Real Time Insider Transaction Data
Real Time Insider buys and sells Data - Insider Trades - Insider Transactions - Insider Trading Data - SEC Form 4 Data
Total | Transactions | Amount |
Buys | 2 | $1,081,605 |
Sells | 423 | $1,499,524,218 |
Security | Reporting Name | Relationship | Purchase/Sale | Shares | Price $ | D/I | ||||
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 11 Apr 2024 | Sale | 1 | 134.95 | 135 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 1 | 144.01 | 144 | D |
03 Feb 2023 20:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 02 Feb 2023 | Sale | 100 | 86 | 8,600 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 100 | 101.82 | 10,182 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 21 Aug 2024 | Sale | 83 | 145.41 | 12,069 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 22 Mar 2024 | Sale | 100 | 136.17 | 13,617 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Jun 2024 | Sale | 100 | 140.51 | 14,051 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 21 Aug 2024 | Sale | 98 | 145.41 | 14,250 | I |
15 Nov 2022 21:32 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 11 Nov 2022 | Sale | 170 | 85.23 | 14,489 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 100 | 145.17 | 14,517 | I |
17 Aug 2023 20:26 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Aug 2023 | Sale | 230 | 100.56 | 23,129 | I |
17 Aug 2023 20:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 15 Aug 2023 | Sale | 274 | 100.78 | 27,614 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 218 | 132.81 | 28,953 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 218 | 132.82 | 28,955 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 218 | 132.88 | 28,968 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:40 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 26 Aug 2024 | Sale | 200 | 147.95 | 29,590 | I |
15 Jun 2023 19:17 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 14 Jun 2023 | Sale | 400 | 95 | 38,000 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 300 | 135.16 | 40,548 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 22 Mar 2024 | Sale | 304 | 135.96 | 41,332 | I |
25 May 2023 21:48 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 24 May 2023 | Sale | 516 | 83.91 | 43,298 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 26 Aug 2024 | Sale | 300 | 147.91 | 44,373 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 16 Sep 2024 | Sale | 300 | 149.04 | 44,712 | D |
17 May 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 16 May 2024 | Sale | 300 | 149.67 | 44,901 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:35 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 19 Aug 2024 | Sale | 337 | 145.45 | 49,017 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 19 Aug 2024 | Sale | 337 | 145.45 | 49,017 | I |
16 Feb 2024 20:44 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | DEVEER R. KIPP | Head of Credit Group | 15 Feb 2024 | Sale | 403 | 136.69 | 55,086 | D |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 418 | 132.61 | 55,431 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:36 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 19 Aug 2024 | Sale | 392 | 145.38 | 56,989 | I |
17 Aug 2023 20:25 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Aug 2023 | Sale | 571 | 100.41 | 57,334 | I |
17 May 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 May 2024 | Sale | 406 | 149.93 | 60,872 | I |
16 Nov 2022 20:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 14 Nov 2022 | Sale | 900 | 82.71 | 74,439 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 541 | 144.23 | 78,028 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 591 | 134.23 | 79,330 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 606 | 132.74 | 80,440 | I |
26 Mar 2024 20:09 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 25 Mar 2024 | Sale | 600 | 134.58 | 80,748 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 617 | 132.76 | 81,913 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 31 May 2024 | Sale | 600 | 144.33 | 86,598 | I |
09 Sep 2024 20:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 05 Sep 2024 | Sale | 616 | 141.9 | 87,410 | D |
22 Mar 2024 21:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 671 | 134.79 | 90,444 | I |
25 Jun 2024 20:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 21 Jun 2024 | Sale | 692 | 134.21 | 92,873 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 700 | 134.22 | 93,954 | I |
09 Apr 2024 20:06 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 08 Apr 2024 | Sale | 700 | 135.59 | 94,913 | I |
16 May 2023 20:46 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BUSH ANTOINETTE COOK | Director | 12 May 2023 | Purchase | 1,234 | 81.69 | 100,805 | D |
25 May 2023 21:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | OLIAN JUDY D. | Director | 23 May 2023 | Sale | 1,200 | 85.59 | 102,708 | D |
19 Mar 2024 21:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 800 | 132.71 | 106,168 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 800 | 132.72 | 106,176 | I |
18 Mar 2024 21:47 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 800 | 134.19 | 107,352 | I |
09 Apr 2024 20:06 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 09 Apr 2024 | Sale | 800 | 135.93 | 108,744 | I |
26 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 26 Mar 2024 | Sale | 873 | 134.74 | 117,628 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 908 | 134.16 | 121,817 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Jun 2024 | Sale | 879 | 139.82 | 122,902 | I |
25 Jun 2024 20:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 21 Jun 2024 | Sale | 921 | 134.06 | 123,469 | I |
25 May 2023 21:48 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 24 May 2023 | Sale | 1,500 | 83.9 | 125,850 | D |
04 Sep 2024 20:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 03 Sep 2024 | Sale | 900 | 145.1 | 130,590 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 971 | 134.83 | 130,920 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,071 | 134.84 | 144,414 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,175 | 131.81 | 154,877 | I |
28 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 27 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,182 | 134.53 | 159,014 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,300 | 131.78 | 171,314 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:35 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 15 Aug 2024 | Sale | 1,200 | 144.39 | 173,268 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,348 | 131.77 | 177,626 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,420 | 130.07 | 184,699 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,423 | 130.07 | 185,090 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,431 | 130.08 | 186,144 | I |
19 Sep 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 18 Sep 2024 | Sale | 1,280 | 155.13 | 198,566 | D |
19 Mar 2024 21:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,542 | 130.1 | 200,614 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 12 Apr 2024 | Sale | 1,554 | 133.35 | 207,226 | I |
19 Apr 2024 18:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 17 Apr 2024 | Sale | 1,600 | 132.48 | 211,968 | I |
19 Sep 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 17 Sep 2024 | Sale | 1,408 | 151.06 | 212,692 | D |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,600 | 135.7 | 217,120 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,600 | 135.76 | 217,216 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,700 | 137.53 | 233,801 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Apr 2024 | Sale | 1,818 | 131.27 | 238,649 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,800 | 135.83 | 244,494 | I |
10 Nov 2022 20:40 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 10 Nov 2022 | Sale | 2,983 | 85.02 | 253,615 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 23 Aug 2024 | Sale | 1,805 | 144.49 | 260,804 | I |
28 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 28 Mar 2024 | Sale | 2,018 | 131.88 | 266,134 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:40 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 23 Aug 2024 | Sale | 1,905 | 144.49 | 275,253 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 10 Apr 2024 | Sale | 2,107 | 131.9 | 277,913 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 2,200 | 131.8 | 289,960 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Jun 2024 | Sale | 2,110 | 138.87 | 293,016 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 22 Aug 2024 | Sale | 2,044 | 144.65 | 295,665 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 2,300 | 131.81 | 303,163 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Aug 2024 | Sale | 2,101 | 144.66 | 303,931 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Jun 2024 | Sale | 2,341 | 137.05 | 320,834 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:36 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Aug 2024 | Sale | 2,235 | 144.72 | 323,449 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 2,553 | 131.24 | 335,056 | I |
16 Nov 2023 20:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Nov 2023 | Sale | 3,111 | 109.07 | 339,317 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Apr 2024 | Sale | 2,608 | 132.75 | 346,212 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:43 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 3,600 | 101.3 | 364,680 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 2,776 | 131.89 | 366,127 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 3,638 | 101.28 | 368,457 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 2,871 | 131.89 | 378,656 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 2,810 | 136.66 | 384,015 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 03 Apr 2024 | Sale | 2,902 | 132.83 | 385,473 | I |
06 Jun 2023 21:11 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 02 Jun 2023 | Sale | 4,460 | 90 | 401,400 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 16 Aug 2024 | Sale | 2,930 | 145.37 | 425,934 | I |
25 May 2023 21:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 23 May 2023 | Sale | 5,000 | 85.63 | 428,150 | D |
19 Aug 2024 21:36 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 16 Aug 2024 | Sale | 2,976 | 145.36 | 432,591 | I |
31 May 2023 20:56 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 30 May 2023 | Sale | 5,000 | 87.32 | 436,600 | D |
* D/I = Direct / Indirect
* 10% = Entity with 10% or higher ownership stake
* A = Amendment Filing (SEC Form 4/A)