Real Time Insider Transaction Data
Real Time Insider buys and sells Data - Insider Trades - Insider Transactions - Insider Trading Data - SEC Form 4 Data
Total | Transactions | Amount |
Buys | 2 | $1,081,605 |
Sells | 423 | $1,499,524,218 |
Security | Reporting Name | Relationship | Purchase/Sale | Shares | Price $ | D/I | ||||
02 Apr 2024 20:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 01 Apr 2024 | Sale | 20,648 | 131.74 | 2,720,168 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 01 Apr 2024 | Sale | 5,373 | 130.86 | 703,111 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 02 Apr 2024 | Sale | 21,441 | 130.59 | 2,799,980 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 02 Apr 2024 | Sale | 16,345 | 129.74 | 2,120,600 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 02 Apr 2024 | Sale | 15,214 | 129.01 | 1,962,758 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 01 Apr 2024 | Sale | 7,594 | 132.39 | 1,005,370 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 01 Apr 2024 | Sale | 6,607 | 130.92 | 864,988 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 01 Apr 2024 | Sale | 19,703 | 131.78 | 2,596,461 | I |
28 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 28 Mar 2024 | Sale | 33,119 | 133.05 | 4,406,483 | I |
28 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 28 Mar 2024 | Sale | 5,363 | 133.59 | 716,443 | I |
28 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 28 Mar 2024 | Sale | 2,018 | 131.88 | 266,134 | I |
28 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 27 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,182 | 134.53 | 159,014 | I |
28 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 27 Mar 2024 | Sale | 16,057 | 133.36 | 2,141,362 | I |
28 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 27 Mar 2024 | Sale | 16,368 | 132.65 | 2,171,215 | I |
28 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 27 Mar 2024 | Sale | 14,965 | 131.87 | 1,973,435 | I |
26 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 26 Mar 2024 | Sale | 873 | 134.74 | 117,628 | I |
26 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 26 Mar 2024 | Sale | 22,923 | 133.91 | 3,069,619 | I |
26 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 25 Mar 2024 | Sale | 7,645 | 134.27 | 1,026,494 | I |
26 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 25 Mar 2024 | Sale | 11,236 | 133.75 | 1,502,815 | I |
26 Mar 2024 20:09 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 25 Mar 2024 | Sale | 600 | 134.58 | 80,748 | I |
26 Mar 2024 20:09 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 25 Mar 2024 | Sale | 3,888 | 133.92 | 520,681 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 22 Mar 2024 | Sale | 304 | 135.96 | 41,332 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 22 Mar 2024 | Sale | 6,596 | 135.22 | 891,911 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 20,389 | 137.45 | 2,802,468 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 22 Mar 2024 | Sale | 8,404 | 134.03 | 1,126,388 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 34,834 | 136.77 | 4,764,246 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,600 | 135.7 | 217,120 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 971 | 134.83 | 130,920 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 6,335 | 133.49 | 845,659 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 9,017 | 132.74 | 1,196,917 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 2,871 | 131.89 | 378,656 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,700 | 137.53 | 233,801 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 2,810 | 136.66 | 384,015 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 300 | 135.16 | 40,548 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 5,830 | 133.48 | 778,188 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 9,117 | 132.75 | 1,210,282 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 2,776 | 131.89 | 366,127 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 9,104 | 137.48 | 1,251,618 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 15,089 | 136.73 | 2,063,119 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,600 | 135.76 | 217,216 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 671 | 134.79 | 90,444 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 8,577 | 133.47 | 1,144,772 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 2,200 | 131.8 | 289,960 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 9,222 | 132.67 | 1,223,483 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 22 Mar 2024 | Sale | 100 | 136.17 | 13,617 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 22 Mar 2024 | Sale | 6,837 | 135.22 | 924,499 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 22 Mar 2024 | Sale | 8,413 | 134.05 | 1,127,763 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 19,119 | 137.45 | 2,627,907 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 34,567 | 136.75 | 4,727,037 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,800 | 135.83 | 244,494 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,071 | 134.84 | 144,414 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 8,100 | 133.48 | 1,081,188 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 9,349 | 132.7 | 1,240,612 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 2,300 | 131.81 | 303,163 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 800 | 132.72 | 106,176 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 11,411 | 132.04 | 1,506,708 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 3,590 | 130.95 | 470,110 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,423 | 130.07 | 185,090 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 418 | 132.61 | 55,431 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 6,901 | 131.42 | 906,929 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 8,707 | 130.85 | 1,139,311 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 6,077 | 130.1 | 790,618 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 591 | 134.23 | 79,330 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 31,015 | 132.21 | 4,100,493 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 7,309 | 133.39 | 974,948 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 617 | 132.76 | 81,913 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 11,661 | 132.05 | 1,539,835 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 3,400 | 130.92 | 445,128 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 218 | 132.82 | 28,955 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,431 | 130.08 | 186,144 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,300 | 131.78 | 171,314 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 13,377 | 131.1 | 1,753,725 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 7,260 | 130.15 | 944,889 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 700 | 134.22 | 93,954 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 8,366 | 133.33 | 1,115,439 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 29,137 | 132.19 | 3,851,620 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 606 | 132.74 | 80,440 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 3,410 | 130.93 | 446,471 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 11,898 | 132.04 | 1,571,012 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,420 | 130.07 | 184,699 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 218 | 132.88 | 28,968 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,175 | 131.81 | 154,877 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 13,238 | 131.12 | 1,735,767 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 7,484 | 130.14 | 973,968 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 908 | 134.16 | 121,817 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 7,893 | 133.34 | 1,052,453 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 30,287 | 132.19 | 4,003,639 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 800 | 132.71 | 106,168 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 11,579 | 132.05 | 1,529,007 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 3,547 | 130.97 | 464,551 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 218 | 132.81 | 28,953 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,542 | 130.1 | 200,614 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,348 | 131.77 | 177,626 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 13,029 | 131.12 | 1,708,362 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 7,601 | 130.14 | 989,194 | I |
18 Mar 2024 21:47 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 800 | 134.19 | 107,352 | I |
18 Mar 2024 21:47 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 8,066 | 133.34 | 1,075,520 | I |
18 Mar 2024 21:47 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 30,326 | 132.18 | 4,008,491 | I |
18 Mar 2024 21:47 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 14 Mar 2024 | Sale | 10,370 | 133.99 | 1,389,476 | D |
18 Mar 2024 21:47 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 14 Mar 2024 | Sale | 24,457 | 133.26 | 3,259,140 | D |
* D/I = Direct / Indirect
* 10% = Entity with 10% or higher ownership stake
* A = Amendment Filing (SEC Form 4/A)