Real Time Insider Transaction Data
Real Time Insider buys and sells Data - Insider Trades - Insider Transactions - Insider Trading Data - SEC Form 4 Data
Total | Transactions | Amount |
Buys | 2 | $1,081,605 |
Sells | 423 | $1,499,524,218 |
Security | Reporting Name | Relationship | Purchase/Sale | Shares | Price $ | D/I | ||||
27 Oct 2022 21:12 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 27 Oct 2022 | Sale | 19,888 | 70.21 | 1,396,336 | I |
18 Mar 2024 21:47 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 14 Mar 2024 | Sale | 10,370 | 133.99 | 1,389,476 | D |
16 Apr 2024 21:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 10,739 | 129.34 | 1,388,982 | I |
16 Nov 2022 20:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 14 Nov 2022 | Sale | 17,505 | 78.84 | 1,380,094 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:40 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 26 Aug 2024 | Sale | 9,136 | 146.44 | 1,337,876 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:40 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 27 Aug 2024 | Sale | 9,086 | 147.17 | 1,337,187 | I |
18 Sep 2023 21:33 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 15 Sep 2023 | Sale | 12,466 | 104.26 | 1,299,705 | D |
10 Nov 2022 21:07 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | SAGATI AGHILI NASEEM | General Counsel | 10 Nov 2022 | Sale | 15,000 | 84.92 | 1,273,800 | D |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Jun 2024 | Sale | 9,229 | 138.02 | 1,273,787 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:40 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 27 Aug 2024 | Sale | 8,556 | 147.76 | 1,264,235 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:24 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 29 Aug 2024 | Sale | 8,690 | 144.78 | 1,258,138 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 9,104 | 137.48 | 1,251,618 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 16 Apr 2024 | Sale | 9,727 | 128.46 | 1,249,530 | I |
18 May 2023 19:01 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 17 May 2023 | Sale | 15,000 | 82.95 | 1,244,250 | D |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 9,349 | 132.7 | 1,240,612 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 12,294 | 100.08 | 1,230,384 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 9,222 | 132.67 | 1,223,483 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 9,117 | 132.75 | 1,210,282 | I |
27 Oct 2022 21:15 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 26 Oct 2022 | Sale | 16,627 | 72.29 | 1,201,966 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 9,017 | 132.74 | 1,196,917 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 27 Aug 2024 | Sale | 8,072 | 147.77 | 1,192,799 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:40 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 27 Aug 2024 | Sale | 8,096 | 146.26 | 1,184,121 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:24 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 29 Aug 2024 | Sale | 8,178 | 144.76 | 1,183,847 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:43 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 11,679 | 100.09 | 1,168,951 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 26 Aug 2024 | Sale | 7,944 | 146.41 | 1,163,081 | I |
16 Nov 2023 20:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Nov 2023 | Sale | 10,771 | 107.31 | 1,155,836 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 8,577 | 133.47 | 1,144,772 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 8,707 | 130.85 | 1,139,311 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 8,000 | 142.12 | 1,136,960 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 27 Aug 2024 | Sale | 7,770 | 146.27 | 1,136,518 | I |
25 May 2023 21:48 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 24 May 2023 | Sale | 13,713 | 82.57 | 1,132,282 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:25 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 29 Aug 2024 | Sale | 7,800 | 144.78 | 1,129,284 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 22 Mar 2024 | Sale | 8,413 | 134.05 | 1,127,763 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 22 Mar 2024 | Sale | 8,404 | 134.03 | 1,126,388 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 8,366 | 133.33 | 1,115,439 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 23 Aug 2024 | Sale | 7,547 | 147.05 | 1,109,786 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 01 Apr 2024 | Sale | 8,359 | 132.37 | 1,106,481 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:40 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 23 Aug 2024 | Sale | 7,507 | 147.05 | 1,103,904 | I |
27 Oct 2022 21:12 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 27 Oct 2022 | Sale | 15,300 | 71.51 | 1,094,103 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 8,100 | 133.48 | 1,081,188 | I |
18 Mar 2024 21:47 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 8,066 | 133.34 | 1,075,520 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 7,893 | 133.34 | 1,052,453 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 01 Apr 2024 | Sale | 7,884 | 132.38 | 1,043,684 | I |
26 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 25 Mar 2024 | Sale | 7,645 | 134.27 | 1,026,494 | I |
16 Nov 2022 20:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 14 Nov 2022 | Sale | 12,456 | 81.76 | 1,018,403 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 01 Apr 2024 | Sale | 7,594 | 132.39 | 1,005,370 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 7,601 | 130.14 | 989,194 | I |
17 Aug 2023 20:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BHUTANI ASHISH | Director | 15 Aug 2023 | Purchase | 10,000 | 98.08 | 980,800 | D |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 6,915 | 141.79 | 980,478 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 7,309 | 133.39 | 974,948 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 7,484 | 130.14 | 973,968 | I |
17 Aug 2023 20:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 16 Aug 2023 | Sale | 9,946 | 97.51 | 969,834 | I |
23 May 2023 19:48 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | SAGATI AGHILI NASEEM | General Counsel | 19 May 2023 | Sale | 11,531 | 83.07 | 957,880 | D |
04 Jun 2024 18:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 6,696 | 141.74 | 949,091 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 7,260 | 130.15 | 944,889 | I |
16 Feb 2024 20:44 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | DEVEER R. KIPP | Head of Credit Group | 15 Feb 2024 | Sale | 6,940 | 136 | 943,840 | D |
30 Aug 2024 21:25 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 30 Aug 2024 | Sale | 6,446 | 145.57 | 938,344 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:15 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 03 Apr 2024 | Sale | 7,052 | 132.27 | 932,768 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 22 Mar 2024 | Sale | 6,837 | 135.22 | 924,499 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 6,901 | 131.42 | 906,929 | I |
04 Sep 2024 20:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 03 Sep 2024 | Sale | 6,314 | 143.05 | 903,218 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 22 Mar 2024 | Sale | 6,596 | 135.22 | 891,911 | I |
05 Jun 2023 19:47 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 02 Jun 2023 | Sale | 10,000 | 89.11 | 891,100 | D |
30 Aug 2024 21:25 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 28 Aug 2024 | Sale | 6,093 | 145.83 | 888,542 | I |
05 Jun 2023 19:47 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 01 Jun 2023 | Sale | 10,000 | 88.22 | 882,200 | D |
22 Aug 2024 19:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 22 Aug 2024 | Sale | 6,024 | 144.63 | 871,251 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 01 Apr 2024 | Sale | 6,607 | 130.92 | 864,988 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 6,335 | 133.49 | 845,659 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:24 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 30 Aug 2024 | Sale | 5,772 | 146.34 | 844,674 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 23 Aug 2024 | Sale | 5,795 | 145.34 | 842,245 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 21 Aug 2024 | Sale | 5,843 | 143.66 | 839,405 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 5,901 | 141.03 | 832,218 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:40 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 23 Aug 2024 | Sale | 5,716 | 145.36 | 830,878 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 6,214 | 132.4 | 822,734 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:43 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 7,899 | 103.14 | 814,703 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 21 Aug 2024 | Sale | 5,641 | 143.67 | 810,442 | I |
09 Apr 2024 20:06 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 09 Apr 2024 | Sale | 5,962 | 135.14 | 805,705 | I |
15 Nov 2022 21:34 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 11 Nov 2022 | Sale | 9,400 | 85.04 | 799,376 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:15 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 03 Apr 2024 | Sale | 6,044 | 131.78 | 796,478 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:24 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 28 Aug 2024 | Sale | 5,440 | 145.85 | 793,424 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 21 Aug 2024 | Sale | 5,512 | 143.65 | 791,799 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 6,077 | 130.1 | 790,618 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 5,950 | 131.17 | 780,461 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:24 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 29 Aug 2024 | Sale | 5,355 | 145.68 | 780,116 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 5,830 | 133.48 | 778,188 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:25 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 29 Aug 2024 | Sale | 5,333 | 145.67 | 776,858 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:24 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 30 Aug 2024 | Sale | 5,294 | 145.5 | 770,277 | I |
15 Nov 2022 21:32 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 11 Nov 2022 | Sale | 9,106 | 83.89 | 763,902 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:35 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 15 Aug 2024 | Sale | 5,200 | 146.21 | 760,292 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 5,308 | 142.44 | 756,072 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 22 Aug 2024 | Sale | 5,221 | 144.66 | 755,270 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 5,283 | 142.38 | 752,194 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 02 Oct 2023 | Sale | 7,160 | 103.16 | 738,626 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:25 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 30 Aug 2024 | Sale | 4,973 | 146.39 | 727,997 | I |
16 Nov 2023 20:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Nov 2023 | Sale | 6,699 | 107.88 | 722,688 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 20 Aug 2024 | Sale | 4,955 | 144.69 | 716,939 | I |
28 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 28 Mar 2024 | Sale | 5,363 | 133.59 | 716,443 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:24 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 29 Aug 2024 | Sale | 4,849 | 145.65 | 706,257 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 01 Apr 2024 | Sale | 5,373 | 130.86 | 703,111 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 20 Aug 2024 | Sale | 4,697 | 144.7 | 679,656 | I |
* D/I = Direct / Indirect
* 10% = Entity with 10% or higher ownership stake
* A = Amendment Filing (SEC Form 4/A)