Real Time Insider Transaction Data
Real Time Insider buys and sells Data - Insider Trades - Insider Transactions - Insider Trading Data - SEC Form 4 Data
Total | Transactions | Amount |
Buys | 2 | $1,081,605 |
Sells | 423 | $1,499,524,218 |
Security | Reporting Name | Relationship | Purchase/Sale | Shares | Price $ | D/I | ||||
27 Aug 2024 19:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 26 Aug 2024 | Sale | 7,944 | 146.41 | 1,163,081 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:43 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 11,679 | 100.09 | 1,168,951 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:24 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 29 Aug 2024 | Sale | 8,178 | 144.76 | 1,183,847 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:40 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 27 Aug 2024 | Sale | 8,096 | 146.26 | 1,184,121 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 27 Aug 2024 | Sale | 8,072 | 147.77 | 1,192,799 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:23 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 9,017 | 132.74 | 1,196,917 | I |
27 Oct 2022 21:15 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 26 Oct 2022 | Sale | 16,627 | 72.29 | 1,201,966 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 9,117 | 132.75 | 1,210,282 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 9,222 | 132.67 | 1,223,483 | I |
04 Oct 2023 21:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Oct 2023 | Sale | 12,294 | 100.08 | 1,230,384 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 20 Mar 2024 | Sale | 9,349 | 132.7 | 1,240,612 | I |
18 May 2023 19:01 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 17 May 2023 | Sale | 15,000 | 82.95 | 1,244,250 | D |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 16 Apr 2024 | Sale | 9,727 | 128.46 | 1,249,530 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 9,104 | 137.48 | 1,251,618 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:24 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 29 Aug 2024 | Sale | 8,690 | 144.78 | 1,258,138 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:40 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 27 Aug 2024 | Sale | 8,556 | 147.76 | 1,264,235 | I |
04 Jun 2024 18:45 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 03 Jun 2024 | Sale | 9,229 | 138.02 | 1,273,787 | I |
10 Nov 2022 21:07 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | SAGATI AGHILI NASEEM | General Counsel | 10 Nov 2022 | Sale | 15,000 | 84.92 | 1,273,800 | D |
18 Sep 2023 21:33 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 15 Sep 2023 | Sale | 12,466 | 104.26 | 1,299,705 | D |
27 Aug 2024 19:40 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 27 Aug 2024 | Sale | 9,086 | 147.17 | 1,337,187 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:40 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 26 Aug 2024 | Sale | 9,136 | 146.44 | 1,337,876 | I |
16 Nov 2022 20:22 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 14 Nov 2022 | Sale | 17,505 | 78.84 | 1,380,094 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 10,739 | 129.34 | 1,388,982 | I |
18 Mar 2024 21:47 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 14 Mar 2024 | Sale | 10,370 | 133.99 | 1,389,476 | D |
27 Oct 2022 21:12 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 27 Oct 2022 | Sale | 19,888 | 70.21 | 1,396,336 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 19 Aug 2024 | Sale | 9,817 | 144.43 | 1,417,869 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:36 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 19 Aug 2024 | Sale | 9,831 | 144.43 | 1,419,891 | I |
09 Sep 2024 20:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 09 Sep 2024 | Sale | 10,000 | 142.12 | 1,421,200 | D |
22 Aug 2024 19:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 21 Aug 2024 | Sale | 9,861 | 144.34 | 1,423,337 | I |
27 Oct 2022 21:12 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 27 Oct 2022 | Sale | 19,617 | 72.63 | 1,424,783 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 27 Aug 2024 | Sale | 9,683 | 147.18 | 1,425,144 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:40 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 26 Aug 2024 | Sale | 9,704 | 146.98 | 1,426,294 | I |
10 Feb 2023 20:08 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 10 Feb 2023 | Sale | 16,879 | 85.12 | 1,436,740 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 9,999 | 144.92 | 1,449,055 | D |
22 Aug 2024 19:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 21 Aug 2024 | Sale | 10,059 | 144.33 | 1,451,815 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 21 Aug 2024 | Sale | 10,100 | 144.33 | 1,457,733 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:35 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 19 Aug 2024 | Sale | 10,113 | 144.43 | 1,460,621 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 10,000 | 146.23 | 1,462,300 | D |
25 May 2023 21:48 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 25 May 2023 | Sale | 17,640 | 84.37 | 1,488,287 | I |
26 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 25 Mar 2024 | Sale | 11,236 | 133.75 | 1,502,815 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:53 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 11,411 | 132.04 | 1,506,708 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 11,579 | 132.05 | 1,529,007 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 11,661 | 132.05 | 1,539,835 | I |
27 Oct 2022 21:15 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 26 Oct 2022 | Sale | 21,045 | 73.8 | 1,553,121 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 19 Mar 2024 | Sale | 11,898 | 132.04 | 1,571,012 | I |
25 May 2023 21:48 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 25 May 2023 | Sale | 18,933 | 83.43 | 1,579,580 | I |
27 Aug 2024 19:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 26 Aug 2024 | Sale | 11,018 | 146.95 | 1,619,095 | I |
19 Sep 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 17 Sep 2024 | Sale | 11,092 | 150.37 | 1,667,904 | D |
16 Apr 2024 21:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 12,895 | 130.7 | 1,685,376 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 13,029 | 131.12 | 1,708,362 | I |
19 Sep 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 18 Sep 2024 | Sale | 11,220 | 154.32 | 1,731,470 | D |
19 Mar 2024 21:50 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 13,238 | 131.12 | 1,735,767 | I |
19 Mar 2024 21:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 18 Mar 2024 | Sale | 13,377 | 131.1 | 1,753,725 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 02 Apr 2024 | Sale | 13,919 | 129.73 | 1,805,712 | I |
16 Sep 2024 19:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 16 Sep 2024 | Sale | 12,200 | 148.4 | 1,810,480 | D |
07 Sep 2023 19:01 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 05 Sep 2023 | Sale | 17,692 | 102.52 | 1,813,784 | I |
31 May 2023 20:56 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 26 May 2023 | Sale | 22,026 | 84.29 | 1,856,572 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 04 Apr 2024 | Sale | 14,098 | 133.64 | 1,884,057 | I |
09 Feb 2023 21:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 09 Feb 2023 | Sale | 21,943 | 85.9 | 1,884,904 | I |
19 Sep 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 17 Sep 2024 | Sale | 12,500 | 152.17 | 1,902,125 | D |
22 Aug 2024 19:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 22 Aug 2024 | Sale | 13,247 | 144.02 | 1,907,833 | I |
19 Sep 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 19 Sep 2024 | Sale | 12,500 | 156.17 | 1,952,125 | D |
02 Apr 2024 20:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 02 Apr 2024 | Sale | 15,214 | 129.01 | 1,962,758 | I |
28 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 27 Mar 2024 | Sale | 14,965 | 131.87 | 1,973,435 | I |
31 May 2023 20:56 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 26 May 2023 | Sale | 23,694 | 84.3 | 1,997,404 | D |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 10 Apr 2024 | Sale | 15,067 | 133.59 | 2,012,801 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 22 Aug 2024 | Sale | 14,147 | 144.05 | 2,037,875 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:24 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 30 Aug 2024 | Sale | 14,037 | 145.45 | 2,041,682 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 02 Apr 2024 | Sale | 15,874 | 128.97 | 2,047,270 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:21 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 15,089 | 136.73 | 2,063,119 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 02 Apr 2024 | Sale | 16,105 | 129.66 | 2,088,174 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 02 Apr 2024 | Sale | 16,345 | 129.74 | 2,120,600 | I |
05 Apr 2024 20:16 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 05 Apr 2024 | Sale | 16,033 | 132.53 | 2,124,853 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:49 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 20 Aug 2024 | Sale | 14,818 | 144.16 | 2,136,163 | I |
28 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 27 Mar 2024 | Sale | 16,057 | 133.36 | 2,141,362 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 20 Aug 2024 | Sale | 14,863 | 144.17 | 2,142,799 | I |
03 Feb 2023 20:39 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 01 Feb 2023 | Sale | 25,269 | 85.19 | 2,152,666 | I |
28 Mar 2024 20:14 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 27 Mar 2024 | Sale | 16,368 | 132.65 | 2,171,215 | I |
22 Aug 2024 19:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 20 Aug 2024 | Sale | 15,110 | 144.18 | 2,178,560 | I |
17 Aug 2023 20:26 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Aug 2023 | Sale | 21,917 | 99.96 | 2,190,823 | I |
04 Sep 2024 20:27 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 03 Sep 2024 | Sale | 16,295 | 142.14 | 2,316,171 | I |
17 May 2024 19:29 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 16 May 2024 | Sale | 15,702 | 148.04 | 2,324,524 | I |
18 Sep 2023 21:33 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | BERRY RYAN | Chief Mktg. & Strategy Officer | 15 Sep 2023 | Sale | 22,534 | 104.83 | 2,362,239 | D |
02 Apr 2024 20:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 02 Apr 2024 | Sale | 18,354 | 130.62 | 2,397,399 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 02 Apr 2024 | Sale | 18,600 | 129.01 | 2,399,586 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:37 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 18,362 | 130.71 | 2,400,097 | I |
16 Nov 2023 20:41 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 15 Nov 2023 | Sale | 22,696 | 106.22 | 2,410,769 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 02 Apr 2024 | Sale | 18,738 | 130.61 | 2,447,370 | I |
30 Aug 2024 21:24 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 30 Aug 2024 | Sale | 17,008 | 146.31 | 2,488,440 | I |
16 Apr 2024 21:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 15 Apr 2024 | Sale | 19,805 | 128.54 | 2,545,735 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:35 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 16 Aug 2024 | Sale | 17,596 | 144.87 | 2,549,133 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:51 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 01 Apr 2024 | Sale | 19,703 | 131.78 | 2,596,461 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:36 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 16 Aug 2024 | Sale | 18,135 | 144.87 | 2,627,217 | I |
22 Mar 2024 21:20 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | AROUGHETI MICHAEL J | Co-Founder, CEO and President | 21 Mar 2024 | Sale | 19,119 | 137.45 | 2,627,907 | I |
19 Aug 2024 21:38 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | ROSENTHAL BENNETT | Co-Founder & Chairman of PEG | 16 Aug 2024 | Sale | 18,236 | 144.87 | 2,641,849 | I |
12 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 12 Apr 2024 | Sale | 20,014 | 132.63 | 2,654,457 | I |
07 Sep 2023 19:01 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 05 Sep 2023 | Sale | 25,563 | 104.01 | 2,658,808 | I |
27 Oct 2022 21:12 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder & Co-Chair of PEG | 27 Oct 2022 | Sale | 36,357 | 74.26 | 2,699,871 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:54 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | RESSLER ANTONY P | Co-Founder & Exec. Chairman, 10% | 01 Apr 2024 | Sale | 20,578 | 131.71 | 2,710,328 | I |
02 Apr 2024 20:52 | ARES | Ares Management Corp | KAPLAN DAVID B | Co-Founder | 01 Apr 2024 | Sale | 20,648 | 131.74 | 2,720,168 | I |
* D/I = Direct / Indirect
* 10% = Entity with 10% or higher ownership stake
* A = Amendment Filing (SEC Form 4/A)