134 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:28 | AMTI | Applied Molecular Transport Inc | HANTS BRANDON | CFO | 05 Sep 2023 | Sale | 718 | 0.2075 | 149 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:28 | AMTI | Applied Molecular Transport Inc | HANTS BRANDON | CFO | 02 Jun 2023 | Sale | 1,643 | 0.2412 | 396 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:29 | PLTR | Palantir Technologies Inc | MOORE ALEXANDER D. | Director | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 21,900 | 16.0204 | 350,847 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:30 | AMTI | Applied Molecular Transport Inc | MAHMOOD TAHIR PH.D. | Director | 05 Sep 2023 | Sale | 2,245 | 0.2075 | 466 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:30 | AMTI | Applied Molecular Transport Inc | MAHMOOD TAHIR PH.D. | Director | 02 Jun 2023 | Sale | 1,992 | 0.2413 | 481 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:30 | PEN | Penumbra Inc | ROBERTS JOHANNA | EVP, Gen. Counsel & Secretary | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 18 | 240.43 | 4,328 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:30 | PEN | Penumbra Inc | ROBERTS JOHANNA | EVP, Gen. Counsel & Secretary | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 93 | 239.55 | 22,278 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:30 | PEN | Penumbra Inc | ROBERTS JOHANNA | EVP, Gen. Counsel & Secretary | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 144 | 237.41 | 34,187 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:30 | PEN | Penumbra Inc | ROBERTS JOHANNA | EVP, Gen. Counsel & Secretary | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 102 | 238.73 | 24,350 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:30 | PEN | Penumbra Inc | ROBERTS JOHANNA | EVP, Gen. Counsel & Secretary | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 243 | 236.82 | 57,547 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:33 | VTYX | Ventyx Biosciences Inc | KRUEGER CHRISTOPHER W | Chief Business Officer | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 994 | 30.6959 | 30,512 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:33 | VTYX | Ventyx Biosciences Inc | KRUEGER CHRISTOPHER W | Chief Business Officer | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 14,006 | 29.9291 | 419,187 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:34 | PEN | Penumbra Inc | SARNA SURBHI | Director | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 85 | 240.99 | 20,484 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:35 | FPH | Five Point Holdings LLC | LUXOR CAPITAL GROUP, LP | 10% | 22 Sep 2023 | Sale A | 13,758 | 2.92 | 40,173 | I |
04 Oct 2023 19:35 | FPH | Five Point Holdings LLC | LUXOR CAPITAL GROUP, LP | 10% | 22 Sep 2023 | Sale A | 23,698 | 2.92 | 69,198 | I |
04 Oct 2023 19:41 | FPH | Five Point Holdings LLC | LUXOR CAPITAL GROUP, LP | 10% | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 16,713 | 2.925 | 48,886 | I |
04 Oct 2023 19:41 | FPH | Five Point Holdings LLC | LUXOR CAPITAL GROUP, LP | 10% | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 28,787 | 2.925 | 84,202 | I |
04 Oct 2023 19:44 | PEN | Penumbra Inc | GREWAL HARPREET | Director | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 170 | 240.99 | 40,968 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:52 | PRTA | PROTHENA CORP PUBLIC LTD CO | KARP CAROL D. | Chief Regulatory Officer | 04 Oct 2023 | Sale | 663 | 47.293 | 31,355 | D |
04 Oct 2023 19:52 | PRTA | PROTHENA CORP PUBLIC LTD CO | KARP CAROL D. | Chief Regulatory Officer | 04 Oct 2023 | Sale | 4,337 | 46.5135 | 201,729 | D |
04 Oct 2023 20:12 | BYON | OVERSTOCK.COM INC | LEMONIS MARCUS | Director | 04 Oct 2023 | Purchase | 33,000 | 14.94 | 493,020 | D |
04 Oct 2023 20:33 | AKRO | Akero Therapeutics Inc | YOUNG JONATHAN | Chief Operating Officer | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 490 | 51.1 | 25,039 | D |
04 Oct 2023 20:41 | AKRO | Akero Therapeutics Inc | CHENG ANDREW | President and CEO | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 6,470 | 50.5619 | 327,135 | D |
04 Oct 2023 20:41 | AKRO | Akero Therapeutics Inc | CHENG ANDREW | President and CEO | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 1,700 | 49.7059 | 84,500 | D |
04 Oct 2023 20:41 | AKRO | Akero Therapeutics Inc | CHENG ANDREW | President and CEO | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 5,300 | 46.8836 | 248,483 | D |
04 Oct 2023 20:41 | AKRO | Akero Therapeutics Inc | CHENG ANDREW | President and CEO | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 2,662 | 48.5632 | 129,275 | D |
04 Oct 2023 20:41 | AKRO | Akero Therapeutics Inc | CHENG ANDREW | President and CEO | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 8,868 | 46.057 | 408,433 | D |
04 Oct 2023 20:44 | BOXL | Boxlight Corp | STARKEY MARK | President | 27 Sep 2023 | Sale | 735 | 1.896 | 1,394 | D |
04 Oct 2023 20:44 | BOXL | Boxlight Corp | STARKEY MARK | President | 31 Aug 2023 | Sale | 368 | 2.31 | 850 | D |
04 Oct 2023 20:51 | SYM | Symbotic Inc | DUNN MICHAEL DAVID | See Remarks | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 5,558 | 31.2114 | 173,473 | D |
04 Oct 2023 20:54 | GME | GameStop Corp | MOORE DANIEL WILLIAM | PAO and Interim PFO | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 686 | 15.41 | 10,571 | D |
04 Oct 2023 20:54 | GME | GameStop Corp | ROBINSON MARK HAYMOND | General Counsel and Secretary | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 4,220 | 15.41 | 65,030 | D |
04 Oct 2023 21:04 | MWA | Mueller Water Products Inc | TOKARZ MICHAEL T | Director | 12 Sep 2023 | Sale | 250 | 13.105 | 3,276 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:04 | MWA | Mueller Water Products Inc | TOKARZ MICHAEL T | Director | 24 Aug 2010 | Purchase | 250 | 2.4 | 600 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:30 | GTN | GRAY TELEVISION INC | BOGER RICHARD LEE | Director | 02 Oct 2023 | Purchase | 20 | 8.24 | 165 | D |
04 Oct 2023 21:30 | GTN | GRAY TELEVISION INC | BOGER RICHARD LEE | Director | 02 Oct 2023 | Purchase | 445 | 6.78 | 3,017 | D |
04 Oct 2023 21:30 | ROIV | Roivant Sciences Ltd. | VENKER ERIC | Chief Operating Officer | 05 Oct 2023 | Sale | 153,027 | 10.11 | 1,547,103 | D |
04 Oct 2023 21:30 | ROIV | Roivant Sciences Ltd. | VENKER ERIC | Chief Operating Officer | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 606,221 | 10.25 | 6,213,765 | D |
04 Oct 2023 21:30 | ROIV | Roivant Sciences Ltd. | VENKER ERIC | Chief Operating Officer | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 440,752 | 10.8 | 4,760,122 | D |
04 Oct 2023 21:41 | FNKO | Funko Inc | WORKING CAPITAL ADVISORS (UK) LTD. | 10% | 03 Oct 2023 | Purchase | 4,353 | 7.2484 | 31,552 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 100 | 101.82 | 10,182 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 3,638 | 101.28 | 368,457 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 12,294 | 100.08 | 1,230,384 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 7,160 | 103.16 | 738,626 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 6,410 | 99.42 | 637,282 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 70,398 | 102.46 | 7,212,979 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:43 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 3,600 | 101.3 | 364,680 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:43 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 11,679 | 100.09 | 1,168,951 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:43 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 6,539 | 99.43 | 650,173 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:43 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 7,899 | 103.14 | 814,703 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:43 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 70,283 | 102.46 | 7,201,196 | I |
05 Oct 2023 06:05 | GLSI | Greenwich LifeSciences Inc | PATEL SNEHAL | CEO and CFO, 10% | 04 Oct 2023 | Purchase | 2,000 | 8.63 | 17,260 | D |
05 Oct 2023 08:08 | UNFI | UNITED NATURAL FOODS INC | DOUGLAS J ALEXANDER JR | Chief Executive Officer | 04 Oct 2023 | Purchase | 11,265 | 13.32 | 150,050 | D |
05 Oct 2023 09:25 | HURN | Huron Consulting Group Inc | SINGH-BUSHELL EKTA | Director | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 192 | 103.17 | 19,809 | D |
05 Oct 2023 09:29 | HURN | Huron Consulting Group Inc | ZUMWALT DEBRA | Director | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 259 | 103.17 | 26,721 | D |
05 Oct 2023 09:31 | NAPA | Duckhorn Portfolio Inc | MAHLAN DEIRDRE | See Remarks | 04 Oct 2023 | Purchase | 5,000 | 9.9499 | 49,750 | I |
05 Oct 2023 10:47 | BPMC | Blueprint Medicines Corp | NAMOUNI FOUAD | PRESIDENT, R & D | 04 Oct 2023 | Sale | 3,769 | 48.06 | 181,138 | D |
05 Oct 2023 11:33 | RCG | RENN Fund Inc | STAHL MURRAY | President and CEO | 04 Oct 2023 | Purchase | 186 | 1.83 | 340 | I |
05 Oct 2023 11:33 | RCG | RENN Fund Inc | STAHL MURRAY | President and CEO | 04 Oct 2023 | Purchase | 180 | 1.83 | 329 | I |
05 Oct 2023 11:33 | RCG | RENN Fund Inc | STAHL MURRAY | President and CEO | 04 Oct 2023 | Purchase | 45 | 1.83 | 82 | I |
05 Oct 2023 11:33 | RCG | RENN Fund Inc | STAHL MURRAY | President and CEO | 04 Oct 2023 | Purchase | 1 | 1.83 | 2 | I |
05 Oct 2023 11:33 | RCG | RENN Fund Inc | STAHL MURRAY | President and CEO | 04 Oct 2023 | Purchase | 8 | 1.83 | 15 | D |
05 Oct 2023 11:39 | TPL | Texas Pacific Land Corp | HORIZON KINETICS ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC | 10% | 04 Oct 2023 | Purchase | 3 | 1,756.67 | 5,270 | D |
05 Oct 2023 11:56 | PVBC | Provident Bancorp Inc | STILWELL JOSEPH | 10% | 04 Oct 2023 | Purchase | 2,413 | 9.3856 | 22,647 | I |
05 Oct 2023 12:07 | FFIV | F5 Inc | LOCOH-DONOU FRANCOIS | President, CEO & Director | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 2,200 | 160.49 | 353,078 | D |
05 Oct 2023 13:26 | KIRK | KIRKLAND'S INC | SULLIVAN AMY ERVIN | President, COO | 04 Oct 2023 | Purchase | 2,847 | 1.7559 | 4,999 | D |
05 Oct 2023 14:10 | AIR | AAR CORP | HOLMES JOHN MCCLAIN III | Chairman, President & CEO | 04 Oct 2023 | Sale | 12,363 | 59.0374 | 729,879 | D |
05 Oct 2023 14:14 | FOMC | FOMO WORLDWIDE Inc | GROVER VIKRAM P | CEO, Director, 10% | 27 Jul 2023 | Purchase | 5,000,000 | 0.0002 | 1,000 | D |
05 Oct 2023 14:14 | FOMC | FOMO WORLDWIDE Inc | GROVER VIKRAM P | CEO, Director, 10% | 26 Jul 2023 | Purchase | 5,000,000 | 0.0002 | 1,000 | D |
05 Oct 2023 14:14 | FOMC | FOMO WORLDWIDE Inc | GROVER VIKRAM P | CEO, Director, 10% | 24 Jul 2023 | Purchase | 2,500,000 | 0.0002 | 500 | D |
05 Oct 2023 14:14 | FOMC | FOMO WORLDWIDE Inc | GROVER VIKRAM P | CEO, Director, 10% | 21 Jul 2023 | Purchase | 5,000,000 | 0.0002 | 1,000 | D |
05 Oct 2023 14:14 | FOMC | FOMO WORLDWIDE Inc | GROVER VIKRAM P | CEO, Director, 10% | 20 Jul 2023 | Purchase | 3,333,333 | 0.0003 | 1,000 | D |
05 Oct 2023 14:14 | FOMC | FOMO WORLDWIDE Inc | GROVER VIKRAM P | CEO, Director, 10% | 20 Jul 2023 | Purchase | 5,000,000 | 0.0002 | 1,000 | D |
05 Oct 2023 14:14 | FOMC | FOMO WORLDWIDE Inc | GROVER VIKRAM P | CEO, Director, 10% | 30 Jun 2023 | Purchase | 50,000,000 | 0.0002 | 10,000 | D |
05 Oct 2023 14:14 | FOMC | FOMO WORLDWIDE Inc | GROVER VIKRAM P | CEO, Director, 10% | 19 Jul 2023 | Purchase | 5,000,000 | 0.0002 | 1,000 | D |
05 Oct 2023 14:14 | FOMC | FOMO WORLDWIDE Inc | GROVER VIKRAM P | CEO, Director, 10% | 30 Jun 2023 | Purchase | 1,666,667 | 0.0003 | 500 | D |
* D/I = Direct / Indirect
* 10% = Entity with 10% or higher ownership stake
* A = Amendment Filing (SEC Form 4/A)